Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 353 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1452 Week
» 7586 Month
» 235470 Year
» 1457035 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Lord Nelson" Class 4-6-0


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
Lord Nelson 850 08/1926 LORD NELSON 08/1926   18/08/1962
Lord Nelson 851 06/1928 SIR FRANCIS DRAKE 0000   31/12/1961 23/12/1961
Lord Nelson 852 07/1928 SIR WALTER RALEIGH 0000   28/02/1962 17/02/1962
Lord Nelson 853 09/1928 SIR RICHARD GRENVILLE 0000   28/02/1962 03/03/1962
Lord Nelson 854 10/1928 HOWARD OF EFFINGHAM 0000   09/09/1961
Lord Nelson 855 11/1928 ROBERT BLAKE 0000   30/09/1961
Lord Nelson 856 11/1928 LORD ST. VINCENT 0000   22/09/1962
Lord Nelson 857 12/1928 LORD HOWE 0000   22/09/1962
Lord Nelson 858 01/1929 LORD DUNCAN 0000   19/08/1961
Lord Nelson 859 03/1929 LORD HOOD 0000   31/12/1961 09/12/1961
Lord Nelson 860 04/1929 LORD HAWKE 0000   11/08/1962
Lord Nelson 861 09/1929 LORD ANSON 0000   06/10/1962
Lord Nelson 862 10/1929 LORD COLLINGWOOD 0000   06/10/1962
Lord Nelson 863 10/1929 LORD RODNEY 0000   28/02/1962 10/02/1962
Lord Nelson 864 11/1929 SIR MARTIN FROBISHER 0000   01/02/1962 27/01/1962
Lord Nelson 865 11/1929 SIR JOHN HAWKINS 0000   20/05/1961