Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 136 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2281 Week
» 16538 Month
» 244422 Year
» 1465987 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Lord Nelson" Class 4-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
08/1926 To Service 850   NEW BAT Stewarts Lane  
03/1930 Reallocation 850 BAT Stewarts Lane EXJ Exmouth Junction  
04/1930 Reallocation 850 EXJ Exmouth Junction BAT Stewarts Lane  
27/02/1940 Reallocation 850 BAT Stewarts Lane 9E Nine Elms  
24/02/1943 Reallocation 850 9E Nine Elms BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 851     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 852     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 853     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 854     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 855     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 856     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 857     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 858     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 859     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 860     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 861     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 862     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 863     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 864     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 865     BM Bournemouth  
08/01/1949 Reallocation 30850 BM Bournemouth ELH Eastleigh  
13/05/1954 Reallocation 30864 BM Bournemouth 71C Dorchester  
13/05/1954 Reallocation 30865 BM Bournemouth 71C Dorchester  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 30864 71C Dorchester 71B Bournemouth  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 30865 71C Dorchester 71B Bournemouth  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30861 9E Nine Elms 71A Eastleigh  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30862 BM Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30863 BM Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30858 9E Nine Elms 71A Eastleigh  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30859 9E Nine Elms 71A Eastleigh  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30860 9E Nine Elms 71B Bournemouth  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 30860 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 30864 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 30865 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
20/05/1961 Condemned 30865 71A Eastleigh   COND  
19/08/1961 Condemned 30858 71A Eastleigh   COND  
09/09/1961 Condemned 30854 BM Bournemouth   COND  
30/09/1961 Condemned 30855 BM Bournemouth   COND  
09/12/1961 Condemned 30859 71A Eastleigh   COND  
23/12/1961 Condemned 30851 BM Bournemouth   COND  
27/01/1962 Condemned 30864 71A Eastleigh   COND  
10/02/1962 Condemned 30863 71A Eastleigh   COND  
17/02/1962 Condemned 30852 BM Bournemouth   COND  
03/03/1962 Condemned 30853 BM Bournemouth   COND  
11/08/1962 Condemned 30860 71A Eastleigh   COND  
18/08/1962 Condemned 30850 ELH Eastleigh   COND  
22/09/1962 Condemned 30856 9E Nine Elms   COND  
22/09/1962 Condemned 30857 9E Nine Elms   COND  
06/10/1962 Condemned 30861 71A Eastleigh   COND  
06/10/1962 Condemned 30862 71A Eastleigh   COND