Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 164 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2309 Week
» 16566 Month
» 244450 Year
» 1466015 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Lord Nelson" Class 4-6-0


Class SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Lord Nelson 850 30850 08/1926 BAT
EXJ
BAT
9E
BM
ELH
W
Stewarts Lane
Exmouth Junction
Stewarts Lane
Nine Elms
Bournemouth
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
08/1926
03/1930
04/1930
27/02/1940
24/02/1943
08/01/1949
18/08/1962
18/08/1962
Lord Nelson 851 30851 06/1928 BM
W
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/12/1961
23/12/1961
Lord Nelson 852 30852 07/1928 BM
W
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/02/1962
17/02/1962
Lord Nelson 853 30853 09/1928 BM
W
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/03/1962
03/03/1962
Lord Nelson 854 30854 10/1928 BM
W
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1961
09/09/1961
Lord Nelson 855 30855 11/1928 BM
W
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/09/1961
30/09/1961
Lord Nelson 856 30856 11/1928 9E
W
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1962
22/09/1962
Lord Nelson 857 30857 12/1928 9E
W
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1962
22/09/1962
Lord Nelson 858 30858 01/1929 9E
71A
W
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/06/1958
19/08/1961
19/08/1961
Lord Nelson 859 30859 03/1929 9E
71A
W
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/06/1958
09/12/1961
09/12/1961
Lord Nelson 860 30860 04/1929 9E
71B
71A
W
Nine Elms
Bournemouth
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/06/1958
26/11/1959
11/08/1962
11/08/1962
Lord Nelson 861 30861 09/1929 9E
71A
W
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/06/1956
06/10/1962
06/10/1962
Lord Nelson 862 30862 10/1929 BM
71A
W
Bournemouth
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/06/1956
06/10/1962
06/10/1962
Lord Nelson 863 30863 10/1929 BM
71A
W
Bournemouth
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/06/1956
10/02/1962
10/02/1962
Lord Nelson 864 30864 11/1929 BM
71C
71B
71A
W
Bournemouth
Dorchester
Bournemouth
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/05/1954
06/11/1954
26/11/1959
27/01/1962
27/01/1962
Lord Nelson 865 30865 11/1929 BM
71C
71B
71A
W
Bournemouth
Dorchester
Bournemouth
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/05/1954
06/11/1954
26/11/1959
20/05/1961
20/05/1961