Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 285 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18088 Week
» 71104 Month
» 190631 Year
» 3217484 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LSWR/SR Adams "415" Class 4-4-2T
Date |
Event |
Number |
From |
Depot From |
To |
Depot To |
Usage |
06/1916 |
Condemned |
0424 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1918 |
Condemned |
0479 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1918 |
Condemned |
0489 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
047 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
048 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
049 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
051 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
052 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
053 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
056 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
057 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
078 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
082 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0104 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0107 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0170 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0171 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0173 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0415 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0417 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0418 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0419 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0420 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0421 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0423 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0425 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0427 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0430 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0432 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0482 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0484 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0491 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0492 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0493 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0494 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0495 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
0516 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
518 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
523 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1921 |
Condemned |
525 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1923 |
Condemned |
0106 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1924 |
Condemned |
0129 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1924 |
Condemned |
0426 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1924 |
Condemned |
0485 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1924 |
Condemned |
055 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1924 |
Condemned |
0487 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1924 |
Condemned |
045 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1924 |
Condemned |
0126 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1924 |
Condemned |
0481 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1925 |
Condemned |
068 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1925 |
Condemned |
0521 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1925 |
Condemned |
0428 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1925 |
Condemned |
0416 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1925 |
Condemned |
0422 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1925 |
Condemned |
0429 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1925 |
Condemned |
0480 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1925 |
Condemned |
0483 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1925 |
Condemned |
0524 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1925 |
Condemned |
077 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1925 |
Condemned |
0431 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1925 |
Condemned |
0517 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1926 |
Condemned |
169 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1926 |
Condemned |
519 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1926 |
Condemned |
0490 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1927 |
Condemned |
054 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1927 |
Condemned |
050 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1928 |
Condemned |
0486 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1928 |
Condemned |
0522 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
3125 |
|
|
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
3488 |
|
|
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
3520 |
|
|
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
28/01/1961 |
Condemned |
30584 |
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1961 |
Condemned |
30583 |
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
COND |
|
29/07/1961 |
Condemned |
30582 |
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
COND |
|