LSWR/SR Drummond "K10" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 135 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 137 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 139 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 140 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 141 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 142 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 143 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 144 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 145 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 146 | DOR | Dorchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 150 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 151 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 152 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 153 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 329 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 340 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 341 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 343 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 345 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 380 | BAS | Basingstoke | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 382 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 383 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 384 | DOR | Dorchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 385 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 386 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 389 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 390 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 391 | BM | Bournemouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 392 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 393 | SAL | Salisbury | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 394 | FEL | Feltham | |||
02/1948 | Condemned | 146 | DOR | Dorchester | COND | ||
02/1948 | Condemned | 150 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
02/1948 | Condemned | 343 | GFD | Guildford | COND | ||
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | 382 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | GFD | Guildford | |
06/1948 | Condemned | 340 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | COND | ||
01/08/1948 | Reallocation | 384 | DOR | Dorchester | FEL | Feltham | |
09/1948 | Condemned | 139 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
09/1948 | Condemned | 143 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | COND | ||
10/1948 | Condemned | 145 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | COND | ||
10/1948 | Condemned | 392 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | COND | ||
02/1949 | Condemned | 30152 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | COND | ||
02/1949 | Condemned | 30385 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
02/1949 | Condemned | 30393 | SAL | Salisbury | COND | ||
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 30389 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | YEOs | Yeovil Town | |
03/1949 | Condemned | 30135 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | COND | ||
03/1949 | Condemned | 30153 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
05/1949 | Condemned | 30383 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | COND | ||
05/1949 | Condemned | 30394 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
06/1949 | Condemned | 30380 | BAS | Basingstoke | COND | ||
07/1949 | Condemned | 30144 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
08/1949 | Condemned | 30137 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | COND | ||
08/1949 | Condemned | 30386 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | COND | ||
09/1949 | Condemned | 30345 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
10/1949 | Condemned | 30141 | GFD | Guildford | COND | ||
10/1949 | Condemned | 30391 | BM | Bournemouth | COND | ||
12/1949 | Condemned | 30341 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
01/1950 | Condemned | 30140 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
01/1950 | Condemned | 30142 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | COND | ||
02/1950 | Condemned | 30151 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
04/1950 | Condemned | 30329 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | COND | ||
19/08/1950 | Condemned | 30382 | GFD | Guildford | COND | ||
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 30384 | FEL | Feltham | 70C | Guildford | |
11/1950 | Condemned | 30390 | GFD | Guildford | COND | ||
01/1951 | Condemned | 30389 | YEOs | Yeovil Town | COND | ||
11/04/1951 | Reallocation | 30384 | 70C | Guildford | 72C | Yeovil Town | |
13/04/1951 | Reallocation | 30384 | 72C | Yeovil Town | 72C | Yeovil Town | |
06/1951 | Condemned | 30384 | 72C | Yeovil Town | COND |