LSWR/SR Drummond "K10" Class 4-4-0
Class | SR (1931) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Small Hoppers | 135 | 30135 | 06/1902 | EXJ W |
Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 137 | 30137 | 09/1902 | EXJ W |
Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1949 |
08/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 139 | 30139 | 10/1902 | FEL W |
Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1948 |
09/1948 |
Small Hoppers | 140 | 30140 | 10/1902 | FEL W |
Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1950 |
01/1950 |
Small Hoppers | 141 | 30141 | 10/1902 | GFD W |
Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1949 |
10/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 142 | 30142 | 11/1902 | 9E W |
Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1950 |
01/1950 |
Small Hoppers | 143 | 30143 | 11/1902 | YEO W |
Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1948 |
09/1948 |
Small Hoppers | 144 | 30144 | 11/1902 | FEL W |
Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 |
07/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 145 | 30145 | 12/1902 | YEO W |
Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1948 |
10/1948 |
Small Hoppers | 146 | 30146 | 12/1902 | DOR W |
Dorchester Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1948 |
02/1948 |
Small Hoppers | 150 | 30150 | 12/1902 | ELH W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1948 |
02/1948 |
Small Hoppers | 151 | 30151 | 12/1902 | ELH W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1950 |
02/1950 |
Small Hoppers | 152 | 30152 | 12/1902 | YEO W |
Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 153 | 30153 | 12/1902 | FEL W |
Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 329 | 30329 | 12/1901 | EXJ W |
Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1950 |
04/1950 |
Small Hoppers | 340 | 30340 | 12/1901 | YEO W |
Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1948 |
06/1948 |
Small Hoppers | 341 | 30341 | 12/1901 | ELH W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 343 | 30343 | 12/1901 | GFD W |
Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1948 |
02/1948 |
Small Hoppers | 345 | 30345 | 01/1902 | ELH W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 380 | 30380 | 04/1902 | BAS W |
Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1949 |
06/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 382 | 30382 | 04/1902 | EXJ GFD W |
Exmouth Junction Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 19/08/1950 |
19/08/1950 |
Small Hoppers | 383 | 30383 | 04/1902 | EXJ W |
Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 384 | 30384 | 04/1902 | DOR FEL 70C 72C 72C W |
Dorchester Feltham Guildford Yeovil Town Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/08/1948 07/10/1950 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 06/1951 |
06/1951 |
Small Hoppers | 385 | 30385 | 05/1902 | ELH W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 386 | 30386 | 05/1902 | YEO W |
Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1949 |
08/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 389 | 30389 | 06/1902 | EXJ YEO W |
Exmouth Junction Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 01/1951 |
01/1951 |
Small Hoppers | 390 | 30390 | 06/1902 | GFD W |
Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/1950 |
11/1950 |
Small Hoppers | 391 | 30391 | 07/1902 | BM W |
Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1949 |
10/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 392 | 30392 | 07/1902 | 9E W |
Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1948 |
10/1948 |
Small Hoppers | 393 | 30393 | 02/1902 | SAL W |
Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
Small Hoppers | 394 | 30394 | 03/1902 | FEL W |
Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |