Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 117 Today
» 1044 Yesterday
» 3383 Week
» 20034 Month
» 213878 Year
» 724980 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Drummond "D15" Class 4-4-0


Class SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
D15 463 30463 02/1912 ELH
W
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1951
12/1951
D15 464 30464 05/1912 ELH
70A
W
Eastleigh
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1953
11/1954
11/1954
D15 465 30465 06/1912 ELH
70A
71D
70A
71A
W
Eastleigh
Nine Elms
Fratton
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1953
10/12/1953
18/06/1954
01/11/1955
01/1956
01/1956
D15 466 30466 07/1912 ELH
W
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1952
10/1952
D15 467 30467 07/1912 ELH
70A
W
Eastleigh
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/06/1954
09/1955
09/1955
D15 468 30468 09/1912 ELH
W
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1952
03/1952
D15 469 30469 10/1912 ELH
W
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1951
12/1951
D15 470 30470 11/1912 ELH
W
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1952
12/1952
D15 471 30471 11/1912 ELH
70A
71D
W
Eastleigh
Nine Elms
Fratton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1953
30/12/1953
03/1954
03/1954
D15 472 30472 12/1912 ELH
W
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1952
03/1952