LSWR/SR Drummond "S11" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 395 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 396 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 397 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 398 | SAL | Salisbury | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 399 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 400 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 401 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 402 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 403 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 404 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 396 | FEL | Feltham | ELH | Eastleigh | |
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 400 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | FRA | Fratton | |
01/08/1948 | Reallocation | 403 | ELH | Eastleigh | BM | Bournemouth | |
06/10/1948 | Reallocation | 395 | FRA | Fratton | ELH | Eastleigh | |
06/10/1948 | Reallocation | 30399 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | ELH | Eastleigh | |
06/10/1948 | Reallocation | 30400 | FRA | Fratton | FRA | Fratton | |
06/10/1948 | Reallocation | 401 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | FRA | Fratton | |
06/10/1948 | Reallocation | 402 | ELH | Eastleigh | FRA | Fratton | |
06/10/1948 | Reallocation | 404 | ELH | Eastleigh | FRA | Fratton | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 30395 | ELH | Eastleigh | FRA | Fratton | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 30396 | ELH | Eastleigh | FRA | Fratton | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 30399 | ELH | Eastleigh | FRA | Fratton | |
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 30397 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | 71D | Fratton | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 30397 | 71D | Fratton | 70D | Basingstoke | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 30400 | FRA | Fratton | 70C | Guildford | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 30401 | FRA | Fratton | 70C | Guildford | |
03/1951 | Condemned | 30402 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
20/03/1951 | Reallocation | 30398 | SAL | Salisbury | 70D | Basingstoke | |
20/03/1951 | Reallocation | 30399 | FRA | Fratton | 70C | Guildford | |
09/1951 | Condemned | 30401 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
10/1951 | Condemned | 30395 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
10/1951 | Condemned | 30404 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
01/10/1951 | Condemned | 30403 | BM | Bournemouth | COND | ||
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 30396 | FRA | Fratton | 71C | Dorchester | |
08/10/1951 | Reallocation | 30396 | 71C | Dorchester | 71C | Dorchester | |
03/11/1951 | Condemned | 30396 | 71C | Dorchester | COND | ||
12/1951 | Condemned | 30397 | 70D | Basingstoke | COND | ||
12/1951 | Condemned | 30398 | 70D | Basingstoke | COND | ||
12/1951 | Condemned | 30399 | 70G | COND | |||
20/07/1953 | Reallocation | 30400 | 70C | Guildford | 70C | Guildford | |
11/1954 | Condemned | 30400 | 70C | Guildford | COND |