Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17933 Week
» 70949 Month
» 190476 Year
» 3217329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LSWR/SR Drummond "T9" Class 4-4-0
SR (1931) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
113
|
30113
|
06/1899 |
|
05/1951 |
|
51.92 |
|
|
|
52.78 |
114
|
30114
|
06/1899 |
|
05/1951 |
|
51.92 |
|
|
|
51.95 |
115
|
30115
|
07/1899 |
|
12/05/1951 |
|
51.83 |
|
|
|
51.87 |
116
|
30116
|
07/1899 |
|
05/1951 |
|
51.83 |
|
|
|
51.87 |
117
|
30117
|
07/1899 |
|
22/07/1961 |
|
62 |
|
|
|
62.13 |
118
|
30118
|
07/1899 |
|
05/1951 |
|
51.83 |
|
|
|
51.87 |
119
|
30119
|
08/1899 |
|
27/12/1952 |
|
53.33 |
|
|
|
53.54 |
120
|
30120
|
08/1899 |
|
07/1963 |
|
63.92 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
121
|
30121
|
08/1899 |
|
07/04/1951 |
|
51.67 |
|
|
|
51.70 |
122
|
30122
|
09/1899 |
|
04/1951 |
|
51.58 |
|
|
|
51.61 |
280
|
30280
|
10/1899 |
|
05/1951 |
|
51.58 |
|
|
|
57.62 |
281
|
30281
|
11/1899 |
|
12/1951 |
|
52.08 |
|
|
|
52.12 |
282
|
30282
|
11/1899 |
|
03/1954 |
|
54.33 |
|
|
|
54.70 |
283
|
30283
|
12/1899 |
|
28/12/1957 |
|
58 |
|
|
|
58.12 |
284
|
30284
|
12/1899 |
|
04/1958 |
|
58.33 |
|
|
|
58.45 |
285
|
30285
|
01/1900 |
|
08/1958 |
|
58.58 |
|
|
|
58.62 |
286
|
30286
|
01/1900 |
|
07/04/1951 |
|
51.25 |
|
|
|
51.28 |
287
|
30287
|
01/1900 |
|
16/09/1961 |
|
61.67 |
|
|
|
67.88 |
288
|
30288
|
02/1900 |
|
10/12/1960 |
|
60.83 |
|
|
|
61.28 |
289
|
30289
|
02/1900 |
|
14/11/1959 |
|
59.75 |
|
|
|
59.79 |
300
|
30300
|
12/1900 |
|
18/03/1961 |
|
60.25 |
|
|
|
60.37 |
301
|
30301
|
12/1900 |
|
29/08/1959 |
|
58.67 |
|
|
|
58.87 |
302
|
30302
|
12/1900 |
|
10/1952 |
|
51.83 |
|
|
|
52.45 |
303
|
30303
|
12/1900 |
|
05/1951 |
|
50.42 |
|
|
|
50.70 |
304
|
30304
|
12/1900 |
|
28/09/1957 |
|
56.75 |
|
|
|
56.96 |
305
|
30305
|
02/1901 |
|
05/1951 |
|
50.25 |
|
|
|
50.28 |
307
|
30307
|
02/1901 |
|
27/12/1952 |
|
51.83 |
|
|
|
52.28 |
310
|
30310
|
04/1901 |
|
30/05/1959 |
|
58.08 |
|
|
|
58.29 |
311
|
30311
|
04/1901 |
|
08/1952 |
|
51.33 |
|
|
|
|
312
|
30312
|
05/1901 |
|
03/1952 |
|
50.83 |
|
|
|
|
313
|
30313
|
09/1901 |
|
22/07/1961 |
|
59.83 |
|
|
|
60.04 |
314
|
30314
|
09/1901 |
|
05/1951 |
|
49.67 |
|
|
|
49.95 |
336
|
30336
|
10/1901 |
|
07/02/1953 |
|
51.33 |
|
|
|
51.62 |
337
|
30337
|
10/1901 |
|
11/1958 |
|
57.08 |
|
|
|
57.29 |
338
|
30338
|
10/1901 |
|
29/04/1961 |
|
59.5 |
|
|
|
59.71 |
702
|
30702
|
01/1899 |
|
24/10/1959 |
|
60.75 |
|
|
|
60.79 |
703
|
30703
|
01/1899 |
|
10/1952 |
|
53.75 |
|
|
|
53.95 |
704
|
30704
|
01/1899 |
|
06/10/1951 |
|
52.75 |
|
|
|
52.78 |
705
|
30705
|
01/1899 |
|
14/01/1958 |
|
59 |
|
|
|
59.12 |
706
|
30706
|
01/1899 |
|
23/05/1959 |
|
60.33 |
|
|
|
60.53 |
707
|
30707
|
06/1899 |
|
25/03/1961 |
|
61.75 |
|
|
|
61.96 |
708
|
30708
|
06/1899 |
|
28/12/1957 |
|
58.5 |
|
|
|
58.62 |
709
|
30709
|
06/1899 |
|
29/07/1961 |
|
62.08 |
|
|
|
62.29 |
710
|
30710
|
06/1899 |
|
14/03/1959 |
|
59.75 |
|
|
|
59.87 |
711
|
30711
|
06/1899 |
|
08/08/1959 |
|
60.17 |
|
|
|
60.29 |
712
|
30712
|
06/1899 |
|
29/11/1958 |
|
59.42 |
|
|
|
59.54 |
713
|
30713
|
06/1899 |
|
04/1951 |
|
51.83 |
|
|
|
51.87 |
714
|
30714
|
06/1899 |
|
04/1951 |
|
51.83 |
|
|
|
51.87 |
715
|
30715
|
06/1899 |
|
08/07/1961 |
|
62.08 |
|
|
|
62.21 |
716
|
30716
|
06/1899 |
|
10/1951 |
|
52.33 |
|
|
|
52.37 |
717
|
30717
|
09/1899 |
|
29/07/1961 |
|
61.83 |
|
|
|
61.96 |
718
|
30718
|
09/1899 |
|
03/1961 |
|
61.5 |
|
|
|
61.62 |
719
|
30719
|
09/1899 |
|
03/1961 |
|
61.5 |
|
|
|
61.62 |
721
|
30721
|
09/1899 |
|
14/01/1958 |
|
58.33 |
|
|
|
58.37 |
722
|
30722
|
09/1899 |
|
04/1951 |
|
51.58 |
|
|
|
54.95 |
723
|
30723
|
09/1899 |
|
06/1951 |
|
51.75 |
|
|
|
51.78 |
724
|
30724
|
09/1899 |
|
09/05/1959 |
|
59.67 |
|
|
|
59.79 |
725
|
30725
|
10/1899 |
|
06/12/1952 |
|
53.17 |
|
|
|
53.29 |
726
|
30726
|
10/1899 |
|
29/08/1959 |
|
59.83 |
|
|
|
60.12 |
727
|
30727
|
10/1899 |
|
09/1958 |
|
58.92 |
|
|
|
59.04 |
728
|
30728
|
12/1899 |
|
10/1956 |
|
56.83 |
|
|
|
56.87 |
729
|
30729
|
12/1899 |
|
25/03/1961 |
|
61.25 |
|
|
|
61.37 |
730
|
30730
|
12/1899 |
|
31/08/1957 |
|
57.67 |
|
|
|
57.87 |
731
|
30731
|
12/1899 |
|
05/1951 |
|
51.42 |
|
|
|
51.53 |
732
|
30732
|
12/1899 |
|
10/10/1959 |
|
59.83 |
|
|
|
59.87 |
733
|
30733
|
11/1901 |
|
06/1952 |
|
50.58 |
|
|
|
|