Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 939 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14345 Week
» 67361 Month
» 186888 Year
» 3213741 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LSWR/SR Drummond "T9" Class 4-4-0
Date |
Number (at time) |
Depot (at time) |
Code |
Details |
Ref |
Link |
Fri 16/07/1954 |
30313 |
72B |
|
Brighton Works Arrivals: Period under review. |
RO 9/1954 |
|
Tue 27/07/1954 |
30282 |
Wdn |
|
Ashford Works visit: Around the works. - In yard for scrap. |
RO 9/1954 |
|
Sat 18/02/1961 |
30120 |
71A |
|
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
|
Sat 25/02/1961 |
30120 |
71A |
|
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
|
Sun 26/11/1961 |
30120 |
71A |
|
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. |
SLS 1/1962 |
|