Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 422 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 422 Week
» 23403 Month
» 386648 Year
» 463235 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Schools" Class 4-4-0


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
Schools 900 03/1930 ETON 0000   28/02/1962 10/02/1962
Schools 901 03/1930 WINCHESTER 0000   22/12/1962
Schools 902 04/1930 WELLINGTON 0000   30/12/1962
Schools 903 04/1930 CHARTERHOUSE 0000   30/12/1962
Schools 904 05/1930 LANCING 0000   07/1961
Schools 905 05/1930 TONBRIDGE 0000   31/12/1961 09/12/1961
Schools 906 06/1930 SHERBORNE 0000   23/12/1962
Schools 907 07/1930 DULWICH 0000   09/1961
Schools 908 07/1930 WESTMINSTER 0000   09/1961
Schools 909 07/1930 ST. PAUL'S 0000   28/02/1962 17/02/1962
Schools 910 11/1932 MERCHANT TAYLORS 0000   30/11/1961 25/11/1961
Schools 911 12/1932 DOVER 0000   30/12/1962
Schools 912 12/1932 DOWNSIDE 0000   01/12/1962
Schools 913 12/1932 CHRIST'S HOSPITAL 0000   01/02/1962 27/01/1962
Schools 914 12/1932 EASTBOUME 0000   07/1961
Schools 915 05/1933 BRIGHTON 0000   23/12/1962
Schools 916 12/1933 WHITGIFT 0000   30/12/1962
Schools 917 06/1933 ARDINGLY 0000   24/11/1962
Schools 918 06/1933 HURSTPIERPOINT 0000   31/10/1961 10/1961
Schools 919 06/1933 HARROW 0000   02/1961
Schools 920 10/1933 RUGBY 0000   30/11/1961 25/11/1961
Schools 921 11/1933 SHREWSBURY 0000   30/12/1962
Schools 922 12/1933 MARLBOROUGH 0000   30/11/1961 25/11/1961
Schools 923 12/1933 BRADFIELD 0000   30/12/1962
Schools 924 12/1933 HAILEYBURY 0000   01/02/1962 13/01/1962
Schools 925 04/1934 CHELTENHAM 04/1934   31/12/1962 30/12/1962
Schools 926 05/1934 REPTON 0000   30/12/1962
Schools 927 06/1934 CLIFTON 0000   01/02/1962 20/01/1962
Schools 928 06/1934 STOWE 0000   17/11/1962
Schools 929 07/1934 MALVEM 08/1934   31/12/1962 08/12/1962
Schools 930 12/1934 RADLEY 0000   30/12/1962
Schools 931 12/1934 KING'S WIMBLEDON 0000   09/1961
Schools 932 02/1935 BLUNDELLS 0000   02/1961
Schools 933 02/1935 KING'S CANTERBURY 0000   30/11/1961 11/11/1961
Schools 934 03/1935 ST. LAWRENCE 0000   30/12/1962
Schools 935 05/1935 SEVENOAKS 0000   23/12/1962
Schools 936 06/1935 CRANLEIGH 0000   23/12/1962
Schools 937 06/1935 EPSOM 0000   08/12/1962
Schools 938 07/1935 ST. OLAVE'S 0000   07/1961
Schools 939 07/1935 LEATHERHEAD 0000   06/1961