Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 422 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 422 Week
» 23403 Month
» 386648 Year
» 463235 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Schools" Class 4-4-0


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
900 30900 03/1930 10/02/1962 31.92 32.02
901 30901 03/1930 22/12/1962 32.75 33.44
902 30902 04/1930 30/12/1962 32.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 04/1964 34.02
903 30903 04/1930 30/12/1962 32.67 33.86
904 30904 05/1930 07/1961 31.17 31.36
905 30905 05/1930 09/12/1961 31.58 31.78
906 30906 06/1930 23/12/1962 32.5 32.85
907 30907 07/1930 09/1961 31.17 31.19
908 30908 07/1930 09/1961 31.17 31.27
909 30909 07/1930 17/02/1962 31.58 31.69
910 30910 11/1932 25/11/1961 29 29.19
911 30911 12/1932 30/12/1962 30 30.77
912 30912 12/1932 01/12/1962 30 30.10
913 30913 12/1932 27/01/1962 29.08 29.19
914 30914 12/1932 07/1961 28.58 28.77
915 30915 05/1933 23/12/1962 29.58 30.52
916 30916 12/1933 30/12/1962 29 29.77
917 30917 06/1933 24/11/1962 29.42 29.85
918 30918 06/1933 10/1961 28.33 28.44
919 30919 06/1933 02/1961 27.67 27.77
920 30920 10/1933 25/11/1961 28.08 28.27
921 30921 11/1933 30/12/1962 29.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 05/1964 30.52
922 30922 12/1933 25/11/1961 27.92 28.10
923 30923 12/1933 30/12/1962 29 29.68
924 30924 12/1933 13/01/1962 28.08 28.10
925 30925 04/1934 30/12/1962 28.67 Prs Preserved
926 30926 05/1934 30/12/1962 28.58 Prs Preserved
927 30927 06/1934 20/01/1962 27.58 27.77
928 30928 06/1934 17/11/1962 28.42 Prs Preserved
929 30929 07/1934 08/12/1962 Brighton 28.42 28.68
930 30930 12/1934 30/12/1962 28 29.35
931 30931 12/1934 09/1961 26.75 26.85
932 30932 02/1935 02/1961 26 26.52
933 30933 02/1935 11/11/1961 26.75 26.85
934 30934 03/1935 30/12/1962 27.75 28.44
935 30935 05/1935 23/12/1962 27.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 05/1964 29.02
936 30936 06/1935 23/12/1962 27.5 28.35
937 30937 06/1935 08/12/1962 27.5 28.02
938 30938 07/1935 07/1961 26 26.19
939 30939 07/1935 06/1961 25.92 26.19