Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 422 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 422 Week
» 23403 Month
» 386648 Year
» 463235 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Schools" Class 4-4-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Tue 20/07/1954 30903,
30918,
30927
74E,
74B,
73B
  Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
RO 9/1954  
Sat 18/02/1961 30905 70D   Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Scrap road.    
Sat 25/02/1961 30900,
30909,
30915
75A,
70C,
75B
  Ashford Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Ashford Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Ashford Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
   
Sun 26/11/1961 30918 Wdn   Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Scrap yard - intact. SLS 1/1962