Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 422 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 422 Week
» 23403 Month
» 386648 Year
» 463235 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Schools" Class 4-4-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 900     STL St Leonards  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 901     STL St Leonards  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 902     STL St Leonards  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 903     STL St Leonards  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 904     STL St Leonards  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 905     STL St Leonards  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 906     STL St Leonards  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 907     STL St Leonards  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 908     STL St Leonards  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 909     STL St Leonards  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 910     STL St Leonards  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 911     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 912     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 913     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 914     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 915     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 916     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 917     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 918     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 919     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 920     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 921     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 922     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 923     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 924     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 925     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 926     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 927     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 928     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 929     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 930     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 931     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 932     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 933     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 934     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 935     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 936     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 937     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 938     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 939     BA Bricklayers Arms  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 30906 STL St Leonards 74E St Leonards  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 30911 RAM Ramsgate 74B Ramsgate  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 30926 DOV Dover Marine 74C Dover Marine  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 30932 BA Bricklayers Arms 73B Bricklayers Arms  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 30935 BA Bricklayers Arms 73B Bricklayers Arms  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 30909 STL St Leonards 73B Bricklayers Arms  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 30922 BA Bricklayers Arms 74E St Leonards  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 30923 BA Bricklayers Arms 74E St Leonards  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 30926 74C Dover Marine 74B Ramsgate  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 30908 STL St Leonards 74E St Leonards  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 30926 74B Ramsgate 74C Dover Marine  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 30909 73B Bricklayers Arms 74E St Leonards  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 30922 74E St Leonards 74C Dover Marine  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 30923 74E St Leonards 74C Dover Marine  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30911 74B Ramsgate 74E St Leonards  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30912 RAM Ramsgate 74E St Leonards  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30919 RAM Ramsgate 74B Ramsgate  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30920 RAM Ramsgate 74B Ramsgate  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 30921 BA Bricklayers Arms 74B Ramsgate  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 30911 74E St Leonards 74E St Leonards  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 30912 74E St Leonards 74E St Leonards  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 30919 74B Ramsgate 74B Ramsgate  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 30920 74B Ramsgate 74B Ramsgate  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 30921 74B Ramsgate 74B Ramsgate  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30910 STL St Leonards 74B Ramsgate  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30922 74C Dover Marine 73B Bricklayers Arms  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30923 74C Dover Marine 73B Bricklayers Arms  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30924 DOV Dover Marine 73B Bricklayers Arms  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30925 DOV Dover Marine 73B Bricklayers Arms  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30926 74C Dover Marine 73B Bricklayers Arms  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30927 DOV Dover Marine 73B Bricklayers Arms  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30935 73B Bricklayers Arms 73B Bricklayers Arms  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30910 74B Ramsgate 74E St Leonards  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30912 74E St Leonards 74E St Leonards  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30918 74G   74B Ramsgate  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30923 73B Bricklayers Arms 74C Dover Marine  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 30924 73B Bricklayers Arms 74C Dover Marine  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 30910 74E St Leonards 74E St Leonards  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 30911 74E St Leonards 74E St Leonards  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 30912 74E St Leonards 74E St Leonards  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 30923 74C Dover Marine 74C Dover Marine  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 30924 74C Dover Marine 74C Dover Marine  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 30911 74E St Leonards 74B Ramsgate  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 30912 74E St Leonards 74B Ramsgate  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 30918 74B Ramsgate 74C Dover Marine  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 30922 73B Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 30924 74C Dover Marine 73B Bricklayers Arms  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 30922 73A Stewarts Lane 74B Ramsgate  
11/12/1952 Reallocation 30915 RAM Ramsgate 73A Stewarts Lane  
11/12/1952 Reallocation 30919 74G   74E St Leonards  
11/12/1952 Reallocation 30920 74G   74E St Leonards  
11/12/1952 Reallocation 30923 74C Dover Marine 74E St Leonards  
08/01/1953 Reallocation 30923 74E St Leonards 74C Dover Marine  
27/03/1953 Reallocation 30915 73A Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
27/03/1953 Reallocation 30918 74C Dover Marine 74B Ramsgate  
26/05/1953 Reallocation 30915 75A Brighton 73A Stewarts Lane  
26/05/1953 Reallocation 30918 74B Ramsgate 74C Dover Marine  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30911 74B Ramsgate 74B Ramsgate  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30912 74B Ramsgate 74B Ramsgate  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30915 73A Stewarts Lane 73A Stewarts Lane  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30918 74C Dover Marine 74C Dover Marine  
18/06/1954 Reallocation 30918 74C Dover Marine 74B Ramsgate  
20/04/1955 Reallocation 30920 74E St Leonards 74E St Leonards  
10/10/1955 Reallocation 30912 74B Ramsgate 74A Ashford  
01/11/1955 Reallocation 30930 BA Bricklayers Arms 74E St Leonards  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30912 74A Ashford 74B Ramsgate  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 30915 73A Stewarts Lane 74B Ramsgate  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 30923 74C Dover Marine 74E St Leonards  
01/04/1957 Reallocation 30915 74B Ramsgate 73A Stewarts Lane  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30903 STL St Leonards 70A Nine Elms  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30904 STL St Leonards 70A Nine Elms  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30905 STL St Leonards 70A Nine Elms  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30906 74E St Leonards 70A Nine Elms  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30907 STL St Leonards 70A Nine Elms  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30908 74E St Leonards 73A Stewarts Lane  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30909 74E St Leonards 73A Stewarts Lane  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30910 74E St Leonards 74B Ramsgate  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30919 74E St Leonards 74B Ramsgate  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30920 74E St Leonards 74B Ramsgate  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30921 74G   74B Ramsgate  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30923 74E St Leonards 73B Bricklayers Arms  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 30930 74E St Leonards 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/01/1958 Reallocation 30915 73A Stewarts Lane 73A Stewarts Lane  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30900 STL St Leonards 75A Brighton  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30901 STL St Leonards 75A Brighton  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30902 STL St Leonards 70A Nine Elms  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30904 70A Nine Elms 70D Basingstoke  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30905 70A Nine Elms 70D Basingstoke  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30937 BA Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30938 BA Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 30939 BA Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 30923 73B Bricklayers Arms 70D Basingstoke  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30908 73A Stewarts Lane 70D Basingstoke  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30909 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30910 74B Ramsgate 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30911 74B Ramsgate 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30912 74B Ramsgate 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30913 RAM Ramsgate 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30914 RAM Ramsgate 75A Brighton  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30915 73A Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30916 RAM Ramsgate 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30917 RAM Ramsgate 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30918 74B Ramsgate 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30919 74B Ramsgate 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30920 74B Ramsgate 73A Stewarts Lane  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30921 74B Ramsgate 73A Stewarts Lane  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30922 74B Ramsgate 73A Stewarts Lane  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30923 70D Basingstoke 73A Stewarts Lane  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30932 73B Bricklayers Arms 73F Ashford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30933 BA Bricklayers Arms 73F Ashford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30934 BA Bricklayers Arms 73F Ashford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30935 73B Bricklayers Arms 73F Ashford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30936 BA Bricklayers Arms 73F Ashford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30937 73A Stewarts Lane 73F Ashford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30938 73A Stewarts Lane 73H Dover Marine  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 30939 73A Stewarts Lane 73H Dover Marine  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 30916 70A Nine Elms 75A Brighton  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 30917 70A Nine Elms 75A Brighton  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 30903 70A Nine Elms 70C Guildford  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 30906 70A Nine Elms 70C Guildford  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 30909 70A Nine Elms 70C Guildford  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 30916 75A Brighton 75A Brighton  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 30917 75A Brighton 75A Brighton  
06/05/1960 Reallocation 30902 70A Nine Elms 75A Brighton  
06/05/1960 Reallocation 30914 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/05/1960 Reallocation 30915 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/05/1960 Reallocation 30916 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/05/1960 Reallocation 30918 70A Nine Elms 75A Brighton  
06/05/1960 Reallocation 30919 70A Nine Elms 75A Brighton  
08/07/1960 Reallocation 30938 73H Dover Marine 73F Ashford  
08/07/1960 Reallocation 30939 73H Dover Marine 73F Ashford  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 30902 75A Brighton 70A Nine Elms  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 30907 70A Nine Elms 75A Brighton  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 30911 70A Nine Elms 75A Brighton  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 30918 75A Brighton 70A Nine Elms  
02/1961 Condemned 30919 75A Brighton   COND  
02/1961 Condemned 30932 73F Ashford   COND  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 30920 73A Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 30925 73B Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 30926 73B Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 30927 73B Bricklayers Arms 70B Feltham  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 30931 BA Bricklayers Arms 70B Feltham  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 30939 73F Ashford 70B Feltham  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 30927 70B Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 30931 70B Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 30939 70B Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 30923 73A Stewarts Lane 73B Bricklayers Arms  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 30926 73A Stewarts Lane 73B Bricklayers Arms  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 30937 73F Ashford 73B Bricklayers Arms  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 30938 73F Ashford 70A Nine Elms  
06/1961 Condemned 30939 70A Nine Elms   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 30904 70D Basingstoke   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 30914 75B Redhill   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 30938 70A Nine Elms   COND  
23/08/1961 Reallocation 30921 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
23/08/1961 Reallocation 30924 73B Bricklayers Arms 75B Redhill  
23/08/1961 Reallocation 30925 73A Stewarts Lane 70D Basingstoke  
09/1961 Condemned 30907 75A Brighton   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 30908 70D Basingstoke   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 30931 70A Nine Elms   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 30918 70A Nine Elms   COND  
10/10/1961 Reallocation 30933 73F Ashford 70A Nine Elms  
10/10/1961 Reallocation 30934 73F Ashford 70D Basingstoke  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 30922 73A Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 30923 73B Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 30926 73B Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 30928 BA Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 30929 BA Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 30930 73B Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 30935 73F Ashford 70A Nine Elms  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 30936 73F Ashford 70A Nine Elms  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 30937 73B Bricklayers Arms 70A Nine Elms  
11/11/1961 Condemned 30933 70A Nine Elms   COND  
25/11/1961 Condemned 30910 70A Nine Elms   COND  
25/11/1961 Condemned 30920 75A Brighton   COND  
25/11/1961 Condemned 30922 75A Brighton   COND  
09/12/1961 Condemned 30905 70D Basingstoke   COND  
04/01/1962 Reallocation 30911 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
04/01/1962 Reallocation 30926 73A Stewarts Lane 70D Basingstoke  
04/01/1962 Reallocation 30929 73A Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
04/01/1962 Reallocation 30930 73A Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
13/01/1962 Condemned 30924 75B Redhill   COND  
20/01/1962 Condemned 30927 70A Nine Elms   COND  
27/01/1962 Condemned 30913 70A Nine Elms   COND  
01/02/1962 Reallocation 30930 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
10/02/1962 Condemned 30900 75A Brighton   COND  
17/02/1962 Condemned 30909 70C Guildford   COND  
12/05/1962 Reallocation 30925 70D Basingstoke 16D Annesley  
17/11/1962 Condemned 30928 75A Brighton   COND  
24/11/1962 Condemned 30917 75A Brighton   COND  
01/12/1962 Condemned 30912 70A Nine Elms   COND  
08/12/1962 Condemned 30929 75A Brighton   COND  
08/12/1962 Condemned 30937 70A Nine Elms   COND  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 30911 75B Redhill 75A Brighton  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 30916 75B Redhill 75A Brighton  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 30930 75B Redhill 75A Brighton  
22/12/1962 Condemned 30901 75A Brighton   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 30906 70C Guildford   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 30915 75B Redhill   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 30935 70A Nine Elms   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 30936 70A Nine Elms   COND  
30/12/1962 Condemned 30902 70A Nine Elms   COND  
30/12/1962 Condemned 30903 70C Guildford   COND  
30/12/1962 Condemned 30911 75A Brighton   COND  
30/12/1962 Condemned 30916 75A Brighton   COND  
30/12/1962 Condemned 30921 70A Nine Elms   COND  
30/12/1962 Condemned 30923 75A Brighton   COND  
30/12/1962 Condemned 30925 16D Annesley   COND  
30/12/1962 Condemned 30926 70D Basingstoke   COND  
30/12/1962 Condemned 30930 75A Brighton   COND  
30/12/1962 Condemned 30934 70D Basingstoke   COND