SR Maunsell "V" Class 4-4-0
Class | SR (1931) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Schools | 900 | 30900 | 03/1930 | STL 75A W |
St Leonards Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/06/1958 10/02/1962 |
10/02/1962 |
Schools | 901 | 30901 | 03/1930 | STL STL 75A W |
St Leonards St Leonards Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 06/06/1958 22/12/1962 |
22/12/1962 |
Schools | 902 | 30902 | 04/1930 | STL 70A 75A 70A W |
St Leonards Nine Elms Brighton Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/06/1958 06/05/1960 24/11/1960 30/12/1962 |
30/12/1962 |
Schools | 903 | 30903 | 04/1930 | STL 70A 70C W |
St Leonards Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1957 10/03/1960 30/12/1962 |
30/12/1962 |
Schools | 904 | 30904 | 05/1930 | STL 70A 70D W |
St Leonards Nine Elms Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1957 06/06/1958 08/07/1961 |
08/07/1961 |
Schools | 905 | 30905 | 05/1930 | STL 70A 70D W |
St Leonards Nine Elms Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1957 06/06/1958 09/12/1961 |
09/12/1961 |
Schools | 906 | 30906 | 06/1930 | STL 74E 70A 70C W |
St Leonards St Leonards (Re-instd) Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 12/06/1957 10/03/1960 23/12/1962 |
23/12/1962 |
Schools | 907 | 30907 | 07/1930 | STL 70A 75A W |
St Leonards Nine Elms Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1957 24/11/1960 09/09/1961 |
09/09/1961 |
Schools | 908 | 30908 | 07/1930 | STL 74E 74E 73A 70D W |
St Leonards St Leonards St Leonards Stewarts Lane Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 12/06/1957 14/06/1959 23/09/1961 |
23/09/1961 |
Schools | 909 | 30909 | 07/1930 | STL 73B 74E 73A 70A 70C W |
St Leonards Bricklayers Arms St Leonards Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/10/1950 05/02/1951 12/06/1957 14/06/1959 10/03/1960 17/02/1962 |
17/02/1962 |
Schools | 910 | 30910 | 11/1932 | STL 74B 74E 74E 74B 74E 74B 70A W |
St Leonards Ramsgate St Leonards St Leonards Ramsgate St Leonards Ramsgate Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 06/12/1951 19/03/1952 12/06/1957 14/06/1959 25/11/1961 |
25/11/1961 |
Schools | 911 | 30911 | 12/1932 | RAM 74C 74C 74B 74E 74E 74E 74E 74B 74E 74B 74B 70A 75A 75B 75A W |
Ramsgate Dover Marine Dover Marine Ramsgate St Leonards St Leonards St Leonards St Leonards Ramsgate St Leonards Ramsgate Ramsgate Nine Elms Brighton Redhill Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/02/1950 22/04/1950 17/06/1950 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 11/04/1951 08/10/1951 06/12/1951 19/03/1952 30/06/1952 20/07/1953 14/06/1959 24/11/1960 04/01/1962 17/12/1962 30/12/1962 |
30/12/1962 |
Schools | 912 | 30912 | 12/1932 | RAM 74E 74E 74E 74E 74E 74B 74E 74B 74B 74A 74B 70A W |
Ramsgate St Leonards St Leonards St Leonards St Leonards St Leonards Ramsgate St Leonards Ramsgate Ramsgate Ashford Ramsgate Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 11/04/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 06/12/1951 19/03/1952 30/06/1952 20/07/1953 10/10/1955 15/06/1956 14/06/1959 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 |
Schools | 913 | 30913 | 12/1932 | RAM 70A W |
Ramsgate Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 27/01/1962 |
27/01/1962 |
Schools | 914 | 30914 | 12/1932 | RAM 75A 75B W |
Ramsgate Brighton Redhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 06/05/1960 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
Schools | 915 | 30915 | 05/1933 | RAM BA 74B 73A 75A 73A 73A 74B 73A 73A 75A 75B W |
Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Brighton Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Brighton Redhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/09/1949 31/08/1950 11/12/1952 27/03/1953 26/05/1953 20/07/1953 17/11/1956 01/04/1957 14/01/1958 14/06/1959 06/05/1960 23/12/1962 |
23/12/1962 |
Schools | 916 | 30916 | 12/1933 | RAM RAM 70A 75A 75A 75B 75A W |
Ramsgate Ramsgate Nine Elms Brighton Brighton Redhill Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 14/06/1959 18/07/1959 05/04/1960 06/05/1960 17/12/1962 30/12/1962 |
30/12/1962 |
Schools | 917 | 30917 | 06/1933 | RAM 70A 75A 75A W |
Ramsgate Nine Elms Brighton Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 18/07/1959 05/04/1960 24/11/1962 |
24/11/1962 |
Schools | 918 | 30918 | 06/1933 | RAM BA RAM 74B 74B 74C 74B 74C 74C 74B 70A 75A 70A W |
Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Ramsgate Ramsgate Ramsgate Dover Marine Ramsgate Dover Marine Dover Marine Ramsgate Nine Elms Brighton Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 28/05/1949 12/05/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 30/06/1952 27/03/1953 26/05/1953 20/07/1953 18/06/1954 14/06/1959 06/05/1960 24/11/1960 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 |
Schools | 919 | 30919 | 06/1933 | RAM BA RAM 74B 74B 74B 74E 74B 70A 75A W |
Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Ramsgate Ramsgate Ramsgate Ramsgate St Leonards Ramsgate Nine Elms Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 28/05/1949 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 11/04/1951 12/05/1951 11/12/1952 12/06/1957 14/06/1959 06/05/1960 02/1961 |
02/1961 |
Schools | 920 | 30920 | 10/1933 | RAM BA 74B 74B 74B 74E 74E 74B 73A 75A W |
Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Ramsgate Ramsgate Ramsgate St Leonards St Leonards Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 11/04/1951 12/05/1951 11/12/1952 20/04/1955 12/06/1957 14/06/1959 10/02/1961 25/11/1961 |
25/11/1961 |
Schools | 921 | 30921 | 11/1933 | BA 74B 74B 74B 74B 73A 70A W |
Bricklayers Arms Ramsgate Ramsgate Ramsgate Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 11/04/1951 12/05/1951 12/06/1957 14/06/1959 23/08/1961 30/12/1962 |
30/12/1962 |
Schools | 922 | 30922 | 12/1933 | BA 74E 74E 74C 73B 73A 74B 73A 75A W |
Bricklayers Arms St Leonards St Leonards Dover Marine Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/10/1950 31/10/1950 05/02/1951 12/05/1951 30/06/1952 07/10/1952 14/06/1959 09/11/1961 25/11/1961 |
25/11/1961 |
Schools | 923 | 30923 | 12/1933 | BA 74E 74E 74C 73B 74C 74C 73B 74C 74E 74C 74E 73B 70D 73A 73B 75A W |
Bricklayers Arms St Leonards St Leonards Dover Marine Bricklayers Arms Dover Marine Dover Marine Bricklayers Arms Dover Marine St Leonards Dover Marine St Leonards Bricklayers Arms Basingstoke Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/10/1950 31/10/1950 05/02/1951 12/05/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 06/12/1951 19/03/1952 11/12/1952 08/01/1953 17/11/1956 12/06/1957 11/03/1959 14/06/1959 26/05/1961 09/11/1961 30/12/1962 |
30/12/1962 |
Schools | 924 | 30924 | 12/1933 | DOV 73B 74C 74C 73B 74C 73B 75B W |
Dover Marine Bricklayers Arms Dover Marine Dover Marine Bricklayers Arms Dover Marine Bricklayers Arms Redhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 06/12/1951 19/03/1952 30/06/1952 23/08/1961 13/01/1962 |
13/01/1962 |
Schools | 925 | 30925 | 04/1934 | DOV 73B 73A 70D 16D W |
Dover Marine Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Basingstoke Annesley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 10/02/1961 23/08/1961 12/05/1962 30/12/1962 |
30/12/1962 |
Schools | 926 | 30926 | 05/1934 | DOV DOV RAM 74C 74B 74B 74B 74C 73B 73A 73B 73A 70D W |
Dover Marine Dover Marine Ramsgate Dover Marine Ramsgate Ramsgate Ramsgate Dover Marine Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 15/10/1949 17/06/1950 07/10/1950 31/10/1950 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 12/05/1951 10/02/1961 26/05/1961 09/11/1961 04/01/1962 30/12/1962 |
30/12/1962 |
Schools | 927 | 30927 | 06/1934 | DOV 73B 70B 70A W |
Dover Marine Bricklayers Arms Feltham Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 10/02/1961 18/03/1961 20/01/1962 |
20/01/1962 |
Schools | 928 | 30928 | 06/1934 | BA BAT BA 75A W |
Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 28/05/1949 09/11/1961 17/11/1962 |
17/11/1962 |
Schools | 929 | 30929 | 07/1934 | BA BAT BA RAM 73B 73A 75A W |
Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 28/05/1949 15/10/1949 31/08/1950 09/11/1961 04/01/1962 08/12/1962 |
08/12/1962 |
Schools | 930 | 30930 | 12/1934 | BA 74E 73B 73A 75A 75B 75A W |
Bricklayers Arms St Leonards Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Brighton Redhill Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1955 12/06/1957 09/11/1961 04/01/1962 01/02/1962 17/12/1962 30/12/1962 |
30/12/1962 |
Schools | 931 | 30931 | 12/1934 | BA BA 70B 70A W |
Bricklayers Arms Bricklayers Arms Feltham Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 10/02/1961 18/03/1961 23/09/1961 |
23/09/1961 |
Schools | 932 | 30932 | 02/1935 | BA STL 73B 73F W |
Bricklayers Arms St Leonards Bricklayers Arms Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/09/1949 17/06/1950 14/06/1959 02/1961 |
02/1961 |
Schools | 933 | 30933 | 02/1935 | BA 73F 70A W |
Bricklayers Arms Ashford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 10/10/1961 11/11/1961 |
11/11/1961 |
Schools | 934 | 30934 | 03/1935 | BA 73F 70D W |
Bricklayers Arms Ashford Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 10/10/1961 30/12/1962 |
30/12/1962 |
Schools | 935 | 30935 | 05/1935 | BA BA STL 73B 73B 73F 70A W |
Bricklayers Arms Bricklayers Arms St Leonards Bricklayers Arms Bricklayers Arms Ashford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 26/09/1949 17/06/1950 12/05/1951 14/06/1959 09/11/1961 23/12/1962 |
23/12/1962 |
Schools | 936 | 30936 | 06/1935 | BA 73F 70A W |
Bricklayers Arms Ashford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 09/11/1961 23/12/1962 |
23/12/1962 |
Schools | 937 | 30937 | 06/1935 | BA 73A 73F 73B 70A W |
Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Ashford Bricklayers Arms Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/06/1958 14/06/1959 26/05/1961 09/11/1961 08/12/1962 |
08/12/1962 |
Schools | 938 | 30938 | 07/1935 | BA 73A 73H 73F 70A W |
Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Ashford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/06/1958 14/06/1959 08/07/1960 26/05/1961 08/07/1961 |
08/07/1961 |
Schools | 939 | 30939 | 07/1935 | BA 73A 73H 73F 70B 70A W |
Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Ashford Feltham Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/06/1958 14/06/1959 08/07/1960 10/02/1961 18/03/1961 10/06/1961 |
10/06/1961 |