Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 642 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 8383 Week
» 28825 Month
» 365671 Year
» 1587236 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Billinton "E6" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2408     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2409     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2410     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2412     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2413     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2414     NORW Norwood Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2415     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2416     NORW Norwood Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2417     NORW Norwood Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2418     NORW Norwood Junction  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 32409 ELH Eastleigh 71A Eastleigh  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 32412 BA Bricklayers Arms 71A Eastleigh  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 32416 NORW Norwood Junction 71A Eastleigh  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 32409 71A Eastleigh 73B Bricklayers Arms  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 32413 BA Bricklayers Arms 71A Eastleigh  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 32412 71A Eastleigh 73B Bricklayers Arms  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 32413 71A Eastleigh 75C Norwood Junction  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 32416 71A Eastleigh 75C Norwood Junction  
07/09/1957 Condemned 32412 73B Bricklayers Arms   COND  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 32417 NORW Norwood Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/01/1958 Reallocation 32414 NORW Norwood Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
18/01/1958 Condemned 32409 73B Bricklayers Arms   COND  
02/1958 Condemned 32413 75C Norwood Junction   COND  
24/02/1958 Reallocation 32414 73B Bricklayers Arms 73B Bricklayers Arms  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 32418 NORW Norwood Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
07/06/1958 Condemned 32414 73B Bricklayers Arms   COND  
13/10/1958 Reallocation 32417 73B Bricklayers Arms 73B Bricklayers Arms  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 32416 75C Norwood Junction 73B Bricklayers Arms  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 32410 BA Bricklayers Arms 73H Dover Marine  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 32415 BA Bricklayers Arms 73H Dover Marine  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 32416 73B Bricklayers Arms 73B Bricklayers Arms  
17/01/1961 Reallocation 32408 BA Bricklayers Arms 70B Feltham  
17/01/1961 Reallocation 32416 73B Bricklayers Arms 70B Feltham  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 32408 70B Feltham 70B Feltham  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 32416 70B Feltham 70B Feltham  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 32417 73B Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 32418 73B Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
17/06/1961 Condemned 32410 73H Dover Marine   COND  
23/09/1961 Condemned 32415 73H Dover Marine   COND  
10/02/1962 Condemned 32416 70B Feltham   COND  
01/05/1962 Reallocation 32408 70B Feltham 71A Eastleigh  
23/12/1962 Condemned 32408 71A Eastleigh   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 32417 75A Brighton   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 32418 75A Brighton   COND