Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 173 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1422 Week
» 21864 Month
» 358710 Year
» 1580275 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Billinton "E6" Class 0-6-2T


Class SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
E6 2408 32408 12/1904 BA
70B
70B
71A
W
Bricklayers Arms
Feltham
Feltham
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1961
10/02/1961
01/05/1962
23/12/1962
23/12/1962
E6 2409 32409 12/1904 ELH
71A
73B
W
Eastleigh
Eastleigh
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
12/05/1951
18/01/1958
18/01/1958
E6 2410 32410 03/1905 BA
73H
W
Bricklayers Arms
Dover Marine
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/03/1960
17/06/1961
17/06/1961
E6 2412 32412 07/1905 BA
71A
73B
W
Bricklayers Arms
Eastleigh
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
01/10/1953
07/09/1957
07/09/1957
E6 2413 32413 07/1905 BA
71A
75C
W
Bricklayers Arms
Eastleigh
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/05/1951
01/10/1953
02/1958
02/1958
E6 2414 32414 10/1905 NORW
73B
73B
W
Norwood Junction
Bricklayers Arms
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1958
24/02/1958
07/06/1958
07/06/1958
E6 2415 32415 10/1905 BA
73H
W
Bricklayers Arms
Dover Marine
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/03/1960
23/09/1961
23/09/1961
E6 2416 32416 11/1905 NORW
71A
75C
73B
73B
70B
70B
W
Norwood Junction
Eastleigh
Norwood Junction
Bricklayers Arms
Bricklayers Arms
Feltham
Feltham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
01/10/1953
18/07/1959
05/04/1960
17/01/1961
10/02/1961
10/02/1962
10/02/1962
E6 2417 32417 12/1905 NORW
73B
73B
75A
W
Norwood Junction
Bricklayers Arms
Bricklayers Arms
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1957
13/10/1958
26/05/1961
23/12/1962
23/12/1962
E6 2418 32418 12/1905 NORW
73B
75A
W
Norwood Junction
Bricklayers Arms
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1958
26/05/1961
23/12/1962
23/12/1962