SR Billinton "E5" Class 0-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2399 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2400 | 3Br | Three Bridges | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2402 | EBN | Eastbourne | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2404 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2405 | 3Br | Three Bridges | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2406 | EBN | Eastbourne | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2567 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2568 | RED | Redhill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2571 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2572 | 3Br | Three Bridges | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2573 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2574 | EBN | Eastbourne | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2575 | EBN | Eastbourne | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2583 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2584 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2585 | 3Br | Three Bridges | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2587 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2588 | EBN | Eastbourne | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2589 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2590 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2591 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2592 | RED | Redhill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2593 | 3Br | Three Bridges | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2594 | HOR | Horsham | |||
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2592 | RED | Redhill | RED | Redhill | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | 2594 | HOR | Horsham | EBN | Eastbourne | |
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 2590 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | RED | Redhill | |
01/1949 | Condemned | 32589 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | COND | ||
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 2593 | 3Br | Three Bridges | EBN | Eastbourne | |
03/1949 | Condemned | 32572 | 3Br | Three Bridges | COND | ||
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 2404 | NORW | Norwood Junction | EBN | Eastbourne | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 32574 | EBN | Eastbourne | EBN | Eastbourne | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 2400 | 3Br | Three Bridges | BTN | Brighton | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 2404 | EBN | Eastbourne | ELH | Eastleigh | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 2594 | EBN | Eastbourne | BTN | Brighton | |
30/06/1949 | Reallocation | 2573 | HOR | Horsham | 3Br | Three Bridges | |
11/1949 | Condemned | 32567 | BTN | Brighton | COND | ||
25/02/1950 | Reallocation | 32404 | ELH | Eastleigh | 75G | Eastbourne | |
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 32404 | 75G | Eastbourne | 75G | Eastbourne | |
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 2573 | 3Br | Three Bridges | 75A | Brighton | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 32584 | HOR | Horsham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 32585 | 3Br | Three Bridges | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 32587 | BTN | Brighton | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 32402 | EBN | Eastbourne | 75A | Brighton | |
09/10/1950 | Reallocation | 32584 | 75E | Three Bridges | 75E | Three Bridges | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 32402 | 75A | Brighton | 75A | Brighton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 32402 | 75A | Brighton | 75G | Eastbourne | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32399 | HOR | Horsham | 71D | Fratton | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32402 | 75G | Eastbourne | 75G | Eastbourne | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32406 | EBN | Eastbourne | 75A | Brighton | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32568 | RED | Redhill | 75B | Redhill | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32571 | HOR | Horsham | 75B | Redhill | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32585 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32587 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32588 | EBN | Eastbourne | 75A | Brighton | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32591 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | 75E | Three Bridges | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32592 | RED | Redhill | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32593 | EBN | Eastbourne | 75B | Redhill | |
02/1951 | Condemned | 32584 | 75E | Three Bridges | COND | ||
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 32399 | 71D | Fratton | 75D | Horsham | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 32406 | 75A | Brighton | 75G | Eastbourne | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 32568 | 75B | Redhill | 71D | Fratton | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 32571 | 75B | Redhill | 75G | Eastbourne | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 32588 | 75A | Brighton | 75G | Eastbourne | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 32592 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 32593 | 75B | Redhill | 75G | Eastbourne | |
03/1951 | Condemned | 32402 | 75G | Eastbourne | COND | ||
03/1951 | Condemned | 32594 | BTN | Brighton | COND | ||
11/04/1951 | Reallocation | 32590 | RED | Redhill | 70D | Basingstoke | |
13/04/1951 | Reallocation | 32590 | 70D | Basingstoke | 70D | Basingstoke | |
23/06/1951 | Condemned | 32574 | EBN | Eastbourne | COND | ||
27/06/1951 | Reallocation | 32585 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | |
09/1951 | Condemned | 32406 | 75G | Eastbourne | COND | ||
09/1951 | Condemned | 32590 | 70D | Basingstoke | COND | ||
05/09/1951 | Reallocation | 32592 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 70D | Basingstoke | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 2573 | 75A | Brighton | 75D | Horsham | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 32583 | BTN | Brighton | 75D | Horsham | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 32587 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 32591 | 75E | Three Bridges | 70D | Basingstoke | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 32593 | 75G | Eastbourne | 74C | Dover Marine | |
12/1951 | Condemned | 32404 | 75G | Eastbourne | COND | ||
12/1951 | Condemned | 32405 | 3Br | Three Bridges | COND | ||
12/1951 | Condemned | 32575 | EBN | Eastbourne | COND | ||
01/12/1951 | Condemned | 32400 | BTN | Brighton | COND | ||
06/12/1951 | Reallocation | 2573 | 75D | Horsham | 75A | Brighton | |
06/12/1951 | Reallocation | 32583 | 75D | Horsham | 75A | Brighton | |
06/12/1951 | Reallocation | 32585 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 74C | Dover Marine | |
19/03/1952 | Reallocation | 32399 | 75D | Horsham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
19/03/1952 | Reallocation | 32571 | 75G | Eastbourne | 75E | Three Bridges | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 32587 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 75A | Brighton | |
07/10/1952 | Reallocation | 32585 | 74C | Dover Marine | 75A | Brighton | |
07/10/1952 | Reallocation | 32588 | 75G | Eastbourne | 75A | Brighton | |
05/1953 | Condemned | 32592 | 70D | Basingstoke | COND | ||
26/05/1953 | Reallocation | 32399 | 75E | Three Bridges | 70D | Basingstoke | |
07/1953 | Condemned | 32399 | 70D | Basingstoke | COND | ||
20/07/1953 | Reallocation | 32571 | 75E | Three Bridges | 75B | Redhill | |
20/07/1953 | Reallocation | 32573 | 75A | Brighton | 75A | Brighton | |
08/1953 | Condemned | 32573 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
01/10/1953 | Reallocation | 32568 | 71D | Fratton | 70D | Basingstoke | |
10/12/1953 | Reallocation | 32571 | 75B | Redhill | 75E | Three Bridges | |
10/12/1953 | Reallocation | 32587 | 75A | Brighton | 70D | Basingstoke | |
12/12/1953 | Condemned | 32588 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
06/1954 | Condemned | 32585 | 75A | Brighton | COND | ||
18/06/1954 | Reallocation | 32571 | 75E | Three Bridges | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
11/1954 | Condemned | 32587 | 70D | Basingstoke | COND | ||
27/11/1954 | Condemned | 32591 | 70D | Basingstoke | COND | ||
11/12/1954 | Reallocation | 32583 | 75A | Brighton | 70D | Basingstoke | |
12/02/1955 | Condemned | 32568 | 70D | Basingstoke | COND | ||
14/01/1956 | Condemned | 32571 | 75C | Norwood Junction | COND | ||
14/01/1956 | Condemned | 32593 | 74C | Dover Marine | COND | ||
21/01/1956 | Condemned | 32583 | 70D | Basingstoke | COND |