Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 99 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1226 Week
» 12519 Month
» 277152 Year
» 1498717 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Billinton "Large Radials" Class 0-6-2T


Class SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Large Radials 2399 32399 06/1904 HOR
71D
75D
75E
70D
W
Horsham
Fratton
Horsham
Three Bridges
Basingstoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
05/02/1951
19/03/1952
26/05/1953
07/1953
07/1953
Large Radials 2400 32400 06/1904 3B
W
Three Bridges
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1951
01/12/1951
Large Radials 2402 32402 09/1904 EBN
75A
75G
W
Eastbourne
Brighton
Eastbourne
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
08/12/1950
03/1951
03/1951
Large Radials 2404 32404 10/1904 NORW
W
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1951
12/1951
Large Radials 2405 32405 11/1904 3B
W
Three Bridges
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1951
12/1951
Large Radials 2406 32406 11/1904 EBN
75A
75G
W
Eastbourne
Brighton
Eastbourne
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
05/02/1951
09/1951
09/1951
Large Radials 2567 32567 10/1902 BTN
W
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1949
11/1949
Large Radials 2568 32568 10/1902 RED
75B
71D
70D
W
Redhill
Redhill
Fratton
Basingstoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
05/02/1951
01/10/1953
12/02/1955
12/02/1955
Large Radials 2571 32571 12/1902 HOR
75B
75G
75E
75B
75E
75C
W
Horsham
Redhill
Eastbourne
Three Bridges
Redhill
Three Bridges
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
05/02/1951
19/03/1952
20/07/1953
10/12/1953
18/06/1954
14/01/1956
14/01/1956
Large Radials 2572 32572 12/1902 3B
W
Three Bridges
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1949
03/1949
Large Radials 2573 32573 02/1903 HOR
75D
75A
W
Horsham
Horsham
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
20/07/1953
08/1953
08/1953
Large Radials 2574 32574 02/1903 EBN
W
Eastbourne
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
23/06/1951
Large Radials 2575 32575 03/1903 EBN
W
Eastbourne
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1951
12/1951
Large Radials 2583 32583 11/1903 BTN
75D
70D
W
Brighton
Horsham
Basingstoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
11/12/1954
21/01/1956
21/01/1956
Large Radials 2584 32584 11/1903 HOR
75E
W
Horsham
Three Bridges
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
02/1951
02/1951
Large Radials 2585 32585 12/1903 3B
73B
73B
75F
75A
W
Three Bridges
Bricklayers Arms
Bricklayers Arms
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
08/12/1950
27/06/1951
07/10/1952
06/1954
06/1954
Large Radials 2587 32587 12/1903 BTN
73B
73B
75F
75A
70D
W
Brighton
Bricklayers Arms
Bricklayers Arms
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Basingstoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
08/12/1950
06/10/1951
30/06/1952
10/12/1953
11/1954
11/1954
Large Radials 2588 32588 12/1903 EBN
75A
75G
75A
W
Eastbourne
Brighton
Eastbourne
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
05/02/1951
07/10/1952
12/12/1953
12/12/1953
Large Radials 2589 32589 03/1904 TWW
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1949
01/1949
Large Radials 2590 32590 04/1904 TWW
70D
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Basingstoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1951
09/1951
09/1951
Large Radials 2591 32591 04/1904 TWW
75E
70D
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Three Bridges
Basingstoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
06/10/1951
27/11/1954
27/11/1954
Large Radials 2592 32592 04/1904 RED
75C
73B
70D
W
Redhill
Norwood Junction
Bricklayers Arms
Basingstoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
05/02/1951
05/09/1951
05/1953
05/1953
Large Radials 2593 32593 05/1904 3B
75B
75G
74C
W
Three Bridges
Redhill
Eastbourne
Dover Marine
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
05/02/1951
06/10/1951
14/01/1956
14/01/1956
Large Radials 2594 32594 06/1904 HOR
W
Horsham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1951
03/1951