SR Billinton "E4" Class 0-6-2T
SR (1931) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2463 | 32463 | 12/1897 | 03/10/1959 | 61.83 | 61.87 | |||||
2464 | 32464 | 12/1897 | 04/02/1956 | 58.17 | ||||||
2465 | 32465 | 04/1898 | 26/03/1955 | 56.92 | ||||||
2467 | 32467 | 05/1898 | 26/04/1958 | 59.92 | 59.96 | |||||
2468 | 32468 | 05/1898 | 20/01/1963 | 64.67 | 65.29 | |||||
2469 | 32469 | 06/1898 | 07/10/1961 | 63.33 | 63.38 | |||||
2470 | 32470 | 06/1898 | 23/06/1962 | 64 | 64.12 | |||||
2471 | 32471 | 06/1898 | 12/09/1959 | 61.25 | 61.62 | |||||
2472 | 32472 | 06/1898 | 30/06/1962 | 64 | 64.12 | |||||
2473 | 32473 | 06/1898 | 27/10/1962 | 64.33 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
2474 | 32474 | 08/1898 | 19/05/1963 | 64.75 | 64.87 | |||||
2475 | 32475 | 10/1898 | 24/06/1961 | 62.67 | 62.79 | |||||
2476 | 32476 | 10/1898 | 20/04/1957 | 58.5 | 58.62 | |||||
2479 | 32479 | 12/1898 | 02/06/1963 | 64.5 | 64.62 | |||||
2480 | 32480 | 12/1898 | 07/11/1959 | 60.92 | 60.96 | |||||
2481 | 32481 | 12/1898 | 12/04/1958 | 59.33 | 59.37 | |||||
2482 | 32482 | 12/1898 | 15/10/1955 | 56.83 | 56.95 | |||||
2484 | 32484 | 05/1899 | 17/09/1960 | 61.33 | 61.46 | |||||
2485 | 32485 | 05/1899 | 07/12/1957 | 58.58 | 58.71 | |||||
2486 | 32486 | 05/1899 | 24/01/1959 | 59.67 | 59.79 | |||||
2487 | 32487 | 06/1899 | 23/12/1962 | 63.5 | 64.21 | |||||
2488 | 32488 | 06/1899 | 08/06/1957 | 58 | 58.21 | |||||
2490 | 32490 | 06/1899 | 17/12/1955 | 56.5 | ||||||
2491 | 32491 | 09/1899 | 14/01/1961 | 61.33 | 61.46 | |||||
2492 | 32492 | 10/1899 | 04/05/1957 | 57.58 | 57.70 | |||||
2493 | 32493 | 11/1899 | 08/02/1958 | 58.25 | 58.37 | |||||
2494 | 32494 | 11/1899 | 19/09/1959 | 59.83 | 59.87 | |||||
2495 | 32495 | 11/1899 | 17/09/1960 | 60.83 | 60.87 | |||||
2496 | 32496 | 12/1899 | 29/10/1955 | 55.83 | ||||||
2497 | 32497 | 05/1900 | 07/11/1959 | 59.5 | 59.54 | |||||
2498 | 32498 | 05/1900 | 11/11/1961 | 61.5 | 61.71 | |||||
2499 | 32499 | 06/1900 | 01/06/1957 | 57 | 57.04 | |||||
2500 | 32500 | 06/1900 | 27/01/1962 | 61.58 | 61.63 | |||||
2501 | 32501 | 06/1900 | 16/07/1955 | 55.08 | 55.45 | |||||
2502 | 32502 | 06/1900 | 08/02/1958 | 57.67 | 57.79 | |||||
2503 | 32503 | 08/1900 | 14/04/1963 | 62.67 | 62.87 | |||||
2504 | 32504 | 09/1900 | 25/11/1961 | 61.17 | 61.29 | |||||
2505 | 32505 | 10/1900 | 25/03/1961 | 60.42 | 60.62 | |||||
2506 | 32506 | 10/1900 | 24/06/1961 | 60.67 | 60.79 | |||||
2507 | 32507 | 12/1900 | 02/05/1959 | 58.42 | 58.54 | |||||
2508 | 32508 | 12/1900 | 30/01/1960 | 59.08 | 59.21 | |||||
2509 | 32509 | 12/1900 | 31/03/1962 | 61.25 | 61.37 | |||||
2510 | 32510 | 12/1900 | 29/09/1962 | 61.75 | 61.87 | |||||
2511 | 32511 | 02/1901 | 15/09/1956 | 55.58 | 55.70 | |||||
2512 | 32512 | 02/1901 | 27/05/1961 | 60.25 | 60.45 | |||||
2513 | 32513 | 03/1901 | 14/01/1956 | 54.83 | ||||||
2514 | 32514 | 03/1901 | 15/09/1956 | 55.5 | 55.62 | |||||
2515 | 32515 | 04/1901 | 20/05/1961 | 60.08 | 60.29 | |||||
2516 | 32516 | 04/1901 | 15/10/1955 | 54.5 | 54.54 | |||||
2517 | 32517 | 06/1901 | 04/07/1959 | 58.08 | 58.04 | |||||
2518 | 32518 | 06/1901 | 04/06/1955 | 54 | ||||||
2519 | 32519 | 06/1901 | 12/09/1959 | 58.25 | 58.62 | |||||
2520 | 32520 | 06/1901 | 12/01/1957 | 55.58 | 56.21 | |||||
2556 | 32556 | 01/1901 | 07/10/1961 | 60.75 | 60.79 | |||||
2557 | 32557 | 09/1901 | 23/12/1962 | 61.25 | 62.12 | |||||
2558 | 32558 | 10/1901 | 01/12/1956 | 55.17 | ||||||
2559 | 32559 | 10/1901 | 02/07/1960 | 58.75 | 58.79 | |||||
2560 | 32560 | 11/1901 | 09/08/1958 | 56.75 | 56.79 | |||||
2561 | 32561 | 11/1901 | 28/04/1956 | 54.42 | ||||||
2562 | 32562 | 12/1901 | 06/08/1960 | 58.67 | 58.87 | |||||
2563 | 32563 | 12/1901 | 01/07/1961 | 59.58 | 59.71 | |||||
2564 | 32564 | 12/1901 | 23/09/1961 | 59.75 | 59.87 | |||||
2565 | 32565 | 05/1902 | 01/07/1961 | 59.17 | 59.29 | |||||
2566 | 32566 | 06/1902 | 25/04/1959 | 56.83 | 56.95 | |||||
2577 | 32577 | 06/1903 | 24/10/1959 | 56.33 | 56.62 | |||||
2578 | 32578 | 06/1903 | 22/04/1961 | 57.83 | 58.04 | |||||
2579 | 32579 | 07/1903 | 14/11/1959 | 56.33 | 56.46 | |||||
2580 | 32580 | 07/1903 | 17/04/1962 | 58.75 | 58.79 | |||||
2581 | 32581 | 09/1903 | 17/04/1962 | 58.58 | 58.62 | |||||
2582 | 32582 | 09/1903 | 29/10/1956 | 53.08 |