Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 313 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1412 Week
» 7546 Month
» 235430 Year
» 1456995 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Billinton "Radials" Class 0-6-2T


Class SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Radials 2463 32463 12/1897 BA
75D
75E
W
Bricklayers Arms
Horsham
Three Bridges
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
18/07/1959
09/1959
09/1959
Radials 2464 32464 12/1897 HOR
W
Horsham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/02/1956
04/02/1956
Radials 2465 32465 04/1898 3B
75D
W
Three Bridges
Horsham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
04/1955
04/1955
Radials 2467 32467 05/1898 BA
75D
75A
W
Bricklayers Arms
Horsham
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
10/10/1955
26/04/1958
26/04/1958
Radials 2468 32468 05/1898 BA
75A
W
Bricklayers Arms
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/03/1955
20/01/1963
20/01/1963
Radials 2469 32469 06/1898 BA
75E
W
Bricklayers Arms
Three Bridges
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/07/1959
07/10/1961
07/10/1961
Radials 2470 32470 06/1898 BTN
75E
75A
W
Brighton
Three Bridges
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/07/1959
01/05/1962
23/06/1962
23/06/1962
Radials 2471 32471 06/1898 BTN
73B
W
Brighton
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/01/1952
12/09/1959
12/09/1959
Radials 2472 32472 06/1898 BA
70A
W
Bricklayers Arms
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/07/1960
30/06/1962
30/06/1962
Radials 2473 32473 06/1898 NORW
73B
70A
W
Norwood Junction
Bricklayers Arms
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
08/07/1960
27/10/1962
27/10/1962
Radials 2474 32474 08/1898 BA
75E
75A
W
Bricklayers Arms
Three Bridges
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/10/1961
01/05/1962
19/05/1963
19/05/1963
Radials 2475 32475 10/1898 NHN
W
Newhaven
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/06/1961
24/06/1961
Radials 2476 32476 10/1898 NORW
70A
W
Norwood Junction
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1953
20/04/1957
20/04/1957
Radials 2479 32479 12/1898 NORW
71D
75C
75A
W
Norwood Junction
Fratton
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/01/1952
26/11/1959
05/04/1960
02/06/1963
02/06/1963
Radials 2480 32480 12/1898 3B
75D
75A
W
Three Bridges
Horsham
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
22/03/1958
07/11/1959
07/11/1959
Radials 2481 32481 12/1898 NORW
75E
75A
W
Norwood Junction
Three Bridges
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1951
11/03/1955
12/04/1958
12/04/1958
Radials 2482 32482 12/1898 NHN
HOR
75E
75E
75A
W
Newhaven
Horsham
Three Bridges
Three Bridges
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/06/1949
06/10/1951
20/07/1953
06/11/1954
11/1955
11/1955
Radials 2484 32484 05/1899 3B
75C
75E
75A
W
Three Bridges
Norwood Junction
Three Bridges
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1954
08/02/1955
10/10/1955
17/09/1960
17/09/1960
Radials 2485 32485 05/1899 EBN
75A
W
Eastbourne
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1952
07/12/1957
07/12/1957
Radials 2486 32486 05/1899 BTN
71A
72B
70A
W
Brighton
Eastleigh
Salisbury
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/03/1952
30/06/1952
17/11/1956
24/01/1959
24/01/1959
Radials 2487 32487 06/1899 GFD
70C
70A
W
Guildford
Guildford
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
24/02/1958
23/12/1962
23/12/1962
Radials 2488 32488 06/1899 TON
W
Tonbridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/06/1957
08/06/1957
Radials 2490 32490 06/1899 FRA
W
Fratton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/12/1955
17/12/1955
Radials 2491 32491 09/1899 BTN
70A
70D
71A
W
Brighton
Nine Elms
Basingstoke
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/10/1955
27/01/1956
17/11/1956
14/01/1961
14/01/1961
Radials 2492 32492 10/1899 NHN
70A
W
Newhaven
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/10/1955
04/05/1957
04/05/1957
Radials 2493 32493 11/1899 NORW
W
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
08/02/1958
Radials 2494 32494 11/1899 NHN
W
Newhaven
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/09/1959
19/09/1959
Radials 2495 32495 11/1899 NORW
71D
70A
70F
75C
75A
W
Norwood Junction
Fratton
Nine Elms
Fratton
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/01/1952
10/10/1955
19/12/1955
26/11/1959
05/04/1960
17/09/1960
17/09/1960
Radials 2496 32496 12/1899 HOR
NHN
75A
75C
75A
W
Horsham
Newhaven
Brighton
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/06/1949
13/11/1950
12/05/1951
06/10/1951
11/1955
11/1955
Radials 2497 32497 05/1900 3B
70A
W
Three Bridges
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1951
07/11/1959
07/11/1959
Radials 2498 32498 05/1900 NORW
70A
W
Norwood Junction
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
11/11/1961
11/11/1961
Radials 2499 32499 06/1900 NHN
70A
W
Newhaven
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
01/06/1957
01/06/1957
Radials 2500 32500 06/1900 GFD
W
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1962
27/01/1962
Radials 2501 32501 06/1900 HOR
70A
70E
W
Horsham
Nine Elms
Reading (S.R.)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
05/09/1951
08/1955
08/1955
Radials 2502 32502 06/1900 NORW
70A
70E
70D
75A
W
Norwood Junction
Nine Elms
Reading (S.R.)
Basingstoke
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
12/05/1951
08/02/1955
17/11/1956
08/02/1958
08/02/1958
Radials 2503 32503 08/1900 TON
75A
W
Tonbridge
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/09/1955
14/04/1963
14/04/1963
Radials 2504 32504 09/1900 GFD
W
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1961
25/11/1961
Radials 2505 32505 10/1900 BTN
71D
70C
70A
W
Brighton
Fratton
Guildford
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1953
10/10/1955
06/05/1960
25/03/1961
25/03/1961
Radials 2506 32506 10/1900 NORW
75A
72B
70C
70A
71A
W
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Salisbury
Guildford
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/05/1951
27/06/1951
16/09/1955
06/05/1960
17/01/1961
24/06/1961
24/06/1961
Radials 2507 32507 12/1900 RED
75B
75A
W
Redhill
Redhill
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/03/1952
22/03/1958
04/1959
04/1959
Radials 2508 32508 12/1900 NHN
W
Newhaven
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1960
30/01/1960
Radials 2509 32509 12/1900 FRA
75C
75F
75A
W
Fratton
Norwood Junction
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/11/1959
05/04/1960
18/03/1961
31/03/1962
31/03/1962
Radials 2510 32510 12/1900 ELH
W
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/09/1962
29/09/1962
Radials 2511 32511 02/1901 HOR
75A
W
Horsham
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/05/1951
10/1956
10/1956
Radials 2512 32512 02/1901 TWW
75B
75A
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Redhill
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
10/10/1955
27/05/1961
27/05/1961
Radials 2513 32513 03/1901 BTN
W
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1956
14/01/1956
Radials 2514 32514 03/1901 BTN
W
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1956
10/1956
Radials 2515 32515 04/1901 HOR
75A
W
Horsham
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/01/1952
20/05/1961
20/05/1961
Radials 2516 32516 04/1901 3B
75A
W
Three Bridges
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/04/1955
15/10/1955
15/10/1955
Radials 2517 32517 06/1901 RED
75F
W
Redhill
Tunbridge Wells West
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1952
06/1959
06/1959
Radials 2518 32518 06/1901 EBN
75A
W
Eastbourne
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1952
04/06/1955
04/06/1955
Radials 2519 32519 06/1901 3B
75A
W
Three Bridges
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1958
12/09/1959
12/09/1959
Radials 2520 32520 06/1901 3B
W
Three Bridges
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/01/1957
12/01/1957
Radials 2556 32556 01/1901 HOR
W
Horsham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1961
09/1961
Radials 2557 32557 09/1901 HOR
73B
73B
70A
W
Horsham
Bricklayers Arms
Bricklayers Arms
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/06/1958
13/10/1958
09/11/1961
23/12/1962
23/12/1962
Radials 2558 32558 10/1901 BTN
71C
W
Brighton
Dorchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/02/1954
11/1956
11/1956
Radials 2559 32559 10/1901 FRA
W
Fratton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1960
06/1960
Radials 2560 32560 11/1901 RED
70A
W
Redhill
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1957
08/1958
08/1958
Radials 2561 32561 11/1901 NORW
W
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1956
06/1956
Radials 2562 32562 12/1901 FRA
75A
W
Fratton
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/06/1956
06/08/1960
06/08/1960
Radials 2563 32563 12/1901 NORW
70A
71A
W
Norwood Junction
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1956
17/01/1961
08/1961
08/1961
Radials 2564 32564 12/1901 BA
75E
W
Bricklayers Arms
Three Bridges
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/03/1960
23/09/1961
23/09/1961
Radials 2565 32565 05/1902 BA
W
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1961
06/1961
Radials 2566 32566 06/1902 BTN
W
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/04/1959
25/04/1959
Radials 2577 32577 06/1903 BTN
W
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/10/1959
24/10/1959
Radials 2578 32578 06/1903 BA
74D
74E
74D
75A
W
Bricklayers Arms
Tonbridge
St Leonards
Tonbridge
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1953
11/12/1954
08/02/1955
23/08/1960
22/04/1961
22/04/1961
Radials 2579 32579 07/1903 NORW
W
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/11/1959
14/11/1959
Radials 2580 32580 07/1903 TON
75A
W
Tonbridge
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1959
17/04/1962
17/04/1962
Radials 2581 32581 09/1903 TWW
75F
75A
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/06/1951
18/03/1961
17/04/1962
17/04/1962
Radials 2582 32582 09/1903 TWW
70E
75E
75F
75F
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Reading (S.R.)
Three Bridges
Tunbridge Wells West
Tunbridge Wells West
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
08/12/1950
20/03/1951
12/05/1951
29/10/1956
29/10/1956