Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 263 Today
» 812 Yesterday
» 5912 Week
» 13978 Month
» 155932 Year
» 1040313 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Billinton "Small Radials" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2165     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2166     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2167     NORW Norwood Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2168     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2169     NORW Norwood Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2170     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2453     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2454     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2455     NORW Norwood Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2456     NORW Norwood Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2457     NORW Norwood Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2458     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2459     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2460     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2461     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2462     BA Bricklayers Arms  
05/1949 Condemned 32457 NORW Norwood Junction   COND  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 32455 NORW Norwood Junction 74D Tonbridge  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 32455 74D Tonbridge 73B Bricklayers Arms  
20/03/1951 Reallocation 32169 NORW Norwood Junction 75A Brighton  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 32170 BA Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 32169 75A Brighton 75A Brighton  
27/06/1951 Reallocation 32168 BA Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
21/01/1952 Reallocation 32167 NORW Norwood Junction 75A Brighton  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 32166 BA Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
13/08/1952 Reallocation 32453 BA Bricklayers Arms 71A Eastleigh  
13/08/1952 Reallocation 32460 BA Bricklayers Arms 71A Eastleigh  
11/12/1952 Reallocation 32165 BA Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 32453 71A Eastleigh 73B Bricklayers Arms  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 32454 BA Bricklayers Arms 74D Tonbridge  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 32460 71A Eastleigh 73B Bricklayers Arms  
29/10/1953 Reallocation 32168 75A Brighton 70E Reading (S.R.)  
20/08/1954 Reallocation 32455 73B Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
20/04/1955 Reallocation 32165 75A Brighton 75D Horsham  
20/04/1955 Reallocation 32166 75A Brighton 75D Horsham  
20/04/1955 Reallocation 32170 75A Brighton 75D Horsham  
08/1955 Condemned 32169 75A Brighton   COND  
08/1955 Condemned 32453 73B Bricklayers Arms   COND  
10/1955 Condemned 32167 75A Brighton   COND  
01/1956 Condemned 32168 70E Reading (S.R.)   COND  
27/01/1956 Reallocation 32170 75D Horsham 70E Reading (S.R.)  
04/1956 Condemned 32460 73B Bricklayers Arms   COND  
06/1956 Condemned 32459 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 32165 75D Horsham 75A Brighton  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 32166 75D Horsham 75A Brighton  
03/1957 Condemned 32458 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
04/1957 Condemned 32461 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
01/04/1957 Reallocation 32170 70E Reading (S.R.) 73B Bricklayers Arms  
01/04/1957 Reallocation 32454 74D Tonbridge 73B Bricklayers Arms  
05/1957 Condemned 32462 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
07/1957 Condemned 32170 73B Bricklayers Arms   COND  
02/1958 Condemned 32455 73A Stewarts Lane   COND  
03/1958 Condemned 32454 73B Bricklayers Arms   COND  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 32165 75A Brighton 75C Norwood Junction  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 32166 75A Brighton 75C Norwood Junction  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 32456 NORW Norwood Junction 75C Norwood Junction  
08/1959 Condemned 32456 75C Norwood Junction   COND  
09/1959 Condemned 32166 75C Norwood Junction   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 32165 75C Norwood Junction   COND