Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 578 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 1538 Week
» 17936 Month
» 77395 Year
» 961776 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Billinton "Small Radials" Class 0-6-2T


Class SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Small Radials 2165 32165 11/1894 BA
75A
75D
75A
75C
W
Bricklayers Arms
Brighton
Horsham
Brighton
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1952
20/04/1955
17/11/1956
11/03/1959
11/1959
11/1959
Small Radials 2166 32166 11/1894 BA
75A
75D
75A
75C
W
Bricklayers Arms
Brighton
Horsham
Brighton
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/06/1952
20/04/1955
17/11/1956
11/03/1959
09/1959
09/1959
Small Radials 2167 32167 12/1894 NORW
75A
W
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/01/1952
10/1955
10/1955
Small Radials 2168 32168 12/1894 BA
75A
70E
W
Bricklayers Arms
Brighton
Reading (S.R.)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/06/1951
29/10/1953
01/1956
01/1956
Small Radials 2169 32169 12/1894 NORW
75A
75A
W
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/03/1951
12/05/1951
08/1955
08/1955
Small Radials 2170 32170 12/1894 BA
75A
75D
70E
73B
W
Bricklayers Arms
Brighton
Horsham
Reading (S.R.)
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1951
20/04/1955
27/01/1956
01/04/1957
07/1957
07/1957
Small Radials 2453 32453 04/1895 BA
71A
73B
W
Bricklayers Arms
Eastleigh
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/08/1952
20/07/1953
08/1955
08/1955
Small Radials 2454 32454 05/1895 BA
74D
73B
W
Bricklayers Arms
Tonbridge
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1953
01/04/1957
03/1958
03/1958
Small Radials 2455 32455 05/1895 NORW
74D
73B
73A
W
Norwood Junction
Tonbridge
Bricklayers Arms
Stewarts Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
05/02/1951
20/08/1954
02/1958
02/1958
Small Radials 2456 32456 05/1895 NORW
75C
W
Norwood Junction
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/07/1959
08/1959
08/1959
Small Radials 2457 32457 12/1895 NORW
W
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1949
05/1949
Small Radials 2458 32458 12/1895 BA
W
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1957
03/1957
Small Radials 2459 32459 12/1895 BA
W
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1956
06/1956
Small Radials 2460 32460 12/1895 BA
71A
73B
W
Bricklayers Arms
Eastleigh
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/08/1952
20/07/1953
04/1956
04/1956
Small Radials 2461 32461 12/1895 BA
W
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1957
04/1957
Small Radials 2462 32462 12/1895 BA
W
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1957
05/1957