Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 641 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 8382 Week
» 28824 Month
» 365670 Year
» 1587235 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR "757" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 757     PLY Plymouth Friary  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 758     PLY Plymouth Friary  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30757 PLY Plymouth Friary 71A Eastleigh  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 30758 PLY Plymouth Friary 71A Eastleigh  
22/12/1956 Condemned 30758 71A Eastleigh   COND  
14/12/1957 Condemned 30757 71A Eastleigh   COND