Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 674 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1801 Week
» 13094 Month
» 277727 Year
» 1499292 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR "757" Class 0-6-2T


Class SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
757 757 30757 1907 PLY
71A
W
Plymouth Friary
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/06/1956
14/12/1957
14/12/1957
757 758 30758 1907 PLY
71A
W
Plymouth Friary
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/06/1956
22/12/1956
22/12/1956