Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 145 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5723 Week
» 25456 Month
» 322470 Year
» 399057 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR "USA" Class 0-6-0T


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
61 30061 1942 20/10/1962 Southampton Docks 20.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1967
62 30062 1942 01/12/1962 Southampton Docks 21 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1968
63 30063 1942 02/06/1962 Southampton Docks 20.5
64 30064 1943 07/1967 Eastleigh 24.58 Prs Preserved
65 30065 1943 06/10/1962 Southampton Docks 19.83 Prs Preserved
66 30066 1942 30/12/1962 Southampton Docks 21 Cut Cohens (at Eastleigh Depot) 06/1965
67 30067 1942 07/1967 Eastleigh 25.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1966
68 30068 1943 03/1964 Eastleigh 21.25
69 30069 1943 07/1967 Eastleigh 24.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1968
70 30070 1943 06/10/1962 Southampton Docks 19.83 Prs Preserved
71 30071 1943 07/1967 Eastleigh 24.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1968
72 30072 1943 07/1967 24.58 Prs Preserved
73 30073 1943 01/1967 Eastleigh 24.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967
74 30074 1943 03/1963 Southampton Docks 20.25 Cut Cohens (at Eastleigh Depot) 08/1965