Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 422 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 422 Week
» 23403 Month
» 386648 Year
» 463235 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR "USA" Class 0-6-0T


Class SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
USA 61 30061 1942 SOT
W
Southampton Docks
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1962
20/10/1962
USA 62 30062 1942 SOT
W
Southampton Docks
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1962
01/12/1962
USA 63 30063 1942 SOT
W
Southampton Docks
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/06/1962
02/06/1962
USA 64 30064 1943 SOT
71A
91W
70D
W
Southampton Docks
Eastleigh
To Western Region / GWR
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/06/1963
22/08/1966
17/10/1966
07/1967
07/1967
USA 65 30065 1943 SOT
W
Southampton Docks
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1962
06/10/1962
USA 66 30066 1942 SOT
W
Southampton Docks
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/12/1962
30/12/1962
USA 67 30067 1942 SOT
71A
W
Southampton Docks
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/06/1963
07/1967
07/1967
USA 68 30068 1943 SOT
71A
W
Southampton Docks
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/06/1963
03/1964
03/1964
USA 69 30069 1943 SOT
71A
W
Southampton Docks
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/06/1963
07/1967
07/1967
USA 70 30070 1943 SOT
W
Southampton Docks
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1962
06/10/1962
USA 71 30071 1943 SOT
71A
W
Southampton Docks
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/06/1963
07/1967
07/1967
USA 72 30072 1943 SOT
70C
W
Southampton Docks
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/03/1963
07/1967
07/1967
USA 73 30073 1943 SOT
71A
W
Southampton Docks
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/06/1963
01/1967
01/1967
USA 74 30074 1943 SOT
W
Southampton Docks
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1963
03/1963