Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 146 Today
» 963 Yesterday
» 146 Week
» 23284 Month
» 188184 Year
» 699286 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LSWR/SR Drummond "Black Motors" Class 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 306     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 308     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 309     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 315     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 316     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 317     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 325     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 326     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 327     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 339     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 346     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 350     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 352     GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 355     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 368     BAS Basingstoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 687     FEL Feltham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 688     FEL Feltham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 689     FEL Feltham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 690     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 691     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 692     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 693     BAS Basingstoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 694     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 695     DOR Dorchester  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 696     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 697     FEL Feltham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 698     FEL Feltham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 699     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 700     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 701     9E Nine Elms  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 30355 SAL Salisbury 70D Basingstoke  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 30355 70D Basingstoke 70C Guildford  
11/04/1951 Reallocation 30693 BAS Basingstoke 70B Feltham  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30339 9E Nine Elms 70B Feltham  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 30355 70C Guildford 70B Feltham  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 30693 70B Feltham 71B Bournemouth  
05/09/1951 Reallocation 30693 71B Bournemouth 70C Guildford  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 30697 FEL Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 30698 FEL Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
29/10/1953 Reallocation 30350 ELH Eastleigh 70C Guildford  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 30690 SAL Salisbury 71B Bournemouth  
11/12/1954 Reallocation 30309 70G   72B Salisbury  
11/12/1954 Reallocation 30315 SAL Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/12/1954 Reallocation 30327 GFD Guildford 72B Salisbury  
11/12/1954 Reallocation 30691 SAL Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/04/1955 Reallocation 30697 70A Nine Elms 70C Guildford  
20/04/1955 Reallocation 30700 BM Bournemouth 70C Guildford  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 30327 72B Salisbury 72B Salisbury  
10/10/1955 Reallocation 30698 70A Nine Elms 70C Guildford  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 30306 ELH Eastleigh 71B Bournemouth  
01/04/1957 Reallocation 30306 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
09/1957 Condemned 30688 FEL Feltham   COND  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 30315 72A Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 30317 SAL Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 30327 72B Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 30692 9E Nine Elms 72B Salisbury  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 30700 70C Guildford 70C Guildford  
06/1959 Condemned 30352 GFD Guildford   COND  
09/1960 Condemned 30687 FEL Feltham   COND  
17/01/1961 Reallocation 30690 71B Bournemouth 70C Guildford  
02/1961 Condemned 30355 70B Feltham   COND  
05/1961 Condemned 30327 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
06/1961 Condemned 30694 9E Nine Elms   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 30317 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 30691 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 30693 70C Guildford   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 30699 9E Nine Elms   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 30701 9E Nine Elms   COND  
08/1961 Condemned 30696 BM Bournemouth   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 30308 GFD Guildford   COND  
10/10/1961 Reallocation 30689 FEL Feltham 72A Exmouth Junction  
10/10/1961 Reallocation 30697 70C Guildford 72A Exmouth Junction  
10/10/1961 Reallocation 30700 70C Guildford 72A Exmouth Junction  
09/11/1961 Reallocation 30695 DOR Dorchester 71A Eastleigh  
04/01/1962 Reallocation 30325 GFD Guildford 75A Brighton  
04/01/1962 Reallocation 30326 GFD Guildford 75A Brighton  
04/01/1962 Reallocation 30339 70B Feltham 70C Guildford  
04/01/1962 Reallocation 30346 GFD Guildford 70C Guildford  
01/02/1962 Reallocation 30325 75A Brighton 70C Guildford  
01/02/1962 Reallocation 30326 75A Brighton 70C Guildford  
01/02/1962 Reallocation 30339 70C Guildford 70B Feltham  
01/02/1962 Reallocation 30346 70C Guildford 70B Feltham  
03/02/1962 Condemned 30692 72B Salisbury   COND  
10/02/1962 Condemned 30326 70C Guildford   COND  
24/03/1962 Condemned 30350 70C Guildford   COND  
21/04/1962 Condemned 30306 71A Eastleigh   COND  
19/05/1962 Condemned 30339 70B Feltham   COND  
19/05/1962 Condemned 30698 70C Guildford   COND  
17/11/1962 Condemned 30346 70B Feltham   COND  
17/11/1962 Condemned 30689 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
17/11/1962 Condemned 30697 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
17/11/1962 Condemned 30700 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 30309 72B Salisbury   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 30315 72B Salisbury   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 30316 ELH Eastleigh   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 30325 70C Guildford   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 30368 BAS Basingstoke   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 30690 70C Guildford   COND  
23/12/1962 Condemned 30695 71A Eastleigh   COND