Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 399 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 399 Week
» 17199 Month
» 333430 Year
» 844532 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LSWR/SR Drummond "Black Motors" Class 0-6-0


Class SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Black Motors 306 30306 05/1901 ELH
71B
71A
W
Eastleigh
Bournemouth
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
01/04/1957
21/04/1962
21/04/1962
Black Motors 308 30308 05/1897 GFD
W
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1961
09/1961
Black Motors 309 30309 05/1901 GFD

72B
W
Guildford

Salisbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/05/1951
11/12/1954
23/12/1962
23/12/1962
Black Motors 315 30315 05/1897 SAL
72A
72B
W
Salisbury
Exmouth Junction
Salisbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1954
22/03/1958
23/12/1962
23/12/1962
Black Motors 316 30316 08/1897 ELH
W
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/12/1962
23/12/1962
Black Motors 317 30317 05/1897 SAL
72A
W
Salisbury
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1958
07/1961
07/1961
Black Motors 325 30325 06/1897 GFD
75A
70C
W
Guildford
Brighton
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/01/1962
01/02/1962
23/12/1962
23/12/1962
Black Motors 326 30326 06/1897 GFD
75A
70C
W
Guildford
Brighton
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/01/1962
01/02/1962
10/02/1962
10/02/1962
Black Motors 327 30327 06/1897 GFD
72B
72B
72A
W
Guildford
Salisbury
Salisbury
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1954
21/06/1955
11/03/1959
05/1961
05/1961
Black Motors 339 30339 06/1897 9E
70B
70C
70B
W
Nine Elms
Feltham
Guildford
Feltham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/05/1951
04/01/1962
01/02/1962
19/05/1962
19/05/1962
Black Motors 346 30346 08/1897 GFD
70C
70B
W
Guildford
Guildford
Feltham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/01/1962
01/02/1962
17/11/1962
17/11/1962
Black Motors 350 30350 08/1897 ELH
70C
W
Eastleigh
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/10/1953
24/03/1962
24/03/1962
Black Motors 352 30352 08/1897 GFD
W
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1959
06/1959
Black Motors 355 30355 08/1897 SAL
70D
70C
70B
W
Salisbury
Basingstoke
Guildford
Feltham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1950
05/02/1951
12/05/1951
02/1961
02/1961
Black Motors 368 30368 08/1897 BAS
W
Basingstoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/12/1962
23/12/1962
Black Motors 687 30687 03/1897 FEL
W
Feltham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1960
09/1960
Black Motors 688 30688 03/1897 FEL
W
Feltham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1957
09/1957
Black Motors 689 30689 03/1897 FEL
72A
W
Feltham
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/10/1961
17/11/1962
17/11/1962
Black Motors 690 30690 03/1897 SAL
71B
70C
W
Salisbury
Bournemouth
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
17/01/1961
23/12/1962
23/12/1962
Black Motors 691 30691 03/1897 SAL
72A
W
Salisbury
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1954
07/1961
07/1961
Black Motors 692 30692 03/1897 9E
72B
W
Nine Elms
Salisbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/03/1959
03/02/1962
03/02/1962
Black Motors 693 30693 03/1897 BAS
70B
71B
70C
W
Basingstoke
Feltham
Bournemouth
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1951
27/07/1951
05/09/1951
07/1961
07/1961
Black Motors 694 30694 03/1897 9E
W
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1961
06/1961
Black Motors 695 30695 03/1897 DOR
71A
W
Dorchester
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/11/1961
23/12/1962
23/12/1962
Black Motors 696 30696 03/1897 BM
W
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1961
08/1961
Black Motors 697 30697 04/1897 FEL
70A
70C
72A
W
Feltham
Nine Elms
Guildford
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1953
20/04/1955
10/10/1961
17/11/1962
17/11/1962
Black Motors 698 30698 04/1897 FEL
70A
70C
W
Feltham
Nine Elms
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1953
10/10/1955
19/05/1962
19/05/1962
Black Motors 699 30699 05/1897 9E
W
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1961
07/1961
Black Motors 700 30700 05/1897 BM
70C
70C
72A
W
Bournemouth
Guildford
Guildford
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/04/1955
11/03/1959
10/10/1961
17/11/1962
17/11/1962
Black Motors 701 30701 05/1897 9E
W
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1961
07/1961