Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 366 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4226 Week
» 6808 Month
» 271441 Year
» 1493006 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

73 Bo-Bo


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
ED's 73004 06/07/1962 The Bluebell Railway 19/09/1987   09/1990
ED's 73005 04/08/1962 Mid Hants - Watercress Line 09/1988  
ED's 73101 13/10/1965 Brighton Evening Argus 03/12/1980  
ED's 73100 13/10/1965 Brighton Evening Argus 03/12/1980  
ED's 73109 01/1966 Battle of Britain - 50th Anniversary 08/09/1990  
ED's 73116 03/1966 Selhurst 09/1986 Named during a staff open day held to mark the completion and full opening of the new EMU/locomotive Level 4 inspection facility.
ED's 73210 03/1966 Selhurst 09/1986 Named during a staff open day held to mark the completion and full opening of the new EMU/locomotive Level 4 inspection facility.
ED's 73118 03/1966 The Romney Hythe and Dymchurch Railway 08/05/1987 The nameplate was, at the time, the largest on any BR locomotive.
ED's 73125 05/1966 Stewarts Lane 1860-1985 22/09/1985 Plates were cast at Swindon and fitted on 20th September at Stewarts Lane depot under the supervision of M&EE representative Lee Chatfield.
ED's 73204 05/1966 Stewarts Lane 1860-1985 22/09/1985 Plates were cast at Swindon and fitted on 20th September at Stewarts Lane depot under the supervision of M&EE representative Lee Chatfield.
ED's 73126 06/1966 Kent & East Sussex Light Railway 23/05/1991 The locomotive had to be transported by road from Sevington to Northiam, the first time an operational BR locomotive had visited a private railway that was not rail connected.
ED's 73133 08/1966 The Bluebell Railway 06/09/1990  
ED's 73134 19/09/1966 Woking Homes 1885-1985 19/10/1985  
ED's 73138 11/1966 Post Haste - 150 Years of Travelling Post Offices 16/05/1988  
ED's 73142 01/01/1967 Broadlands 25/09/1980 Lord Mountbatten was killed by an IRA bomb on 27th August 1979 while aboard his yacht off the Irish coast. This locomotive was used to haul his funeral train ECS from Clapham Junction to Waterloo on 5th September 1979 and was subsequently named in honour of it's role.
ED's 73201 01/01/1967 Broadlands 25/09/1980 Lord Mountbatten was killed by an IRA bomb on 27th August 1979 while aboard his yacht off the Irish coast. This locomotive was used to haul his funeral train ECS from Clapham Junction to Waterloo on 5th September 1979 and was subsequently named in honour of it's role.