Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 445 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4305 Week
» 6887 Month
» 271520 Year
» 1493085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

73 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
E6001 73001 01/02/1962 Prs Preserved 58.45
E6002 73002 12/03/1962 Prs Preserved 58.34
E6003 73003 27/04/1962 Prs Preserved 58.22
E6004 73004 06/07/1962 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 02/2004 41.64 The Bluebell Railway
E6005 73005 04/08/1962 Prs Preserved 57.95 Mid Hants - Watercress Line
E6006 73006 17/11/1962 Prs Preserved 57.66