Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 359 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4219 Week
» 6801 Month
» 271434 Year
» 1492999 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

73 Bo-Bo


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sun 27/10/1968 E6004,
E6009,
E6035,
E6036
??,
75D,
??,
??
  Hither Green depot: On shed
Hither Green depot: On shed
Hither Green depot: On shed
Hither Green depot: On shed
RO 12/1968  
Sun 27/07/1969 E6012 75D   Crewe Works visit: Paint shop RO 9/1969  
Sun 27/07/1969 E6013,
E6025
75D,
75D
  Crewe Works visit: New erecting shop
Crewe Works visit: New erecting shop
RO 9/1969  
Mon 10/01/1972 E6010,
E6027
75D,
75D
  While working the 12:24 Three Bridges - Chichester Class 8 Engineer's train, in conjunction with E6010, the train's brakes failed on the approach to Horsham station. The train ran into the back of the 12:02 Victoria - Portsmouth Harbour, consisting of 4-CIG 7362 and 4-BEP 7004. Considerable damage ensued but no-one lost their lives - the driver and secondman of E6027 taking shelter in the locomotives electrical compartment when they realised that a collision was inevitable.
On investigation, the brake cocks between the two locomotives had been switched off by the secondman at Three Bridges in trying to rectify a starting fault and he had forgotten to switch them back on, resulting in the driver having no control of the train brakes.
The MoT report can be seen here.
While working the 12:24 Three Bridges - Chichester Class 8 Engineer's train, in conjunction with E6010, the train's brakes failed on the approach to Horsham station. The train ran into the back of the 12:02 Victoria - Portsmouth Harbour, consisting of 4-CIG 7362 and 4-BEP 7004. Considerable damage ensued but no-one lost their lives - the driver and secondman of E6027 taking shelter in the locomotives electrical compartment when they realised that a collision was inevitable.
On investigation, the brake cocks between the two locomotives had been switched off by the secondman at Three Bridges in trying to rectify a starting fault and he had forgotten to switch them back on, resulting in the driver having no control of the train brakes.
The MoT report can be seen here. - Condemned as a result.
  www.railwaysarchive.co.uk/documents/MoT_Horsham1972.pdf
Mon 31/01/1972 E6045 ??   ecs of 07:15 Exeter St. Davids - Waterloo brought into Waterloo with D6544 piloted by E6045 RO 4/1972