Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 930 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2269 Week
» 31767 Month
» 368613 Year
» 1590178 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

73 Bo-Bo


Class BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
73/0 6001 73901 01/02/1962      
73/0 6002 73002 12/03/1962
73/0 6003 73003 27/04/1962
73/0 6004 73004 06/07/1962
73/0 6005 73005 04/08/1962
73/0 6006 73006 17/11/1962
73/1 6007 73100 13/10/1965 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6008 73212 10/1965 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6009 73103 10/1965 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6010 73104 11/1965 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6011 73105 11/1965 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6012 73106 12/1965 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6013 73107 12/1965 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6014 73108 01/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6015 73109 01/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6016 73110 01/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6017 73111 02/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6018 73112 02/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6019 73211 02/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6020 73114 02/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6021 73115 02/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6022 73116 03/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6023 73117 03/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6024 73118 03/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6025 73119 03/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6026 73209 04/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6027   10/04/1966 70D
75D
W
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
Withdrawn
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
16/07/1972
16/07/1972
73/1 6028 73208 04/1966 70D
75D
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
73/1 6029 73207 05/1966      
73/1 6030 73206 05/1966      
73/1 6031 73124 05/1966      
73/1 6032 73204 05/1966      
73/1 6033 73126 06/1966      
73/1 6034 73203 06/1966      
73/1 6035 73128 06/1966      
73/1 6036 73129 07/1966      
73/1 6037 73130 07/1966      
73/1 6038 73131 08/1966      
73/1 6039 73132 08/1966      
73/1 6040 73133 08/1966      
73/1 6041 73134 19/09/1966      
73/1 6042 73135 19/09/1966      
73/1 6043 73136 09/1966      
73/1 6044 73137 09/1966      
73/1 6045 73138 11/1966      
73/1 6046 73139 11/1966      
73/1 6047 73140 11/1966      
73/1 6048 73141 01/01/1967      
73/1 6049 73201 01/01/1967