31 A1A-A1A
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (31/1) | BR (31/4) | BR (31/0) | BR (Dept) | BR (97/2) | BR (31/9) | BR (31/5) | BR (31/4 (2)) | BR (31/5 (2)) | BR (31/6) | Date To Service | Bld | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D5532 | 31114 | 31453 | 31553 | 04/06/1959 | BH | 14/11/1967 from 30 |
Norwich Thorpe | 01/11/1995 | 36.42 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 12/2001 | 42.56 | |||||||||
D5555 | 31137 | 31444 | 31544 | 31444 | 01/10/1959 | BH | 05/1967 from 30 |
Ipswich | 01/12/1995 | 36.17 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 03/2001 | 41.48 | ||||||||
D5557 | 31139 | 31438 | 31538 | 15/10/1959 | BH | 03/1965 from 30 |
Ipswich | 01/09/1995 | 35.92 | Prs | Preserved | 64.24 | ||||||||||
D5566 | 31148 | 31448 | 31548 | 19/11/1959 | BH | 05/1967 from 30 |
Stratford | 01/07/1995 | 35.67 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 06/2001 | 41.60 | |||||||||
D5575 | 31157 | 31424 | 31524 | 23/12/1959 | BH | 25/04/1968 from 30 |
Norwich Thorpe | 01/05/1996 | 36.42 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 08/2006 | 46.68 | |||||||||
D5579 | 31161 | 31400 | 07/01/1960 | BH | 25/05/1968 from 30 |
Stratford | 01/07/1991 | 31.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1993 | 33.63 | ||||||||||
D5603 | 31182 | 31437 | 31537 | 31437 | 31/03/1960 | BH | 04/1967 from 30 |
Hornsey | 63.78 | |||||||||||||
D5617 | 31193 | 31426 | 31526 | 31426 | 19/05/1960 | BH | 05/1967 from 30 |
Stratford | 01/05/1995 | 35 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 11/2006 | 46.52 | ||||||||
D5637 | 31213 | 31465 | 31565 | 31465 | 28/07/1960 | BH | 25/08/1967 from 30 |
Stratford | 63.45 | |||||||||||||
D5640 | 31407 | 31507 | 18/08/1960 | BH | 24/09/1966 from 30 |
Finsbury Park | 31/05/2006 | 45.75 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 10/2006 | 46.19 | ||||||||||
D5645 | 31220 | 31441 | 31541 | 01/09/1960 | BH | 03/1965 from 30 |
Finsbury Park | 01/03/1996 | 35.5 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Old Oak Common MPD) | 02/2002 | 41.48 | |||||||||
D5654 | 31228 | 31454 | 31554 | 31454 | 29/09/1960 | BH | 18/11/1967 from 30 |
Finsbury Park | 63.28 | |||||||||||||
D5663 | 31236 | 31433 | 31533 | 31433 | 03/11/1960 | BH | 03/1967 from 30 |
March | 01/07/1995 | 34.67 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 09/2006 | 45.90 | ||||||||
D5674 | 31246 | 31455 | 31555 | 31455 | 01/12/1960 | BH | 18/11/1967 from 30 |
Finsbury Park | 01/09/1996 | 35.75 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 02/2000 | 39.23 | ||||||||
D5681 | 31253 | 31431 | 31531 | 05/01/1961 | BH | 08/1965 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/01/1995 | 34 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 07/2003 | 42.55 | |||||||||
D5691 | 31411 | 31511 | 16/03/1961 | BH | 05/1966 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 30/11/2005 | 44.67 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 11/2005 | 44.70 | ||||||||||
D5692 | 31412 | 31512 | 23/03/1961 | BH | 05/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 31/05/2006 | 45.17 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 10/2006 | 45.59 | ||||||||||
D5695 | 31265 | 31430 | 31530 | 20/04/1961 | BH | 06/11/1968 from 30 |
Stratford | Prs | Preserved | 62.73 | ||||||||||||
D5697 | 31267 | 31419 | 31519 | 11/05/1961 | BH | 26/06/1965 from 30 |
Stratford | 01/12/1995 | 34.58 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 03/2001 | 39.87 | |||||||||
D5807 | 31277 | 31469 | 31569 | 20/07/1961 | BH | 07/1966 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/02/1995 | 33.58 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 06/2003 | 41.93 | |||||||||
D5809 | 31279 | 31452 | 31552 | 31452 | 27/07/1961 | BH | 07/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 62.46 | |||||||||||||
D5814 | 31414 | 31514 | 14/09/1961 | BH | 06/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/02/1999 | 37.42 | Prs | Preserved | 62.32 | |||||||||||
D5823 | 31291 | 31456 | 31556 | 31456 | 31556 | 16/11/1961 | BH | 06/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | Prs | Preserved | 48.20 | ||||||||||
D5828 | 31295 | 31447 | 31547 | 28/12/1961 | BH | 06/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/01/1996 | 34.08 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 11/2002 | 40.91 | |||||||||
D5830 | 31297 | 31463 | 31563 | 11/01/1962 | BH | 10/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/02/1998 | 36.08 | Prs | Preserved | 62.00 | ||||||||||
D5833 | 31300 | 31445 | 31545 | 15/02/1962 | BH | 08/12/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/05/1997 | 35.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 10/2002 | 40.69 | |||||||||
D5836 | 31303 | 31458 | 31558 | 31458 | 12/04/1962 | BH | 01/1968 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/01/1996 | 33.75 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 12/2005 | 43.71 | ||||||||
D5840 | 31307 | 31449 | 31549 | 31449 | 10/05/1962 | BH | 13/11/1965 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/03/1996 | 33.83 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 02/2005 | 42.80 | ||||||||
D5842 | 31416 | 31516 | 24/05/1962 | BH | 06/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/10/1995 | 33.42 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 10/2001 | 39.42 | ||||||||||
D5844 | 31310 | 31422 | 31522 | 07/06/1962 | BH | 11/09/1965 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 61.59 | ||||||||||||||
D5850 | 31316 | 31446 | 31546 | 18/07/1962 | BH | 04/1965 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/11/1995 | 33.33 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 04/2003 | 40.77 | |||||||||
D5852 | 31318 | 31451 | 31551 | 02/08/1962 | BH | 30/11/1967 from 30 |
Sheffield Darnall | 01/03/1996 | 33.58 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) | 09/1998 | 36.15 | |||||||||
D5855 | 31321 | 31468 | 31568 | 31468 | 30/08/1962 | BH | 08/1965 from 30 |
March | 61.36 |