Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4253 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17659 Week
» 70675 Month
» 190202 Year
» 3217055 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
26 Bo-Bo
Class |
BR (Pre Tops) |
BR (Tops) |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
26/0 |
D5300
|
26007
|
30/07/1958 |
04/10/1993 |
Slow Speed Control fitted
|
12/1966 |
26/0 |
D5301
|
26001
|
12/09/1958 |
04/10/1993 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
12/1966 |
26/0 |
D5302
|
26002
|
02/10/1958 |
09/10/1992 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
12/1966 |
26/0 |
D5303
|
26003
|
17/10/1958 |
04/10/1993 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
12/1966 |
26/0 |
D5304
|
26004
|
31/10/1958 |
24/11/1992 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
12/1966 |
26/0 |
D5305
|
26005
|
14/11/1958 |
04/10/1993 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
12/1966 |
26/0 |
D5306
|
26006
|
28/11/1958 |
06/09/1993 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
12/1966 |
26/0 |
D5314
|
26014
|
30/01/1959 |
09/10/1992 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
01/1977 |
26/0 |
D5315
|
26015
|
13/03/1959 |
23/06/1991 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
08/1976 |
26/1 |
D5324
|
26024
|
08/05/1959 |
09/10/1992 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
09/1981 |
26/1 |
D5330
|
26030
|
19/06/1959 |
18/03/1985 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
08/1976 |
26/1 |
D5332
|
26032
|
02/07/1959 |
04/10/1993 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
30/10/1970 |
26/1 |
D5335
|
26035
|
24/07/1959 |
10/12/1992 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
10/1975 |
26/1 |
D5338
|
26038
|
28/08/1959 |
19/10/1992 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
08/1976 |
26/1 |
D5341
|
26041
|
18/09/1959 |
24/11/1992 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
09/1975 |
26/1 |
D5342
|
26042
|
25/09/1959 |
09/10/1992 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
08/1976 |
26/1 |
D5343
|
26043
|
02/10/1959 |
19/01/1993 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
09/1975 |
26/1 |
D5344
|
26044
|
09/10/1959 |
17/01/1984 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
09/1981 |
26/1 |
D5345
|
26045
|
23/10/1959 |
04/07/1983 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
09/1975 |
26/1 |
D5346
|
26046
|
30/10/1959 |
19/04/1991 |
Headlight(s) fitted |
09/1975 |