Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1232 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 8973 Week
» 29415 Month
» 366261 Year
» 1587826 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Clayton 17 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D8586 11/12/1964 CL Haymarket 21/09/1971 6.75 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 07/1973 8.60
D8587 05/02/1965 CL Haymarket 06/10/1971 6.67 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 02/1974 9.03