Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 62 Today
» 890 Yesterday
» 62 Week
» 24724 Month
» 283583 Year
» 794685 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Clayton 17 Bo-Bo


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Tue 25/12/1962 D8508,
D8510
66A,
66A
  D8508/10 worked a Mossend - Carmyle freight
D8508/10 worked a Mossend - Carmyle freight
MR 4/1963  
Wed 15/05/1963 D8531 66A   Worked the "Hielan Piper" freight at Bonnybridge MR 7/1963  
Mon 03/06/1963 D8531 66A   Stabled on Polmadie MPD Green Diesel Days - Huntriss  
Mon 08/07/1963 D8534,
D8537
66A,
66A
  D8534/7 worked a Ravenscraig No 3 Works - Gartcosh strip steel freight
D8534/7 worked a Ravenscraig No 3 Works - Gartcosh strip steel freight
MR 10/1963  
Mon 15/07/1963 D8522,
D8538
66A,
66A
  D8522/38 worked the Saturday 10:15 Law Junction - Ayr passenger
D8522/38 worked the Saturday 10:15 Law Junction - Ayr passenger
MR 10/1963  
Sun 28/03/1965 D8605,
D8609,
D8611
41A,
41A,
41A
  Noted on Barrow Hill depot
Noted on Barrow Hill depot
Noted on Barrow Hill depot
Bill Wright  
Sun 18/04/1965 D8508 66A   Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - With collision damage, badly stoved in nose - green with small yellow panel. Keith Long  
Sun 23/05/1965 D8611 41E   Noted on shed at Langwith Junction Peter Rigby  
Sun 05/11/1967 D8562,
D8567,
D8568,
D8574,
D8586,
D8606,
D8612
64B,
64B,
64B,
64B,
64B,
64B,
64B
  Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
RCTS 1/1968  
Wed 03/04/1968 D8533,
D8548
66A,
66A
  Diversion due to derailment at Shawfield saw D8533 and D8548 work the "Night Limited" from Motherwell to Glasgow
Diversion due to derailment at Shawfield saw D8533 and D8548 work the "Night Limited" from Motherwell to Glasgow
RCTS 6/1968  
Sat 13/04/1968 D8595 52A   Glasgow Works visit: On works at Glasgow RCTS 6/1968  
Fri 24/05/1968 D8537,
D8543
66A,
66A
  On Polmadie depot - On shed - green with small yellow panel. Blue star multiple fitting.
On Polmadie depot - On shed, in blue with full yellow ends
   
Sat 19/10/1968 D8586 64B   Glasgow Works visit: In Works - Outside the works RO 12/1968  
Sun 15/06/1969 D8548 66A   Corkerhill depot: On shed RO 9/1969  
Sat 05/07/1969 D8556,
D8560,
D8564
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Birds scrapyard, Long Marston: In scrapyard
Birds scrapyard, Long Marston: In scrapyard
Birds scrapyard, Long Marston: In scrapyard
RO 9/1969  
Wed 09/07/1969 D8577 Wdn   In Millerhill yard, en route to a scrapyard RO 9/1969  
Sun 13/07/1969 D8504,
D8525,
D8536,
D8540,
D8543,
D8544,
D8551,
D8552,
D8554,
D8555,
D8565,
D8571,
D8573,
D8578
66A,
66A,
66A,
66A,
66A,
Wdn,
66A,
66A,
Wdn,
66A,
66A,
Wdn,
66A,
Wdn
  Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
RO 10/1969  
Thu 17/07/1969 D8592 52A   Glasgow Works visit: In Works RO 9/1969  
Thu 17/07/1969 D8502,
D8508,
D8515,
D8535,
D8542,
D8545,
D8546,
D8557,
D8558,
D8561,
D8567,
D8573
66A,
66A,
66A,
66A,
66A,
66A,
66A,
66A,
66A,
66A,
66A,
66A
  Motherwell depot: On shed
Motherwell depot: On shed
Motherwell depot: On shed
Motherwell depot: On shed
Motherwell depot: On shed
Motherwell depot: On shed
Motherwell depot: On shed
Motherwell depot: On shed
Motherwell depot: On shed
Motherwell depot: On shed
Motherwell depot: On shed
Motherwell depot: On shed
RO 9/1969  
Fri 18/07/1969 D8580,
D8612,
D8613
64B,
64B,
64B
  Bathgate: On shed
Bathgate: On shed
Bathgate: On shed
RO 9/1969  
Sat 26/07/1969 D8547,
D8556,
D8560,
D8564,
D8576
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  At Birds, Long Marston: In scrapyard
At Birds, Long Marston: In scrapyard
At Birds, Long Marston: In scrapyard
At Birds, Long Marston: In scrapyard
At Birds, Long Marston: In scrapyard
RO489 11/69  
Sun 03/08/1969 D8592 52A   Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works RO 10/1969  
Sat 20/09/1969 D8501,
D8503,
D8503,
D8506,
D8507,
D8509,
D8510,
D8511,
D8514,
D8516,
D8517,
D8518,
D8519,
D8520,
D8522,
D8523,
D8524,
D8526,
D8527,
D8528,
D8529,
D8531,
D8532,
D8533,
D8534,
D8577
Wdn,
98S,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
D10,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead
RO489 11/69  
Sat 01/05/1971 D8510 Wdn   On Polmadie depot - On shed - blue livery    
Sat 01/05/1971 D8559 66A   On Motherwell depot - On shed, green with full yellow ends    
Fri 20/08/1971 D8539,
D8540
66A,
66A
  Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Active on shed - green with full yellow ends.
Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Outside the shed - BR blue livery with yellow ends.
Keith Long  
Thu 14/10/1971 D8512 Wdn   Worked a test train consisting of APT POP vehicles (open frame) on the Old Dalby test track http://www.old-dalby.com/apt-e.htm