Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 117 Today
» 1044 Yesterday
» 3383 Week
» 20034 Month
» 213878 Year
» 724980 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Clayton 17 Bo-Bo


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
10/09/1962 To Service 8500   NEW 66A Polmadie  
06/10/1962 To Service 8502   NEW 66A Polmadie  
10/10/1962 To Service 8501   NEW 66A Polmadie  
10/10/1962 To Service 8503   NEW 66A Polmadie  
17/10/1962 To Service 8504   NEW 66A Polmadie  
17/10/1962 To Service 8505   NEW 66A Polmadie  
24/10/1962 To Service 8506   NEW 66A Polmadie  
30/10/1962 To Service 8507   NEW 66A Polmadie  
30/10/1962 To Service 8508   NEW 66A Polmadie  
13/11/1962 To Service 8509   NEW 66A Polmadie  
13/11/1962 To Service 8510   NEW 66A Polmadie  
22/11/1962 To Service 8511   NEW 66A Polmadie  
07/12/1962 To Service 8512   NEW 66A Polmadie  
07/12/1962 To Service 8513   NEW 66A Polmadie  
19/04/1963 To Service 8516   NEW 66A Polmadie  
19/04/1963 To Service 8518   NEW 66A Polmadie  
26/04/1963 To Service 8530   NEW 66A Polmadie  
08/05/1963 To Service 8531   NEW 66A Polmadie  
17/05/1963 To Service 8520   NEW 66A Polmadie  
17/05/1963 To Service 8529   NEW 66A Polmadie  
12/06/1963 To Service 8534   NEW 66A Polmadie  
12/06/1963 To Service 8537   NEW 66A Polmadie  
12/06/1963 To Service 8539   NEW 66A Polmadie  
21/06/1963 To Service 8538   NEW 66A Polmadie  
29/06/1963 To Service 8517   NEW 66A Polmadie  
29/06/1963 To Service 8541   NEW 66A Polmadie  
03/07/1963 To Service 8522   NEW 66A Polmadie  
09/07/1963 To Service 8514   NEW 66A Polmadie  
09/07/1963 To Service 8523   NEW 66A Polmadie  
16/07/1963 To Service 8524   NEW 66A Polmadie  
18/07/1963 To Service 8519   NEW 66A Polmadie  
18/07/1963 To Service 8535   NEW 66A Polmadie  
23/07/1963 To Service 8521   NEW 66A Polmadie  
23/07/1963 To Service 8528   NEW 66A Polmadie  
29/07/1963 To Service 8532   NEW 66A Polmadie  
03/08/1963 To Service 8515   NEW 66A Polmadie  
03/08/1963 To Service 8533   NEW 66A Polmadie  
14/08/1963 To Service 8525   NEW 66A Polmadie  
20/08/1963 To Service 8526   NEW 66A Polmadie  
20/08/1963 To Service 8540   NEW 66A Polmadie  
29/08/1963 To Service 8527   NEW 66A Polmadie  
29/08/1963 To Service 8536   NEW 66A Polmadie  
06/09/1963 To Service 8542   NEW 66A Polmadie  
07/09/1963 Reallocation 8500 66A Polmadie 52H Tyne Dock  
07/09/1963 Reallocation 8501 66A Polmadie 52H Tyne Dock  
07/09/1963 Reallocation 8536 66A Polmadie 52H Tyne Dock  
10/09/1963 To Service 8543   NEW 66A Polmadie  
10/09/1963 To Service 8544   NEW 66A Polmadie  
14/09/1963 Reallocation 8501 52H Tyne Dock 56B Ardsley  
14/09/1963 Reallocation 8536 52H Tyne Dock 56B Ardsley  
17/09/1963 To Service 8545   NEW 66A Polmadie  
17/09/1963 To Service 8546   NEW 66A Polmadie  
27/09/1963 To Service 8547   NEW 66A Polmadie  
27/09/1963 To Service 8548   NEW 66A Polmadie  
30/09/1963 Reallocation 8500 52H Tyne Dock 66A Polmadie  
05/10/1963 Reallocation 8501 56B Ardsley 66A Polmadie  
05/10/1963 Reallocation 8536 56B Ardsley 66A Polmadie  
05/10/1963 Reallocation 8545 66A Polmadie 64H Leith Central  
08/10/1963 To Service 8549   NEW 66A Polmadie  
08/10/1963 To Service 8551   NEW 66A Polmadie  
17/10/1963 To Service 8552   NEW 66A Polmadie  
17/10/1963 To Service 8553   NEW 66A Polmadie  
24/10/1963 To Service 8554   NEW 64B Haymarket  
29/10/1963 To Service 8555   NEW 64B Haymarket  
29/10/1963 To Service 8556   NEW 64B Haymarket  
08/11/1963 To Service 8550   NEW 66A Polmadie  
08/11/1963 To Service 8557   NEW 64B Haymarket  
08/11/1963 To Service 8558   NEW 64B Haymarket  
12/11/1963 To Service 8559   NEW 64B Haymarket  
12/11/1963 To Service 8560   NEW 64B Haymarket  
22/11/1963 To Service 8561   NEW 64B Haymarket  
22/11/1963 To Service 8562   NEW 64B Haymarket  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 8545 64H Leith Central 66A Polmadie  
20/12/1963 To Service 8563   NEW 64B Haymarket  
20/12/1963 To Service 8564   NEW 64B Haymarket  
21/12/1963 To Service 8565   NEW 64B Haymarket  
21/12/1963 To Service 8566   NEW 64B Haymarket  
06/01/1964 To Service 8567   NEW 64B Haymarket  
06/01/1964 To Service 8568   NEW 64B Haymarket  
10/01/1964 To Service 8569   NEW 64B Haymarket  
10/01/1964 To Service 8570   NEW 64B Haymarket  
20/01/1964 To Service 8571   NEW 64B Haymarket  
20/01/1964 To Service 8572   NEW 64B Haymarket  
30/01/1964 To Service 8573   NEW 64B Haymarket  
30/01/1964 To Service 8574   NEW 64B Haymarket  
12/02/1964 To Service 8575   NEW 64B Haymarket  
12/02/1964 To Service 8576   NEW 64B Haymarket  
18/02/1964 To Service 8577   NEW 64B Haymarket  
03/03/1964 To Service 8578   NEW 64B Haymarket  
03/03/1964 To Service 8579   NEW 64B Haymarket  
11/03/1964 To Service 8580   NEW 64B Haymarket  
20/03/1964 To Service 8588   NEW 51L Thornaby  
24/03/1964 To Service 8581   NEW 64B Haymarket  
31/03/1964 To Service 8582   NEW 64B Haymarket  
17/04/1964 To Service 8583   NEW 64B Haymarket  
04/05/1964 To Service 8589   NEW 51L Thornaby  
12/05/1964 To Service 8590   NEW 51L Thornaby  
12/05/1964 To Service 8592   NEW 52A Gateshead  
14/05/1964 To Service 8585   NEW 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1964 To Service 8584   NEW 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1964 To Service 8593   NEW 52A Gateshead  
03/07/1964 To Service 8594   NEW 52A Gateshead  
08/07/1964 To Service 8591   NEW 51L Thornaby  
21/07/1964 To Service 8595   NEW 52A Gateshead  
21/07/1964 To Service 8597   NEW 52A Gateshead  
28/07/1964 To Service 8596   NEW 52A Gateshead  
06/08/1964 To Service 8598   NEW 52A Gateshead  
06/08/1964 To Service 8600   NEW 52A Gateshead  
28/08/1964 To Service 8599   NEW 52A Gateshead  
02/09/1964 To Service 8601   NEW 52A Gateshead  
07/09/1964 To Service 8603   NEW 52A Gateshead  
09/09/1964 To Service 8602   NEW 52A Gateshead  
15/09/1964 To Service 8604   NEW 41A Tinsley  
01/10/1964 To Service 8605   NEW 41A Tinsley  
05/10/1964 To Service 8606   NEW 41A Tinsley  
16/10/1964 To Service 8607   NEW 41A Tinsley  
27/10/1964 To Service 8608   NEW 41A Tinsley  
23/11/1964 To Service 8609   NEW 41A Tinsley  
07/12/1964 To Service 8610   NEW 41A Tinsley  
11/12/1964 To Service 8586   NEW 64B Haymarket  
17/12/1964 To Service 8611   NEW 41A Tinsley  
22/01/1965 To Service 8613   NEW 41A Tinsley  
27/01/1965 To Service 8612   NEW 41A Tinsley  
05/02/1965 To Service 8587   NEW 64B Haymarket  
11/02/1965 To Service 8614   NEW 41A Tinsley  
10/03/1965 To Service 8615   NEW 41A Tinsley  
10/04/1965 Reallocation 8604 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
10/04/1965 Reallocation 8605 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
10/04/1965 Reallocation 8606 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
10/04/1965 Reallocation 8607 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
10/04/1965 Reallocation 8608 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
10/04/1965 Reallocation 8609 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
10/04/1965 Reallocation 8610 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
10/04/1965 Reallocation 8611 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
10/04/1965 Reallocation 8612 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
10/04/1965 Reallocation 8613 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
10/04/1965 Reallocation 8614 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
10/04/1965 Reallocation 8615 41A Tinsley 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
23/04/1965 To Service 8616   NEW 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
28/05/1966 Reallocation 8604 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1966 Reallocation 8605 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1966 Reallocation 8606 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1966 Reallocation 8607 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1966 Reallocation 8608 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1966 Reallocation 8609 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1966 Reallocation 8610 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1966 Reallocation 8611 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1966 Reallocation 8612 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1966 Reallocation 8613 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1966 Reallocation 8614 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1966 Reallocation 8615 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64B Haymarket  
28/05/1966 Reallocation 8616 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64B Haymarket  
16/07/1966 Reallocation 8588 51L Thornaby 52A Gateshead  
16/07/1966 Reallocation 8589 51L Thornaby 52A Gateshead  
16/07/1966 Reallocation 8590 51L Thornaby 52A Gateshead  
16/07/1966 Reallocation 8591 51L Thornaby 52A Gateshead  
24/06/1967 Reallocation 8552 66A Polmadie 64B Haymarket  
24/06/1967 Reallocation 8553 66A Polmadie 64B Haymarket  
24/06/1967 Reallocation 8604 64B Haymarket 52A Gateshead  
24/06/1967 Reallocation 8605 64B Haymarket 52A Gateshead  
19/08/1967 Reallocation 8500 66A Polmadie 66A Carlisle Kingmoor  
19/08/1967 Reallocation 8501 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
19/08/1967 Reallocation 8502 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
19/08/1967 Reallocation 8503 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
26/08/1967 Reallocation 8501 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 91M To London Midland Region  
26/08/1967 Reallocation 8502 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 91M To London Midland Region  
26/08/1967 Reallocation 8503 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 91M To London Midland Region  
26/08/1967 Reallocation 8552 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
26/08/1967 Reallocation 8553 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
26/08/1967 Reallocation 8554 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
26/08/1967 Reallocation 8555 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
26/08/1967 Reallocation 8556 64B Haymarket 64B Haymarket  
26/08/1967 Reallocation 8556 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
09/1967 Reallocation 8500 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
09/09/1967 Reallocation 8504 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
09/09/1967 Reallocation 8505 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
09/09/1967 Reallocation 8506 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
30/09/1967 Reallocation 8504 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 91M To London Midland Region  
30/09/1967 Reallocation 8505 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 91M To London Midland Region  
30/09/1967 Reallocation 8556 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
30/09/1967 Reallocation 8556 66A Polmadie 66A Polmadie  
30/09/1967 Reallocation 8557 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
30/09/1967 Reallocation 8558 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
30/09/1967 Reallocation 8559 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
10/1967 Reallocation 8506 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
14/10/1967 Reallocation 8507 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
14/10/1967 Reallocation 8508 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
14/10/1967 Reallocation 8509 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
14/10/1967 Reallocation 8512 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
14/10/1967 Reallocation 8514 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
21/10/1967 Reallocation 8513 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
28/10/1967 Reallocation 8515 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
04/11/1967 Reallocation 8516 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
11/11/1967 Reallocation 8518 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
11/11/1967 Reallocation 8519 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
25/11/1967 Reallocation 8510 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
25/11/1967 Reallocation 8511 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
25/11/1967 Reallocation 8516 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 91M To London Midland Region  
25/11/1967 Reallocation 8517 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
12/1967 Reallocation 8510 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
12/1967 Reallocation 8511 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
12/1967 Reallocation 8517 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
12/1967 Reallocation 8518 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
12/1967 Reallocation 8519 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
16/12/1967 Reallocation 8520 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
30/12/1967 Reallocation 8520 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 91M To London Midland Region  
30/12/1967 Reallocation 8560 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
30/12/1967 Reallocation 8604 52A Gateshead 91N To North Eastern Region  
30/12/1967 Reallocation 8605 52A Gateshead 91N To North Eastern Region  
13/01/1968 Reallocation 8521 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
13/01/1968 Reallocation 8522 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
13/01/1968 Reallocation 8523 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
13/01/1968 Reallocation 8524 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
13/01/1968 Reallocation 8525 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
27/01/1968 Reallocation 8561 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
24/02/1968 Reallocation 8601 52A Gateshead 51L Thornaby  
24/02/1968 Reallocation 8602 52A Gateshead 51L Thornaby  
24/02/1968 Reallocation 8604 91N To North Eastern Region 51L Thornaby  
24/02/1968 Reallocation 8605 91N To North Eastern Region 51L Thornaby  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8526 66A Polmadie 91M To London Midland Region  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8526 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8527 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8527 66A Polmadie 91M To London Midland Region  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8528 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8528 66A Polmadie 91M To London Midland Region  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8529 66A Polmadie 91M To London Midland Region  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8529 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8530 66A Polmadie 91M To London Midland Region  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8530 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8531 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8531 66A Polmadie 91M To London Midland Region  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8532 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8532 66A Polmadie 91M To London Midland Region  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8562 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 8563 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
27/04/1968 Reallocation 8599 52A Gateshead 51L Thornaby  
27/04/1968 Reallocation 8600 52A Gateshead 51L Thornaby  
27/04/1968 Reallocation 8603 52A Gateshead 51L Thornaby  
11/05/1968 Reallocation 8533 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
11/05/1968 Reallocation 8534 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
01/06/1968 Reallocation 8564 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
01/06/1968 Reallocation 8565 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
01/06/1968 Reallocation 8566 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
01/06/1968 Reallocation 8567 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8500 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8501 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8502 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8503 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8504 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8505 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8506 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8507 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8508 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8509 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8510 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8511 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8512 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8513 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8514 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8515 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8516 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8517 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8518 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8519 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8520 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8521 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8522 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8523 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8524 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8525 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8526 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8526 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8527 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8527 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8528 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8528 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8529 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8529 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8530 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8530 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8531 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8531 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8532 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8532 91M To London Midland Region D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8533 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 8534 12A Carlisle Kingmoor D10 Preston Division  
21/07/1968 Condemned 8537 66A Polmadie   COND  
28/09/1968 Reallocation 8568 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
28/09/1968 Reallocation 8569 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
28/09/1968 Reallocation 8570 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8501 D10 Preston Division   COND  
12/10/1968 Reallocation 8502 D10 Preston Division 64B Haymarket  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8509 D10 Preston Division   COND  
12/10/1968 Reallocation 8510 D10 Preston Division 98S Carlisle Kingmoor  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8511 D10 Preston Division   COND  
12/10/1968 Reallocation 8515 D10 Preston Division 64B Haymarket  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8517 D10 Preston Division   COND  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8518 D10 Preston Division   COND  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8519 D10 Preston Division   COND  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8520 D10 Preston Division   COND  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8521 D10 Preston Division   COND  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8522 D10 Preston Division   COND  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8523 D10 Preston Division   COND  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8524 D10 Preston Division   COND  
12/10/1968 Reallocation 8525 D10 Preston Division 64B Haymarket  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8526 D10 Preston Division   COND  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8533 D10 Preston Division   COND  
12/10/1968 Condemned 8534 D10 Preston Division   COND  
13/10/1968 Condemned 8609 64B Haymarket   COND  
13/10/1968 Condemned 8611 64B Haymarket   COND  
27/10/1968 Condemned 8553 66A Polmadie   COND  
27/10/1968 Condemned 8575 64B Haymarket   COND  
28/10/1968 Condemned 8605 51L Thornaby   COND  
29/10/1968 Condemned 8584 64B Haymarket   COND  
29/10/1968 Condemned 8585 64B Haymarket   COND  
31/10/1968 Reallocation 8510 98S   D10 Preston Division  
02/11/1968 Reallocation 8512 98W   D10 Preston Division  
02/11/1968 Condemned 8514 98S     COND  
02/11/1968 Reallocation 8529 98W   D10 Preston Division  
24/11/1968 Condemned 8570 66A Polmadie   COND  
30/11/1968 Reallocation 8502 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
30/11/1968 Reallocation 8515 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
30/11/1968 Reallocation 8525 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
04/12/1968 Condemned 8566 66A Polmadie   COND  
04/12/1968 Condemned 8569 66A Polmadie   COND  
22/12/1968 Condemned 8591 52A Gateshead   COND  
22/12/1968 Condemned 8595 52A Gateshead   COND  
22/12/1968 Condemned 8596 52A Gateshead   COND  
28/12/1968 Condemned 8512 D10 Preston Division   COND  
28/12/1968 Condemned 8527 98S     COND  
28/12/1968 Condemned 8532 98S     COND  
25/01/1969 Reallocation 8571 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
25/01/1969 Reallocation 8572 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
25/01/1969 Reallocation 8573 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
25/01/1969 Condemned 8582 64B Haymarket   COND  
31/01/1969 Reallocation 8576 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
02/1969 Condemned 8547 66A Polmadie   COND  
02/1969 Condemned 8556 66A Polmadie   COND  
02/1969 Condemned 8560 66A Polmadie   COND  
02/1969 Condemned 8577 64B Haymarket   COND  
16/02/1969 Condemned 8564 66A Polmadie   COND  
28/02/1969 Condemned 8576 66A Polmadie   COND  
01/03/1969 Reallocation 8574 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
01/03/1969 Reallocation 8578 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
01/03/1969 Reallocation 8579 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
08/03/1969 Reallocation 8599 51L Thornaby 52A Gateshead  
08/03/1969 Reallocation 8600 51L Thornaby 52A Gateshead  
05/1969 Reallocation 8506 98W   66A Polmadie  
18/05/1969 Reallocation 8500 98W   66A Polmadie  
24/05/1969 Reallocation 8504 98W   66A Polmadie  
24/05/1969 Reallocation 8505 98W   66A Polmadie  
24/05/1969 Reallocation 8508 98W   66A Polmadie  
24/05/1969 Reallocation 8513 98W   66A Polmadie  
31/05/1969 Reallocation 8530 98W   66A Polmadie  
28/06/1969 Condemned 8544 66A Polmadie   COND  
28/06/1969 Condemned 8554 66A Polmadie   COND  
28/06/1969 Condemned 8571 66A Polmadie   COND  
28/06/1969 Condemned 8572 66A Polmadie   COND  
28/06/1969 Condemned 8578 66A Polmadie   COND  
30/08/1969 Reallocation 8505 66A Polmadie 64B Haymarket  
11/10/1969 Reallocation 8530 98W   64B Haymarket  
02/11/1969 Reallocation 8506 98W   66A Polmadie  
02/11/1969 Reallocation 8510 98W   64B Haymarket  
08/11/1969 Reallocation 8503 98S   66A Polmadie  
08/11/1969 Reallocation 8503 98W   66A Polmadie  
08/11/1969 Reallocation 8507 98W   64B Haymarket  
08/11/1969 Reallocation 8516 98W   64B Haymarket  
08/11/1969 Reallocation 8516 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
08/11/1969 Reallocation 8528 98W   64B Haymarket  
08/11/1969 Reallocation 8529 D10 Preston Division 64B Haymarket  
08/11/1969 Reallocation 8531 98W   64B Haymarket  
08/11/1969 Reallocation 8531 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
29/11/1969 Reallocation 8561 66A Polmadie 64B Haymarket  
29/11/1969 Reallocation 8563 66A Polmadie 64B Haymarket  
29/11/1969 Reallocation 8565 66A Polmadie 64B Haymarket  
29/11/1969 Reallocation 8579 66A Polmadie 64B Haymarket  
21/03/1970 Reallocation 8601 51L Thornaby 52A Gateshead  
09/05/1970 Reallocation 8602 51L Thornaby 52A Gateshead  
09/05/1970 Reallocation 8603 51L Thornaby 52A Gateshead  
09/05/1970 Reallocation 8604 51L Thornaby 52A Gateshead  
06/07/1970 Condemned 8589 52A Gateshead   COND  
03/03/1971 Condemned 8530 64B Haymarket   COND  
27/03/1971 Condemned 8500 66A Polmadie   COND  
27/03/1971 Condemned 8510 64B Haymarket   COND  
27/03/1971 Condemned 8535 66A Polmadie   COND  
27/03/1971 Condemned 8590 52A Gateshead   COND  
27/03/1971 Condemned 8606 64B Haymarket   COND  
01/05/1971 Reallocation 8588 52A Gateshead 64B Haymarket  
01/05/1971 Reallocation 8599 52A Gateshead 64B Haymarket  
01/05/1971 Reallocation 8600 52A Gateshead 64B Haymarket  
01/05/1971 Reallocation 8602 52A Gateshead 64B Haymarket  
01/05/1971 Reallocation 8603 52A Gateshead 64B Haymarket  
29/05/1971 Reallocation 8594 52A Gateshead 64B Haymarket  
29/05/1971 Reallocation 8597 52A Gateshead 64B Haymarket  
29/05/1971 Reallocation 8598 52A Gateshead 64B Haymarket  
29/05/1971 Reallocation 8607 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
29/05/1971 Reallocation 8608 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
29/05/1971 Reallocation 8610 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
29/05/1971 Reallocation 8612 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
29/05/1971 Reallocation 8613 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
29/05/1971 Reallocation 8614 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
29/05/1971 Reallocation 8615 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
29/05/1971 Reallocation 8616 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
12/06/1971 Reallocation 8592 52A Gateshead 64B Haymarket  
12/06/1971 Reallocation 8593 52A Gateshead 64B Haymarket  
12/06/1971 Reallocation 8601 52A Gateshead 64B Haymarket  
12/06/1971 Reallocation 8604 52A Gateshead 64B Haymarket  
21/09/1971 Condemned 8506 66A Polmadie   COND  
21/09/1971 Condemned 8513 66A Polmadie   COND  
21/09/1971 Condemned 8531 66A Polmadie   COND  
21/09/1971 Condemned 8543 66A Polmadie   COND  
21/09/1971 Condemned 8549 66A Polmadie   COND  
21/09/1971 Condemned 8555 66A Polmadie   COND  
21/09/1971 Condemned 8557 66A Polmadie   COND  
21/09/1971 Condemned 8583 64B Haymarket   COND  
21/09/1971 Condemned 8586 64B Haymarket   COND  
21/09/1971 Condemned 8592 64B Haymarket   COND  
21/09/1971 Condemned 8594 64B Haymarket   COND  
21/09/1971 Condemned 8616 66A Polmadie   COND  
04/10/1971 Condemned 8579 64B Haymarket   COND  
04/10/1971 Condemned 8588 64B Haymarket   COND  
04/10/1971 Condemned 8593 64B Haymarket   COND  
04/10/1971 Condemned 8604 64B Haymarket   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8502 66A Polmadie   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8515 66A Polmadie   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8528 64B Haymarket   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8540 66A Polmadie   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8541 66A Polmadie   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8550 66A Polmadie   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8551 66A Polmadie   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8599 64B Haymarket   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8607 66A Polmadie   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8608 66A Polmadie   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8610 66A Polmadie   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8612 66A Polmadie   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8614 66A Polmadie   COND  
05/10/1971 Condemned 8615 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8503 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8505 64B Haymarket   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8516 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8525 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8538 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8539 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8542 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8545 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8546 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8559 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8562 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8567 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8568 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8573 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8580 64B Haymarket   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8581 64B Haymarket   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8587 64B Haymarket   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8597 64B Haymarket   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8600 64B Haymarket   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8601 64B Haymarket   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8602 64B Haymarket   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8603 64B Haymarket   COND  
06/10/1971 Condemned 8613 66A Polmadie   COND  
01/11/1971 Condemned 8565 64B Haymarket   COND  
07/11/1971 Condemned 8504 66A Polmadie   COND  
07/11/1971 Condemned 8561 64B Haymarket   COND  
13/11/1971 Reallocation 8529 64B Haymarket 64B Haymarket  
13/11/1971 Reallocation 8574 66A Polmadie 66A Polmadie  
13/11/1971 Reallocation 8598 64B Haymarket 64B Haymarket  
25/12/1971 Reallocation 8507 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
25/12/1971 Reallocation 8529 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
25/12/1971 Reallocation 8563 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
25/12/1971 Reallocation 8598 64B Haymarket 66A Polmadie  
31/12/1971 Condemned 8507 66A Polmadie   COND  
31/12/1971 Condemned 8508 66A Polmadie   COND  
31/12/1971 Condemned 8529 66A Polmadie   COND  
31/12/1971 Condemned 8536 66A Polmadie   COND  
31/12/1971 Condemned 8548 66A Polmadie   COND  
31/12/1971 Condemned 8552 66A Polmadie   COND  
31/12/1971 Condemned 8558 66A Polmadie   COND  
31/12/1971 Condemned 8563 66A Polmadie   COND  
31/12/1971 Condemned 8574 66A Polmadie   COND  
31/12/1971 Condemned 8598 66A Polmadie   COND