Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 268 Today
» 1259 Yesterday
» 1527 Week
» 22194 Month
» 353683 Year
» 430270 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

90 Bo-Bo


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
90001 04/04/1988 Willesden 29.02
90002 04/04/1988 Willesden 29.02
90003 04/04/1988 Willesden 29.02
90004 04/04/1988 Willesden 29.02
90005 30/04/1988 Willesden 28.95
90006 30/04/1988 Willesden 28.95
90007 30/04/1988 Willesden 28.95
90008 16/05/1988 Willesden 28.90
90009 31/05/1988 Willesden 28.86
90010 30/06/1988 Willesden 28.78
90011 23/09/1988 Willesden 28.55
90012 25/11/1988 Willesden 28.38
90013 23/11/1988 Willesden 28.38
90014 28/10/1988 Willesden 28.45
90015 23/11/1988 Willesden 28.38
90016 08/12/1988 Willesden 28.34
90017 20/12/1988 Willesden 28.31
90018 22/12/1988 Willesden 28.30
90019 05/01/1989 Willesden 28.26
90020 31/01/1989 Willesden 28.19
90021 31/01/1989 Willesden 28.19
90022 14/02/1989 Willesden 28.15
90023 24/02/1989 Willesden 28.13
90024 10/03/1989 Willesden 28.09
90025 17/03/1989 Willesden 28.07
90026 20/03/1989 28.06
90027 1989 Willesden
90028 1989 Willesden
90029 1989 Willesden
90030 1989 Willesden
90031 14/09/1989 Willesden 27.57
90032 17/09/1989 Willesden 27.56
90033 21/09/1989 Willesden 27.55
90034 27/09/1989 Willesden 27.54
90035 29/09/1989 Willesden 27.53
90036 25/04/1990 Willesden 26.96
90037 28/04/1990 Willesden 26.95
90038 30/04/1990 Willesden 26.95
90039 30/04/1990 Willesden 26.95
90040 01/05/1990 Willesden 26.95
90041 04/05/1990 Willesden 26.94
90042 14/05/1990 Willesden 26.91
90043 14/05/1990 Willesden 26.91
90044 30/06/1990 Willesden 26.78
90045 30/06/1990 Willesden 26.78
90046 30/06/1990 Willesden 26.78
90047 27/07/1990 Willesden 26.71
90048 27/07/1990 Willesden 26.71
90049 26/10/1990 Willesden 26.46
90050 14/11/1990 Willesden 26.41