Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 150 Today
» 1117 Yesterday
» 4539 Week
» 18847 Month
» 281824 Year
» 358411 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

90 Bo-Bo


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
04/04/1988 To Service 90001   NEW WN Willesden  
04/04/1988 To Service 90002   NEW WN Willesden  
04/04/1988 To Service 90003   NEW WN Willesden  
04/04/1988 To Service 90004   NEW WN Willesden  
30/04/1988 To Service 90005   NEW WN Willesden  
30/04/1988 To Service 90006   NEW WN Willesden  
30/04/1988 To Service 90007   NEW WN Willesden  
16/05/1988 To Service 90008   NEW WN Willesden  
31/05/1988 To Service 90009   NEW WN Willesden  
30/06/1988 To Service 90010   NEW WN Willesden  
23/09/1988 To Service 90011   NEW WN Willesden  
28/10/1988 To Service 90014   NEW WN Willesden  
23/11/1988 To Service 90013   NEW WN Willesden  
23/11/1988 To Service 90015   NEW WN Willesden  
25/11/1988 To Service 90012   NEW WN Willesden  
08/12/1988 To Service 90016   NEW WN Willesden  
1989 To Service 90027   NEW WN Willesden  
1989 To Service 90028   NEW WN Willesden  
1989 To Service 90029   NEW WN Willesden  
1989 To Service 90030   NEW WN Willesden  
05/01/1989 To Service 90019   NEW WN Willesden  
31/01/1989 To Service 90020   NEW WN Willesden  
31/01/1989 To Service 90021   NEW WN Willesden  
14/02/1989 To Service 90022   NEW WN Willesden  
24/02/1989 To Service 90023   NEW WN Willesden  
10/03/1989 To Service 90024   NEW WN Willesden  
17/03/1989 To Service 90025   NEW WN Willesden  
14/09/1989 To Service 90031   NEW WN Willesden  
17/09/1989 To Service 90032   NEW WN Willesden  
21/09/1989 To Service 90033   NEW WN Willesden  
27/09/1989 To Service 90034   NEW WN Willesden  
25/04/1990 To Service 90036   NEW WN Willesden  
28/04/1990 To Service 90037   NEW WN Willesden  
30/04/1990 To Service 90038   NEW WN Willesden  
30/04/1990 To Service 90039   NEW WN Willesden  
01/05/1990 To Service 90040   NEW WN Willesden  
04/05/1990 To Service 90041   NEW WN Willesden  
14/05/1990 To Service 90042   NEW WN Willesden  
14/05/1990 To Service 90043   NEW WN Willesden  
30/06/1990 To Service 90044   NEW WN Willesden  
30/06/1990 To Service 90045   NEW WN Willesden  
30/06/1990 To Service 90046   NEW WN Willesden  
27/07/1990 To Service 90047   NEW WN Willesden  
27/07/1990 To Service 90048   NEW WN Willesden  
26/10/1990 To Service 90049   NEW WN Willesden  
14/11/1990 To Service 90050   NEW WN Willesden