Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 268 Today
» 1259 Yesterday
» 1527 Week
» 22194 Month
» 353683 Year
» 430270 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBL Ltd 16 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D8400 30/05/1958 NB Stratford 07/07/1968 10.17 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1969 11.47
D8401 11/06/1958 NB Stratford 30/09/1968 10.25 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 09/1969 11.27
D8402 16/07/1958 NB Stratford 07/07/1968 10 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1969 11.34
D8403 18/07/1958 NB Stratford 07/07/1968 10 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 04/1969 10.75
D8404 19/08/1958 NB Stratford 18/02/1968 9.5 Cut Cox and Danks (North Acton) 07/1968 9.91
D8405 04/09/1958 NB Stratford 30/09/1968 10 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 12/1969 11.29
D8406 16/09/1958 NB Stratford 30/09/1968 10 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 07/1969 10.84
D8407 19/09/1958 NB Stratford 30/09/1968 10 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 12/1969 11.25
D8408 25/09/1958 NB Stratford 30/09/1968 10 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 04/1969 10.56
D8409 26/09/1958 NB Stratford 30/09/1968 10 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 04/1969 10.56