Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 840 Today
» 1022 Yesterday
» 840 Week
» 26622 Month
» 224139 Year
» 300726 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBL Ltd 16 Bo-Bo


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sun 07/06/1959 D8406 30A   On Stratford shed - All over green The Early Years of London Diesels  
Fri 31/05/1968 D8401,
D8405
30A,
30A
  On Stratford depot - On shed, green with full yellow ends
On Stratford depot - On shed, green with small yellow panel
   
Sun 15/06/1969 D8400,
D8401,
D8402,
D8405,
D8407
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
RO 9/1969  
Sat 05/07/1969 D8406 Wdn   Birds scrapyard, Long Marston: In scrapyard RO 9/1969  
Mon 01/09/1969 D8400,
D8402,
D8405,
D8407
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  At Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard RO489 11/69