Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 150 Today
» 1117 Yesterday
» 4539 Week
» 18847 Month
» 281824 Year
» 358411 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBL Ltd 16 Bo-Bo


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
30/05/1958 To Service 8400   NEW 30A Stratford  
11/06/1958 To Service 8401   NEW 30A Stratford  
16/07/1958 To Service 8402   NEW 30A Stratford  
18/07/1958 To Service 8403   NEW 30A Stratford  
19/08/1958 To Service 8404   NEW 30A Stratford  
04/09/1958 To Service 8405   NEW 30A Stratford  
16/09/1958 To Service 8406   NEW 30A Stratford  
19/09/1958 To Service 8407   NEW 30A Stratford  
25/09/1958 To Service 8408   NEW 30A Stratford  
26/09/1958 To Service 8409   NEW 30A Stratford  
18/02/1968 Condemned 8404 30A Stratford   COND  
07/07/1968 Condemned 8400 30A Stratford   COND  
07/07/1968 Condemned 8402 30A Stratford   COND  
07/07/1968 Condemned 8403 30A Stratford   COND  
30/09/1968 Condemned 8401 30A Stratford   COND  
30/09/1968 Condemned 8405 30A Stratford   COND  
30/09/1968 Condemned 8406 30A Stratford   COND  
30/09/1968 Condemned 8407 30A Stratford   COND  
30/09/1968 Condemned 8408 30A Stratford   COND  
30/09/1968 Condemned 8409 30A Stratford   COND