Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 268 Today
» 1259 Yesterday
» 1527 Week
» 22194 Month
» 353683 Year
» 430270 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBL Ltd 16 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
D8400 30/05/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
30/05/1958
07/07/1968
07/07/1968
D8401 11/06/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
11/06/1958
30/09/1968
30/09/1968
D8402 16/07/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
16/07/1958
07/07/1968
07/07/1968
D8403 18/07/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
18/07/1958
07/07/1968
07/07/1968
D8404 19/08/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
19/08/1958
18/02/1968
18/02/1968
D8405 04/09/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
04/09/1958
30/09/1968
30/09/1968
D8406 16/09/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
16/09/1958
30/09/1968
30/09/1968
D8407 19/09/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
19/09/1958
30/09/1968
30/09/1968
D8408 25/09/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
25/09/1958
30/09/1968
30/09/1968
D8409 26/09/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
26/09/1958
30/09/1968
30/09/1968