Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 393 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2981 Week
» 32479 Month
» 369325 Year
» 1590890 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Hawksworth "6959" Class 4-6-0


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
Modified Hall 6959 02/03/1944 PEATLING HALL 12/1946   31/12/1965 31/12/1965
Modified Hall 6960 06/03/1944 RAVENINGHAM HALL 06/1947   30/06/1964 01/06/1964
Modified Hall 6961 13/03/1944 STEDHAM HALL 07/1948   30/09/1965 10/09/1965
Modified Hall 6962 05/04/1944 SOUGHTON HALL 10/1946   31/01/1963 07/01/1963
Modified Hall 6963 26/04/1944 THROWLEY HALL 01/1947   31/07/1965 21/07/1965
Modified Hall 6964 31/05/1944 THORNBRIDGE HALL 06/1947   30/09/1965 18/09/1965
Modified Hall 6965 28/07/1944 THIRLESTAINE HALL 09/1947   31/10/1965 26/10/1965
Modified Hall 6966 31/05/1944 WITCHINGHAM HALL 05/1946   30/09/1964 21/09/1964
Modified Hall 6967 15/08/1944 WILLESLEY HALL 01/1946   31/12/1965 31/12/1965
Modified Hall 6968 05/09/1944 WOODCOCK HALL 03/1947   30/09/1963 13/09/1963
Modified Hall 6969 16/09/1944 WRAYSBURY HALL 06/1947   28/02/1965 20/02/1965
Modified Hall 6970 29/09/1944 WHADDON HALL 05/1947   30/06/1964 15/06/1964
Modified Hall 6971 02/10/1947 ATHELHAMPTON HALL 02/10/1947   31/10/1964 31/10/1964
Modified Hall 6972 07/10/1947 BENINGBROUGH HALL 07/10/1947   31/03/1964 10/03/1964
Modified Hall 6973 10/10/1947 BRICKLEHAMPTON HALL 10/10/1947   31/08/1965 25/08/1965
Modified Hall 6974 15/10/1947 BRYNGWYN HALL 15/10/1947   31/05/1965 21/05/1965
Modified Hall 6975 21/10/1947 CAPESTHORNE HALL 21/10/1947   31/12/1963 02/12/1963
Modified Hall 6976 29/10/1947 GRAYTHWAITE HALL 29/10/1947   31/10/1965 09/10/1965
Modified Hall 6977 05/11/1947 GRUNDISBURGH HALL 05/11/1947   31/12/1963 28/12/1963
Modified Hall 6978 07/11/1947 HAROLDSTONE HALL 07/11/1947   31/07/1965 02/07/1965
Modified Hall 6979 12/11/1947 HELPERLY HALL 12/11/1947   28/02/1965 27/02/1965
Modified Hall 6980 20/11/1947 LLANRUMNEY HALL 20/11/1947   31/10/1965 09/10/1965
Modified Hall 6981 30/01/1948 MARBURY HALL 02/1948   31/03/1964 10/03/1964
Modified Hall 6982 11/02/1948 MELMERBY HALL 01/1948   31/08/1964 10/08/1964
Modified Hall 6983 13/02/1948 OTTERINGTON HALL 02/1948   31/08/1965 25/08/1965
Modified Hall 6984 25/02/1948 OWSDEN HALL 02/1948   31/12/1965 03/12/1965
Modified Hall 6985 24/02/1948 PARWICK HALL 02/1948   30/09/1964 21/09/1964
Modified Hall 6986 03/03/1948 RYDAL HALL 03/1948   30/04/1965 21/04/1965
Modified Hall 6987 10/03/1948 SHERVINGTON HALL 03/1948   30/09/1964 21/09/1964
Modified Hall 6988 17/03/1948 SWITHLAND HALL 03/1948   30/09/1964 21/09/1964
Modified Hall 6989 25/03/1948 WIGHWICK HALL 03/1948   30/06/1964 01/06/1964
Modified Hall 6990 08/04/1948 WITHERSLACK HALL 04/1948   31/12/1965 03/12/1965
Modified Hall 6991 23/11/1948 ACTON BURNELL HALL 23/11/1948   31/12/1965 31/12/1965
Modified Hall 6992 30/11/1948 ARBORFIELD HALL 30/11/1948   30/06/1964 08/06/1964
Modified Hall 6993 06/12/1948 ARTHOG HALL 12/1948   31/12/1965 31/12/1965
Modified Hall 6994 10/12/1948 BAGGRAVE HALL 12/1948   30/11/1964 14/11/1964
Modified Hall 6995 21/12/1948 BENTHALL HALL 12/1948   31/03/1965 26/03/1965
Modified Hall 6996 04/01/1949 BLACKWELL HALL 01/1949   31/10/1964 09/10/1964
Modified Hall 6997 19/01/1949 BRYN-IVOR HALL 01/1949   30/11/1964 13/11/1964
Modified Hall 6998 28/01/1949 BURTON AGNES HALL 01/1949   31/12/1965 31/12/1965
Modified Hall 6999 10/02/1949 CAPEL DEWI HALL 02/1949   31/12/1965 31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7900 07/04/1949 SAINT PETER'S HALL 04/1949   31/12/1964 26/12/1964
Modified Hall 7901 22/03/1949 DODINGTON HALL 03/1949   28/02/1964 26/02/1964
Modified Hall 7902 31/03/1949 EATON MASCOT HALL 03/1949   30/06/1964 01/06/1964
Modified Hall 7903 08/04/1949 FOREMARKE HALL 04/1949   30/06/1964 15/06/1964
Modified Hall 7904 19/04/1949 FOUNTAINS HALL 04/1949   31/12/1965 31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7905 29/04/1949 FOWEY HALL 04/1949   31/05/1964 23/05/1964
Modified Hall 7906 20/12/1949 FRON HALL 12/1949   31/03/1965 08/03/1965
Modified Hall 7907 05/01/1950 HART HALL 01/1950   31/12/1965 31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7908 11/01/1950 HENSHALL HALL 01/1950   31/10/1965 09/10/1965
Modified Hall 7909 20/01/1950 HEVENINGHAM HALL 01/1950   30/11/1965 18/11/1965
Modified Hall 7910 31/01/1950 HOWN HALL 01/1950   28/02/1965 06/02/1965
Modified Hall 7911 21/02/1950 LADY MARGARET HALL 02/1950   31/12/1963 16/12/1963
Modified Hall 7912 03/03/1950 LITTLE LINFORD HALL 03/1950   31/10/1965 09/10/1965
Modified Hall 7913 13/03/1950 LITTLE WYRLEY HALL 03/1950   31/03/1965 08/03/1965
Modified Hall 7914 21/03/1950 LLEWENI HALL 03/1950   31/12/1965 31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7915 30/03/1950 MERE HALL 03/1950   31/10/1965 09/10/1965
Modified Hall 7916 06/04/1950 MOBBERLEY HALL 04/1950   31/12/1964 26/12/1964
Modified Hall 7917 21/04/1950 NORTH ASTON HALL 04/1950   31/08/1965 06/08/1965
Modified Hall 7918 26/04/1950 RHOSE WOOD HALL 04/1950   28/02/1965 20/02/1965
Modified Hall 7919 04/05/1950 RUNTER HALL 05/1950   31/12/1965 31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7920 05/09/1950 CONEY HALL 09/1950   30/06/1965 03/06/1965
Modified Hall 7921 12/09/1950 EDSTONE HALL 09/1950   31/12/1963 16/12/1963
Modified Hall 7922 20/09/1950 SALFORD HALL 09/1950   31/12/1965 31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7923 26/09/1950 SPEKE HALL 09/1950   30/06/1965 03/06/1965
Modified Hall 7924 29/09/1950 THORNYCROFT HALL 09/1950   31/12/1965 31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7925 09/10/1950 WESTOL HALL 10/1950   31/12/1965 31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7926 12/10/1950 WILLEY HALL 10/1950   31/12/1964 26/12/1964
Modified Hall 7927 24/10/1950 WILLINGTON HALL 10/1950   31/12/1965 03/12/1965
Modified Hall 7928 30/10/1950 WOLF HALL 10/1950   31/03/1965 08/03/1965
Modified Hall 7929 02/11/1950 WYKE HALL 11/1950   31/08/1965 21/08/1965