Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 444 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3032 Week
» 32530 Month
» 369376 Year
» 1590941 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Hawksworth "6959" Class 4-6-0


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
6959 02/03/1944 31/12/1965 Oxford 21.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 22.13
6960 06/03/1944 01/06/1964 Oxford 20.25 Prs Preserved
6961 13/03/1944 10/09/1965 Oxford 21.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1965 21.77
6962 05/04/1944 07/01/1963 Old Oak Common 18.75 19.12
6963 26/04/1944 21/07/1965 Oxford 21.25 21.48
6964 31/05/1944 18/09/1965 Truro 21.33 21.64
6965 28/07/1944 26/10/1965 Bristol Barrow Road 21.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1966 21.64
6966 31/05/1944 21/09/1964 Oxford 20.33 20.73
6967 15/08/1944 31/12/1965 Oxford 21.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1966 21.76
6968 05/09/1944 13/09/1963 Westbury 19 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1964 19.96
6969 16/09/1944 20/02/1965 Didcot 20.42 20.67
6970 29/09/1944 15/06/1964 Oxford 19.75 20.14
6971 02/10/1947 31/10/1964 Wadebridge 17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 17.30
6972 07/10/1947 10/03/1964 St Philips Marsh 16.42 16.78
6973 10/10/1947 25/08/1965 Bristol Barrow Road 17.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 18.11
6974 15/10/1947 21/05/1965 Oxford 17.58 16.85
6975 21/10/1947 02/12/1963 Neath (Court Sart) 16.17 16.92
6976 29/10/1947 09/10/1965 Truro 18 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 18.31
6977 05/11/1947 28/12/1963 Westbury 16.08 16.62
6978 07/11/1947 02/07/1965 Cardiff Canton 17.67 17.95
6979 12/11/1947 27/02/1965 Truro 17.25 17.68
6980 20/11/1947 09/10/1965 Wadebridge 17.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 18.08
6981 30/01/1948 10/03/1964 St Philips Marsh 16.17 16.47
6982 11/02/1948 10/08/1964 Bristol Barrow Road 16.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1964 16.77
6983 13/02/1948 25/08/1965 Oxford 17.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1965 17.85
6984 25/02/1948 03/12/1965 Bristol Barrow Road 17.83 Prs Preserved
6985 24/02/1948 21/09/1964 Gloucester Horton Road 16.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1965 16.90
6986 03/03/1948 21/04/1965 Didcot 17.08 17.46
6987 10/03/1948 21/09/1964 Radyr 16.5 16.70
6988 17/03/1948 21/09/1964 Westbury 16.5 16.76
6989 25/03/1948 01/06/1964 Gloucester Horton Road 16.25 Prs Preserved
6990 08/04/1948 03/12/1965 Bristol Barrow Road 17.67 Prs Preserved
6991 23/11/1948 Westbury 31/12/1965 Oxford 17.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1966 17.48
6992 30/11/1948 Gloucester Horton Road 08/06/1964 Worcester 15.58 16.05
6993 06/12/1948 31/12/1965 Oxford 17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1966 17.53
6994 10/12/1948 14/11/1964 St Blazey 15.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1965 16.19
6995 21/12/1948 26/03/1965 Worcester 16.25 16.58
6996 04/01/1949 09/10/1964 Didcot 15.75 16.13
6997 19/01/1949 13/11/1964 Bristol Barrow Road 15.83 16.08
6998 28/01/1949 31/12/1965 Oxford 16.92 Prs Preserved
6999 10/02/1949 31/12/1965 Oxford 16.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1966 17.27
7900 07/04/1949 26/12/1964 Oxford 15.67 16.03
7901 22/03/1949 26/02/1964 St Philips Marsh 14.92 15.24
7902 31/03/1949 01/06/1964 Old Oak Common 15.25 15.47
7903 08/04/1949 15/06/1964 Radyr 15.17 Prs Preserved
7904 19/04/1949 31/12/1965 Oxford 16.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1966 17.17
7905 29/04/1949 23/05/1964 Truro 15.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1964 15.31
7906 20/12/1949 St Philips Marsh 08/03/1965 Oxford 15.25 15.41
7907 05/01/1950 31/12/1965 Oxford 15.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1966 16.37
7908 11/01/1950 09/10/1965 Wadebridge 15.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 15.94
7909 20/01/1950 18/11/1965 Oxford 15.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 16.24
7910 31/01/1950 06/02/1965 Oxford 15.08 15.30
7911 21/02/1950 16/12/1963 Oxford 13.83 14.99
7912 03/03/1950 09/10/1965 Truro 15.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 15.88
7913 13/03/1950 08/03/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 15 15.35
7914 21/03/1950 31/12/1965 Bristol Barrow Road 15.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1966 16.16
7915 30/03/1950 09/10/1965 Wadebridge 15.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 15.81
7916 06/04/1950 26/12/1964 Radyr 14.67 14.87
7917 21/04/1950 06/08/1965 Oxford 15.33 15.50
7918 26/04/1950 20/02/1965 Wadebridge 14.83 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1965 15.06
7919 04/05/1950 31/12/1965 Oxford 15.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1966 16.04
7920 05/09/1950 03/06/1965 Worcester 14.75 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 09/1965 15.04
7921 12/09/1950 16/12/1963 Old Oak Common 13.25 13.93
7922 20/09/1950 31/12/1965 Oxford 15.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1966 15.66
7923 26/09/1950 03/06/1965 Radyr 14.75 15.06
7924 29/09/1950 31/12/1965 Oxford 15.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1966 15.64
7925 09/10/1950 31/12/1965 Oxford 15.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1966 15.44
7926 12/10/1950 26/12/1964 Gloucester Horton Road 14.17 14.68
7927 24/10/1950 03/12/1965 Oxford 15.17
7928 30/10/1950 08/03/1965 Worcester 14.42 14.47
7929 02/11/1950 21/08/1965 Wadebridge 14.75 14.96