Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1310 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 9051 Week
» 29493 Month
» 366339 Year
» 1587904 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Hawksworth "6959" Class 4-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/12/1945 Reallocation 6963     134 Shrewsbury  
23/03/1946 Reallocation 6962     SPM St Philips Marsh  
07/09/1946 Reallocation 6962 SPM St Philips Marsh PDN Old Oak Common  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 6970     PDN Old Oak Common  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 6986     SPM St Philips Marsh  
23/11/1948 To Service 6991   NEW WES Westbury  
30/11/1948 To Service 6992   NEW GLO Gloucester Horton Road  
05/11/1949 Reallocation 7900     SDN Swindon  
20/12/1949 To Service 7906   NEW SPM St Philips Marsh  
20/05/1950 Reallocation 7909     83D Laira  
20/05/1950 Reallocation 7910     81C Southall  
31/08/1950 Reallocation 6971     84E Tyseley  
31/08/1950 Reallocation 7912     84E Tyseley  
31/08/1950 Reallocation 7913     84E Tyseley  
31/08/1950 Reallocation 7915     84A Stafford Road  
31/08/1950 Reallocation 7917     82A Bristol Bath Road  
31/08/1950 Reallocation 7918     84E Tyseley  
30/09/1950 Reallocation 7906 SPM St Philips Marsh 81D Reading (W.R.)  
30/09/1950 Reallocation 7916     83E St Blazey  
30/09/1950 Reallocation 7920     85B Gloucester Horton Road  
31/10/1950 Reallocation 7917 82A Bristol Bath Road 82D Westbury  
31/10/1950 Reallocation 7921     84K Chester West  
31/10/1950 Reallocation 7922     84K Chester West  
31/10/1950 Reallocation 7923     82C Swindon  
31/10/1950 Reallocation 7924     82D Westbury  
30/11/1950 Reallocation 7925     83G Penzance  
30/11/1950 Reallocation 7926     85B Gloucester Horton Road  
30/11/1950 Reallocation 7927     81D Reading (W.R.)  
30/11/1950 Reallocation 7928     85A Worcester  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 6985     85B Gloucester Horton Road  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 6990     81F Oxford  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 7929     84E Tyseley  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 6965     83D Laira  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 6966     83D Laira  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 6967     83D Laira  
31/03/1951 Reallocation 7920 85B Gloucester Horton Road 85A Worcester  
31/03/1951 Reallocation 7922 84K Chester West 84E Tyseley  
30/04/1951 Reallocation 6982     82A Bristol Bath Road  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 6985 85B Gloucester Horton Road 85C Hereford  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 7915 84A Stafford Road 84B Oxley  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 7922 84E Tyseley 84K Chester West  
30/06/1951 Reallocation 6992 GLO Gloucester Horton Road 85C Hereford  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 6963 134 Shrewsbury 84C Banbury  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 6966 83D Laira 84C Banbury  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 6976     84C Banbury  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 7900 SDN Swindon 82A Bristol Bath Road  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 7901     82B St Philips Marsh  
31/01/1952 Reallocation 6990 81F Oxford 81A Old Oak Common  
31/01/1952 Reallocation 7911     81F Oxford  
29/02/1952 Reallocation 7900 82A Bristol Bath Road 81F Oxford  
30/04/1952 Reallocation 7916 83E St Blazey 83A Newton Abbot  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 6961     81A Old Oak Common  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 6963 84C Banbury 84B Oxley  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 6987     85A Worcester  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 6996     81A Old Oak Common  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 6963 84B Oxley 84K Chester West  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 6986 SPM St Philips Marsh 82A Bristol Bath Road  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 7907     82A Bristol Bath Road  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 6985 85C Hereford 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 6960     81D Reading (W.R.)  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 6967 83D Laira 82C Swindon  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 6983     81E Didcot  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 6964     84B Oxley  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 6986 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 7901 82B St Philips Marsh 82A Bristol Bath Road  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 7921 84K Chester West 85C Hereford  
25/11/1953 Reallocation 6964 84B Oxley 84A Stafford Road  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 6978     83D Laira  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 7921 85C Hereford 84K Chester West  
30/01/1954 Reallocation 6988     83D Laira  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 6994     82D Westbury  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 7907 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
22/05/1954 Reallocation 6977     82B St Philips Marsh  
22/05/1954 Reallocation 6982 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
14/08/1954 Reallocation 6975     84A Stafford Road  
14/08/1954 Reallocation 6996 81A Old Oak Common 83B Taunton  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 6991 WES Westbury 81C Southall  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 6988 83D Laira 83A Newton Abbot  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 6972     82B St Philips Marsh  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 6977 82B St Philips Marsh 82A Bristol Bath Road  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 7914     81D Reading (W.R.)  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 6980     84E Tyseley  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 6988 83A Newton Abbot 83D Laira  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 7912 84E Tyseley 84G Shrewsbury  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 7913 84E Tyseley 84G Shrewsbury  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 6980 84E Tyseley 84G Shrewsbury  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 6986 82B St Philips Marsh 82A Bristol Bath Road  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 7908     84G Shrewsbury  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 7912 84G Shrewsbury 84E Tyseley  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 7913 84G Shrewsbury 84E Tyseley  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 7929 84E Tyseley 82B St Philips Marsh  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 6975 84A Stafford Road 84B Oxley  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 6982 82B St Philips Marsh 82A Bristol Bath Road  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 7907 82B St Philips Marsh 82A Bristol Bath Road  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 7908 84G Shrewsbury 84E Tyseley  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 6989     85A Worcester  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 6972 82B St Philips Marsh 82A Bristol Bath Road  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 6977 82A Bristol Bath Road 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
08/09/1956 Reallocation 6966 84C Banbury 82C Swindon  
08/09/1956 Reallocation 6982 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 6977 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 82A Bristol Bath Road  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 6993     82C Swindon  
29/12/1956 Reallocation 6967 82C Swindon 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
26/01/1957 Reallocation 6978 83D Laira 81A Old Oak Common  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 6967 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 82C Swindon  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 6997     82B St Philips Marsh  
20/04/1957 Reallocation 6997 82B St Philips Marsh 82A Bristol Bath Road  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 6982 82B St Philips Marsh 82A Bristol Bath Road  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 6989 85A Worcester 85C Hereford  
13/07/1957 Reallocation 6964 84A Stafford Road 84G Shrewsbury  
22/02/1958 Reallocation 6969     81E Didcot  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 6965 83D Laira 83C Exeter  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 6996 83B Taunton 82A Bristol Bath Road  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 6998     84G Shrewsbury  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 7913 84E Tyseley 82B St Philips Marsh  
12/06/1958 Reallocation 6977 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
12/06/1958 Reallocation 6986 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 6984     85A Worcester  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 6963 84K Chester West 86C Cardiff Canton  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 7921 84K Chester West 84G Shrewsbury  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 7922 84K Chester West 84G Shrewsbury  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 6966 82C Swindon 81A Old Oak Common  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 6967 82C Swindon 81C Southall  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 6987 85A Worcester 84F Stourbridge Junction  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 6996 82A Bristol Bath Road 81E Didcot  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 7909 83D Laira 82D Westbury  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 7923 82C Swindon 81C Southall  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 7927 81D Reading (W.R.) 81A Old Oak Common  
27/12/1958 Reallocation 6975 84B Oxley 84A Stafford Road  
21/03/1959 Reallocation 7913 82B St Philips Marsh 86C Cardiff Canton  
18/04/1959 Reallocation 6972 82A Bristol Bath Road 83A Newton Abbot  
18/04/1959 Reallocation 6980 84G Shrewsbury 84B Oxley  
16/05/1959 Reallocation 6972 83A Newton Abbot 82A Bristol Bath Road  
16/05/1959 Reallocation 6975 84A Stafford Road 84B Oxley  
13/06/1959 Reallocation 6973     82D Westbury  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 7921 84G Shrewsbury 83D Laira  
08/08/1959 Reallocation 6989 85C Hereford 85A Worcester  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 6973 82D Westbury 81A Old Oak Common  
03/10/1959 Reallocation 6973 81A Old Oak Common 81F Oxford  
03/10/1959 Reallocation 6977 82B St Philips Marsh 82A Bristol Bath Road  
03/10/1959 Reallocation 6988 83D Laira 82A Bristol Bath Road  
03/10/1959 Reallocation 6992 85C Hereford 85A Worcester  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 6963 86C Cardiff Canton 87E Landore  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 7925 83G Penzance 86C Cardiff Canton  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 6963 87E Landore 86C Cardiff Canton  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 7905     84C Banbury  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 7924 82D Westbury 83B Taunton  
26/12/1959 Reallocation 6973 81F Oxford 81A Old Oak Common  
26/12/1959 Reallocation 6987 84F Stourbridge Junction 84A Stafford Road  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 7929 82B St Philips Marsh 83E St Blazey  
27/02/1960 Reallocation 7907 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
23/04/1960 Reallocation 6977 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
21/05/1960 Reallocation 6968     82D Westbury  
21/05/1960 Reallocation 7916 83A Newton Abbot 83D Laira  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 6972 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 6981     82B St Philips Marsh  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 6982 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 7901 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
08/10/1960 Reallocation 6986 82B St Philips Marsh 82C Swindon  
08/10/1960 Reallocation 7921 83D Laira 81A Old Oak Common  
08/10/1960 Reallocation 7927 81A Old Oak Common 88A Cardiff Canton  
08/10/1960 Reallocation 7929 83E St Blazey 84C Banbury  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 7909 82D Westbury 83A Newton Abbot  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 6999     83B Taunton  
31/12/1960 Reallocation 6963 86C Cardiff Canton 81A Old Oak Common  
28/01/1961 Reallocation 6998 84G Shrewsbury 81A Old Oak Common  
25/02/1961 Reallocation 6993 82C Swindon 82B St Philips Marsh  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 6993 82B St Philips Marsh 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 6995     88A Cardiff Canton  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 7907 82B St Philips Marsh 82C Swindon  
04/11/1961 Reallocation 6994 82D Westbury 83C Exeter  
02/12/1961 Reallocation 7907 82C Swindon 87J Fishguard Goodwick  
30/12/1961 Reallocation 6974     81C Southall  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 7924 83B Taunton 82B St Philips Marsh  
24/02/1962 Reallocation 6968 82D Westbury 87J Fishguard Goodwick  
24/02/1962 Reallocation 6994 83C Exeter 81C Southall  
24/02/1962 Reallocation 7907 87J Fishguard Goodwick 82B St Philips Marsh  
21/04/1962 Reallocation 6999 83B Taunton 82D Westbury  
21/04/1962 Reallocation 7912 84E Tyseley 84C Banbury  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 6977 82B St Philips Marsh 81C Southall  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 7929 84C Banbury 84E Tyseley  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 6986 82C Swindon 84F Stourbridge Junction  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 6995 88A Cardiff Canton 88L Cardiff East Dock  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 7913 86C Cardiff Canton 88L Cardiff East Dock  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 7922 84G Shrewsbury 84F Stourbridge Junction  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 7925 86C Cardiff Canton 88L Cardiff East Dock  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 7927 88A Cardiff Canton 88L Cardiff East Dock  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 6965 83C Exeter 87G Carmarthen  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 6975 84B Oxley 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 6977 81C Southall 82D Westbury  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 6987 84A Stafford Road 88L Cardiff East Dock  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 6989 85A Worcester 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 7909 83A Newton Abbot 83D Laira  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 7926 85B Gloucester Horton Road 85A Worcester  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 7915 84B Oxley 84E Tyseley  
17/11/1962 Reallocation 7909 83D Laira 83B Taunton  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 6986 84F Stourbridge Junction 81C Southall  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 7922 84F Stourbridge Junction 81C Southall  
07/01/1963 Condemned 6962 PDN Old Oak Common   COND  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 6965 87G Carmarthen 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 6984 85A Worcester 87H Neyland  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 7917 82D Westbury 87H Neyland  
30/03/1963 Reallocation 6994 81C Southall 89A Shrewsbury  
06/04/1963 Reallocation 6978 81A Old Oak Common 81A Old Oak Common  
04/05/1963 Reallocation 6973 81A Old Oak Common 88L Cardiff East Dock  
04/05/1963 Reallocation 6991 81C Southall 81D Reading (W.R.)  
29/06/1963 Reallocation 7906 81D Reading (W.R.) 81F Oxford  
27/07/1963 Reallocation 6968 87J Fishguard Goodwick 82D Westbury  
27/07/1963 Reallocation 6987 88L Cardiff East Dock 87B Duffryn Yard  
31/08/1963 Reallocation 6960 81D Reading (W.R.) 81F Oxford  
13/09/1963 Condemned 6968 98W     COND  
28/09/1963 Reallocation 6984 87H Neyland 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
28/09/1963 Reallocation 6988 82A Bristol Bath Road 82D Westbury  
28/09/1963 Reallocation 7917 87H Neyland 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 6961 81A Old Oak Common 81C Southall  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 6973 88L Cardiff East Dock 88A Cardiff East Dock  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 6978 81A Old Oak Common 81C Southall  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 6990 81A Old Oak Common 82B St Philips Marsh  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 7903     88A Cardiff East Dock  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 6967 81C Southall 81F Oxford  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 6984 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 88A Cardiff East Dock  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 6987 87B Duffryn Yard 88A Cardiff East Dock  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 7910 81C Southall 81A Old Oak Common  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 7917 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 81E Didcot  
02/12/1963 Condemned 6975 98W     COND  
16/12/1963 Condemned 7911 98W     COND  
16/12/1963 Condemned 7921 98W     COND  
28/12/1963 Reallocation 6974 81C Southall 81A Old Oak Common  
28/12/1963 Condemned 6977 98W     COND  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 6966 81A Old Oak Common 81F Oxford  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 7904     81D Reading (W.R.)  
22/02/1964 Reallocation 6974 81A Old Oak Common 81F Oxford  
26/02/1964 Condemned 7901 82B St Philips Marsh   COND  
10/03/1964 Condemned 6972 98W     COND  
10/03/1964 Condemned 6981 98W     COND  
13/04/1964 Reallocation 7904 81D Reading (W.R.) 81A Old Oak Common  
13/04/1964 Reallocation 7914 81D Reading (W.R.) 82B St Philips Marsh  
04/05/1964 Reallocation 6963 81A Old Oak Common 81D Reading (W.R.)  
04/05/1964 Reallocation 6995 88L Cardiff East Dock 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
04/05/1964 Reallocation 7904 81A Old Oak Common 81D Reading (W.R.)  
04/05/1964 Reallocation 7910 81A Old Oak Common 81D Reading (W.R.)  
04/05/1964 Reallocation 7926 85A Worcester 81D Reading (W.R.)  
23/05/1964 Condemned 7905 98W     COND  
01/06/1964 Condemned 6960 98W     COND  
01/06/1964 Condemned 6989 98W     COND  
01/06/1964 Condemned 7902 98W     COND  
08/06/1964 Condemned 6992 98W     COND  
15/06/1964 Condemned 6970 98W     COND  
15/06/1964 Condemned 7903 98W     COND  
20/06/1964 Reallocation 6994 89A Shrewsbury 2B Oxley  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 6959     81C Southall  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 6982 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 6990 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 6997 82A Bristol Bath Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 6998 81A Old Oak Common 81C Southall  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 7907 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 7914 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 7916 83D Laira 82C Swindon  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 7924 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 6973 88A Cardiff East Dock 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 7913 88L Cardiff East Dock 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 7926 81D Reading (W.R.) 82C Swindon  
10/08/1964 Condemned 6982 98W     COND  
24/08/1964 Reallocation 6974 81F Oxford 81D Reading (W.R.)  
24/08/1964 Reallocation 7906 81F Oxford 81D Reading (W.R.)  
21/09/1964 Condemned 6966 98W     COND  
21/09/1964 Condemned 6985 98W     COND  
21/09/1964 Condemned 6987 98W     COND  
21/09/1964 Condemned 6988 98W     COND  
09/10/1964 Condemned 6996 98W     COND  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 6961 81C Southall 81A Old Oak Common  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 6974 81D Reading (W.R.) 81D Reading (W.R.)  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 6978 81C Southall 81A Old Oak Common  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 6984 88A Cardiff East Dock 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 6995 85B Gloucester Horton Road 85A Worcester  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 7906 81D Reading (W.R.) 81F Oxford  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 7907 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 7909 83B Taunton 83C Westbury  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 7916 82C Swindon 88A Cardiff East Dock  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 7923 81C Southall 81A Old Oak Common  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 7926 82C Swindon 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
31/10/1964 Condemned 6971 98W     COND  
31/10/1964 Reallocation 6980 84B Oxley 2D Banbury  
07/11/1964 Reallocation 6964 84G Shrewsbury 2A Tyseley  
08/11/1964 Reallocation 6965 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
08/11/1964 Reallocation 6973 87A Neath (Court Sart) 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
08/11/1964 Reallocation 6984 87A Neath (Court Sart) 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
08/11/1964 Reallocation 7913 87A Neath (Court Sart) 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
13/11/1964 Condemned 6997 98W     COND  
14/11/1964 Condemned 6994 98W     COND  
15/11/1964 Reallocation 7909 83C Westbury 85A Worcester  
22/11/1964 Reallocation 6974 81D Reading (W.R.) 81F Oxford  
22/11/1964 Reallocation 7910 81D Reading (W.R.) 81F Oxford  
26/12/1964 Condemned 7900 98W     COND  
26/12/1964 Condemned 7916 98W     COND  
26/12/1964 Condemned 7926 98W     COND  
27/12/1964 Reallocation 6963 81D Reading (W.R.) 81D Reading (W.R.)  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 6963 81D Reading (W.R.) 81E Didcot  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 6991 81D Reading (W.R.) 81E Didcot  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 6999 82D Westbury 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 7904 81D Reading (W.R.) 85A Worcester  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 7919     85A Worcester  
23/01/1965 Reallocation 6961 81A Old Oak Common 81E Didcot  
06/02/1965 Condemned 7910 98W     COND  
20/02/1965 Condemned 6969 98W     COND  
20/02/1965 Condemned 7918 98W     COND  
21/02/1965 Reallocation 6978 81A Old Oak Common 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
21/02/1965 Reallocation 7923 81A Old Oak Common 88A Cardiff East Dock  
27/02/1965 Condemned 6979 98W     COND  
07/03/1965 Reallocation 6978 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
08/03/1965 Condemned 7906 98W     COND  
08/03/1965 Condemned 7913 98W     COND  
08/03/1965 Condemned 7928 98W     COND  
26/03/1965 Condemned 6995 98W     COND  
28/03/1965 Reallocation 6986 81C Southall 81E Didcot  
11/04/1965 Reallocation 6973 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
11/04/1965 Reallocation 6984 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
21/04/1965 Condemned 6986 98W     COND  
08/05/1965 Reallocation 6964 2A Tyseley 2D Banbury  
16/05/1965 Reallocation 6999 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 81F Oxford  
21/05/1965 Condemned 6974 98W     COND  
03/06/1965 Condemned 7920 98W     COND  
03/06/1965 Condemned 7923 98W     COND  
02/07/1965 Condemned 6978 98W     COND  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 6961 81E Didcot 81F Oxford  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 6963 98W   81F Oxford  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 6983 81E Didcot 81F Oxford  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 6991 81E Didcot 81F Oxford  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 6993 85B Gloucester Horton Road 81F Oxford  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 7909 85A Worcester 81F Oxford  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 7917 81E Didcot 81F Oxford  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 7919 85A Worcester 81F Oxford  
21/07/1965 Condemned 6963 81F Oxford   COND  
06/08/1965 Condemned 7917 98W     COND  
08/08/1965 Reallocation 7904 85A Worcester 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
08/08/1965 Reallocation 7922 81C Southall 81F Oxford  
08/08/1965 Reallocation 7925 88L Cardiff East Dock 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
08/08/1965 Reallocation 7927 88L Cardiff East Dock 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
21/08/1965 Condemned 7929 98W     COND  
25/08/1965 Condemned 6973 98W     COND  
25/08/1965 Condemned 6983 98W     COND  
10/09/1965 Condemned 6961 98W     COND  
18/09/1965 Condemned 6964 98W     COND  
19/09/1965 Reallocation 6959 81C Southall 81F Oxford  
19/09/1965 Reallocation 6998 81C Southall 81F Oxford  
09/10/1965 Condemned 6976 98W     COND  
09/10/1965 Condemned 6980 98W     COND  
09/10/1965 Condemned 7908 98W     COND  
09/10/1965 Condemned 7912 98W     COND  
09/10/1965 Condemned 7915 98W     COND  
26/10/1965 Condemned 6965 98W     COND  
07/11/1965 Reallocation 7925 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 81F Oxford  
07/11/1965 Reallocation 7927 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 81F Oxford  
18/11/1965 Condemned 7909 81F Oxford   COND  
03/12/1965 Condemned 6984 82E Bristol Barrow Road   COND  
03/12/1965 Condemned 6990 82E Bristol Barrow Road   COND  
03/12/1965 Condemned 7927 81F Oxford   COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6959 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6967 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6991 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6993 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6998 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6999 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 7904 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 7907 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 7914 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 7919 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 7922 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 7924 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 7925 98W     COND