Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1274 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 9015 Week
» 29457 Month
» 366303 Year
» 1587868 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Hawksworth "6959" Class 4-6-0


Class GWR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Modified Hall 6959 02/03/1944 81C
81F
W
Southall
Oxford
Withdrawn
22/06/1964
19/09/1965
12/1965
31/12/1965
Modified Hall 6960 06/03/1944 81D
81F
W
Reading (W.R.)
Oxford
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
31/08/1963
06/1964
01/06/1964
Modified Hall 6961 13/03/1944 81A
81C
81A
81E
81F
W
Old Oak Common
Southall
Old Oak Common
Didcot
Oxford
Withdrawn
17/05/1952
02/11/1963
12/10/1964
23/01/1965
11/07/1965
09/1965
10/09/1965
Modified Hall 6962 05/04/1944 SPM
PDN
W
St Philips Marsh
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
07/09/1946
09/02/1963
07/01/1963
Modified Hall 6963 26/04/1944 134
84C
84B
84K
86C
87E
86C
81A
81D
81D
81E
W
81F
Shrewsbury
Banbury
Oxley
Chester West
Cardiff Canton
Landore
Cardiff Canton
Old Oak Common
Reading (W.R.)
Reading (W.R.)
Didcot
Withdrawn
Oxford
01/12/1945
31/12/1951
17/05/1952
12/07/1952
06/09/1958
31/10/1959
28/11/1959
31/12/1960
04/05/1964
27/12/1964
10/01/1965
07/1965
11/07/1965
21/07/1965
Modified Hall 6964 31/05/1944 84B
84A
84G
2A
2D
W
Oxley
Stafford Road
Shrewsbury
Tyseley
Banbury
Withdrawn
31/10/1953
25/11/1953
13/07/1957
07/11/1964
08/05/1965
09/1965
18/09/1965
Modified Hall 6965 28/07/1944 83D
83C
87G
86A
82E
W
Laira
Exeter
Carmarthen
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
28/02/1951
22/03/1958
06/10/1962
09/02/1963
08/11/1964
10/1965
26/10/1965
Modified Hall 6966 31/05/1944 83D
84C
82C
81A
81F
W
Laira
Banbury
Swindon
Old Oak Common
Oxford
Withdrawn
28/02/1951
31/12/1951
08/09/1956
04/10/1958
25/01/1964
09/1964
21/09/1964
Modified Hall 6967 15/08/1944 83D
82C
82F
82C
81C
81F
W
Laira
Swindon
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Swindon
Southall
Oxford
Withdrawn
28/02/1951
03/10/1953
29/12/1956
23/02/1957
04/10/1958
30/11/1963
12/1965
31/12/1965
Modified Hall 6968 05/09/1944 82D
87J
82D
W
Westbury
Fishguard Goodwick
Westbury
Withdrawn
21/05/1960
24/02/1962
27/07/1963
09/1963
13/09/1963
Modified Hall 6969 16/09/1944 81E
W
Didcot
Withdrawn
22/02/1958
02/1965
20/02/1965
Modified Hall 6970 29/09/1944 PDN
W
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
30/10/1948
06/1964
15/06/1964
Modified Hall 6971 02/10/1947 84E
W
Tyseley
Withdrawn
31/08/1950
10/1964
31/10/1964
Modified Hall 6972 07/10/1947 82B
82A
83A
82A
82B
W
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
Newton Abbot
Bristol Bath Road
St Philips Marsh
Withdrawn
26/03/1955
16/06/1956
18/04/1959
16/05/1959
10/09/1960
03/1964
10/03/1964
Modified Hall 6973 10/10/1947 82D
81A
81F
81A
88L
88A
87A
86E
82E
W
Westbury
Old Oak Common
Oxford
Old Oak Common
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff East Dock
Neath (Court Sart)
Severn Tunnel Junction
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
13/06/1959
05/09/1959
03/10/1959
26/12/1959
04/05/1963
02/11/1963
20/07/1964
08/11/1964
11/04/1965
08/1965
25/08/1965
Modified Hall 6974 15/10/1947 81C
81A
81F
81D
81D
81F
W
Southall
Old Oak Common
Oxford
Reading (W.R.)
Reading (W.R.)
Oxford
Withdrawn
30/12/1961
28/12/1963
22/02/1964
24/08/1964
12/10/1964
22/11/1964
05/1965
21/05/1965
Modified Hall 6975 21/10/1947 84A
84B
84A
84B
87A
W
Stafford Road
Oxley
Stafford Road
Oxley
Neath (Court Sart)
Withdrawn
14/08/1954
08/10/1955
27/12/1958
16/05/1959
06/10/1962
12/1963
02/12/1963
Modified Hall 6976 29/10/1947 84C
W
Banbury
Withdrawn
31/12/1951
10/1965
09/10/1965
Modified Hall 6977 05/11/1947 82B
82A
82F
82A
82B
82A
82B
81C
82D
W
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Bristol Bath Road
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
St Philips Marsh
Southall
Westbury
Withdrawn
22/05/1954
26/03/1955
11/08/1956
06/10/1956
12/06/1958
03/10/1959
23/04/1960
16/06/1962
06/10/1962
12/1963
28/12/1963
Modified Hall 6978 07/11/1947 83D
81A
81A
81C
81A
86E
86B
W
Laira
Old Oak Common
Old Oak Common
Southall
Old Oak Common
Severn Tunnel Junction
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
26/12/1953
26/01/1957
06/04/1963
02/11/1963
12/10/1964
21/02/1965
07/03/1965
07/1965
02/07/1965
Modified Hall 6979 12/11/1947 W Withdrawn 02/1965 27/02/1965
Modified Hall 6980 20/11/1947 84E
84G
84B
2D
W
Tyseley
Shrewsbury
Oxley
Banbury
Withdrawn
21/05/1955
16/07/1955
18/04/1959
31/10/1964
10/1965
09/10/1965
Modified Hall 6981 30/01/1948 82B
W
St Philips Marsh
Withdrawn
10/09/1960
03/1964
10/03/1964
Modified Hall 6982 11/02/1948 82A
82B
82A
82B
82A
82B
82E
W
Bristol Bath Road
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
30/04/1951
22/05/1954
08/10/1955
08/09/1956
18/05/1957
10/09/1960
22/06/1964
08/1964
10/08/1964
Modified Hall 6983 13/02/1948 81E
81F
W
Didcot
Oxford
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
11/07/1965
08/1965
25/08/1965
Modified Hall 6984 25/02/1948 85A
87H
86E
88A
87A
86E
82E
W
Worcester
Neyland
Severn Tunnel Junction
Cardiff East Dock
Neath (Court Sart)
Severn Tunnel Junction
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
14/06/1958
09/03/1963
28/09/1963
30/11/1963
12/10/1964
08/11/1964
11/04/1965
03/12/1965
03/12/1965
Modified Hall 6985 24/02/1948 85B
85C
85B
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Hereford
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
31/12/1950
19/05/1951
29/11/1952
09/1964
21/09/1964
Modified Hall 6986 03/03/1948 SPM
82A
82B
82A
82B
82C
84F
81C
81E
W
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
St Philips Marsh
Swindon
Stourbridge Junction
Southall
Didcot
Withdrawn
30/10/1948
01/11/1952
31/10/1953
16/07/1955
12/06/1958
08/10/1960
08/09/1962
15/12/1962
28/03/1965
04/1965
21/04/1965
Modified Hall 6987 10/03/1948 85A
84F
84A
88L
87B
88A
W
Worcester
Stourbridge Junction
Stafford Road
Cardiff East Dock
Duffryn Yard
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
17/05/1952
04/10/1958
26/12/1959
06/10/1962
27/07/1963
30/11/1963
09/1964
21/09/1964
Modified Hall 6988 17/03/1948 83D
83A
83D
82A
82D
W
Laira
Newton Abbot
Laira
Bristol Bath Road
Westbury
Withdrawn
30/01/1954
06/11/1954
21/05/1955
03/10/1959
28/09/1963
09/1964
21/09/1964
Modified Hall 6989 25/03/1948 85A
85C
85A
85B
W
Worcester
Hereford
Worcester
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
24/03/1956
18/05/1957
08/08/1959
06/10/1962
06/1964
01/06/1964
Modified Hall 6990 08/04/1948 81F
81A
82B
82E
W
Oxford
Old Oak Common
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
31/12/1950
31/01/1952
02/11/1963
22/06/1964
03/12/1965
03/12/1965
Modified Hall 6991 23/11/1948 WES
81C
81D
81E
81F
W
Westbury
Southall
Reading (W.R.)
Didcot
Oxford
Withdrawn
23/11/1948
09/10/1954
04/05/1963
10/01/1965
11/07/1965
12/1965
31/12/1965
Modified Hall 6992 30/11/1948 GLO
85C
85A
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Hereford
Worcester
Withdrawn
30/11/1948
30/06/1951
03/10/1959
06/1964
08/06/1964
Modified Hall 6993 06/12/1948 82C
82B
85B
81F
W
Swindon
St Philips Marsh
Gloucester Horton Road
Oxford
Withdrawn
06/10/1956
25/02/1961
07/10/1961
11/07/1965
12/1965
31/12/1965
Modified Hall 6994 10/12/1948 82D
83C
81C
89A
2B
W
Westbury
Exeter
Southall
Shrewsbury
Oxley
Withdrawn
24/04/1954
04/11/1961
24/02/1962
30/03/1963
20/06/1964
11/1964
14/11/1964
Modified Hall 6995 21/12/1948 88A
88L
85B
85A
W
Cardiff Canton
Cardiff East Dock
Gloucester Horton Road
Worcester
Withdrawn
07/10/1961
08/09/1962
04/05/1964
12/10/1964
03/1965
26/03/1965
Modified Hall 6996 04/01/1949 81A
83B
82A
81E
W
Old Oak Common
Taunton
Bristol Bath Road
Didcot
Withdrawn
17/05/1952
14/08/1954
22/03/1958
04/10/1958
10/1964
09/10/1964
Modified Hall 6997 19/01/1949 82B
82A
82E
W
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
23/02/1957
20/04/1957
22/06/1964
11/1964
13/11/1964
Modified Hall 6998 28/01/1949 84G
81A
81C
81F
W
Shrewsbury
Old Oak Common
Southall
Oxford
Withdrawn
22/03/1958
28/01/1961
22/06/1964
19/09/1965
12/1965
31/12/1965
Modified Hall 6999 10/02/1949 83B
82D
86E
81F
W
Taunton
Westbury
Severn Tunnel Junction
Oxford
Withdrawn
03/12/1960
21/04/1962
10/01/1965
16/05/1965
12/1965
31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7900 07/04/1949 SDN
82A
81F
W
Swindon
Bristol Bath Road
Oxford
Withdrawn
05/11/1949
31/12/1951
29/02/1952
12/1964
26/12/1964
Modified Hall 7901 22/03/1949 82B
82A
82B
W
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
St Philips Marsh
Withdrawn
31/12/1951
31/10/1953
10/09/1960
28/02/1964
26/02/1964
Modified Hall 7902 31/03/1949 W Withdrawn 06/1964 01/06/1964
Modified Hall 7903 08/04/1949 88A
W
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
02/11/1963
06/1964
15/06/1964
Modified Hall 7904 19/04/1949 81D
81A
81D
85A
82E
W
Reading (W.R.)
Old Oak Common
Reading (W.R.)
Worcester
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
25/01/1964
13/04/1964
04/05/1964
10/01/1965
08/08/1965
12/1965
31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7905 29/04/1949 84C
W
Banbury
Withdrawn
28/11/1959
05/1964
23/05/1964
Modified Hall 7906 20/12/1949 SPM
81D
81F
81D
81F
W
St Philips Marsh
Reading (W.R.)
Oxford
Reading (W.R.)
Oxford
Withdrawn
20/12/1949
30/09/1950
29/06/1963
24/08/1964
12/10/1964
03/1965
08/03/1965
Modified Hall 7907 05/01/1950 82A
82B
82A
82B
82C
87J
82B
82E
82E
W
Bristol Bath Road
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
St Philips Marsh
Swindon
Fishguard Goodwick
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
24/04/1954
08/10/1955
27/02/1960
07/10/1961
02/12/1961
24/02/1962
22/06/1964
12/10/1964
12/1965
31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7908 11/01/1950 84G
84E
W
Shrewsbury
Tyseley
Withdrawn
16/07/1955
08/10/1955
10/1965
09/10/1965
Modified Hall 7909 20/01/1950 83D
82D
83A
83D
83B
83C
85A
81F
W
Laira
Westbury
Newton Abbot
Laira
Taunton
Westbury
Worcester
Oxford
Withdrawn
20/05/1950
04/10/1958
05/11/1960
06/10/1962
17/11/1962
12/10/1964
15/11/1964
11/07/1965
18/11/1965
18/11/1965
Modified Hall 7910 31/01/1950 81C
81A
81D
81F
W
Southall
Old Oak Common
Reading (W.R.)
Oxford
Withdrawn
20/05/1950
30/11/1963
04/05/1964
22/11/1964
02/1965
06/02/1965
Modified Hall 7911 21/02/1950 81F
W
Oxford
Withdrawn
31/01/1952
12/1963
16/12/1963
Modified Hall 7912 03/03/1950 84E
84G
84E
84C
W
Tyseley
Shrewsbury
Tyseley
Banbury
Withdrawn
31/08/1950
21/05/1955
16/07/1955
21/04/1962
10/1965
09/10/1965
Modified Hall 7913 13/03/1950 84E
84G
84E
82B
86C
88L
87A
86E
W
Tyseley
Shrewsbury
Tyseley
St Philips Marsh
Cardiff Canton
Cardiff East Dock
Neath (Court Sart)
Severn Tunnel Junction
Withdrawn
31/08/1950
21/05/1955
16/07/1955
17/05/1958
21/03/1959
08/09/1962
20/07/1964
08/11/1964
03/1965
08/03/1965
Modified Hall 7914 21/03/1950 81D
82B
82E
W
Reading (W.R.)
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
23/04/1955
13/04/1964
22/06/1964
12/1965
31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7915 30/03/1950 84A
84B
84E
W
Stafford Road
Oxley
Tyseley
Withdrawn
31/08/1950
19/05/1951
03/11/1962
10/1965
09/10/1965
Modified Hall 7916 06/04/1950 83E
83A
83D
82C
88A
W
St Blazey
Newton Abbot
Laira
Swindon
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
30/09/1950
30/04/1952
21/05/1960
22/06/1964
12/10/1964
12/1964
26/12/1964
Modified Hall 7917 21/04/1950 82A
82D
87H
86E
81E
81F
W
Bristol Bath Road
Westbury
Neyland
Severn Tunnel Junction
Didcot
Oxford
Withdrawn
31/08/1950
31/10/1950
09/03/1963
28/09/1963
30/11/1963
11/07/1965
08/1965
06/08/1965
Modified Hall 7918 26/04/1950 84E
W
Tyseley
Withdrawn
31/08/1950
02/1965
20/02/1965
Modified Hall 7919 04/05/1950 85A
81F
W
Worcester
Oxford
Withdrawn
10/01/1965
11/07/1965
12/1965
31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7920 05/09/1950 85B
85A
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Worcester
Withdrawn
30/09/1950
31/03/1951
06/1965
03/06/1965
Modified Hall 7921 12/09/1950 84K
85C
84K
84G
83D
81A
W
Chester West
Hereford
Chester West
Shrewsbury
Laira
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
31/10/1953
26/12/1953
06/09/1958
11/07/1959
08/10/1960
12/1963
16/12/1963
Modified Hall 7922 20/09/1950 84K
84E
84K
84G
84F
81C
81F
W
Chester West
Tyseley
Chester West
Shrewsbury
Stourbridge Junction
Southall
Oxford
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
31/03/1951
19/05/1951
06/09/1958
08/09/1962
15/12/1962
08/08/1965
12/1965
31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7923 26/09/1950 82C
81C
81A
88A
W
Swindon
Southall
Old Oak Common
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
04/10/1958
12/10/1964
21/02/1965
06/1965
03/06/1965
Modified Hall 7924 29/09/1950 82D
83B
82B
82E
W
Westbury
Taunton
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
28/11/1959
27/01/1962
22/06/1964
12/1965
31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7925 09/10/1950 83G
86C
88L
86B
81F
W
Penzance
Cardiff Canton
Cardiff East Dock
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Oxford
Withdrawn
30/11/1950
31/10/1959
08/09/1962
08/08/1965
07/11/1965
12/1965
31/12/1965
Modified Hall 7926 12/10/1950 85B
85A
81D
82C
85B
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Worcester
Reading (W.R.)
Swindon
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
30/11/1950
06/10/1962
04/05/1964
20/07/1964
12/10/1964
12/1964
26/12/1964
Modified Hall 7927 24/10/1950 81D
81A
88A
88L
86B
81F
W
Reading (W.R.)
Old Oak Common
Cardiff Canton
Cardiff East Dock
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Oxford
Withdrawn
30/11/1950
04/10/1958
08/10/1960
08/09/1962
08/08/1965
07/11/1965
03/12/1965
03/12/1965
Modified Hall 7928 30/10/1950 85A
W
Worcester
Withdrawn
30/11/1950
03/1965
08/03/1965
Modified Hall 7929 02/11/1950 84E
82B
83E
84C
84E
W
Tyseley
St Philips Marsh
St Blazey
Banbury
Tyseley
Withdrawn
31/12/1950
16/07/1955
30/01/1960
08/10/1960
14/07/1962
08/1965
21/08/1965