Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 221 Today
» 968 Yesterday
» 5981 Week
» 15915 Month
» 48304 Year
» 932685 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

87 Bo-Bo


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
87 87001 01/06/1973 STEPHENSON 14/01/1976   02/07/1977 01/06/2005
87 87001 01/06/1973 ROYAL SCOT 11/07/1977   01/06/2005
87 87101 05/03/1975 STEPHENSON 12/10/1977 Name was originally applied to 87001.