Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 225 Today
» 968 Yesterday
» 5985 Week
» 15919 Month
» 48308 Year
» 932689 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

87 Bo-Bo


Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
87001 01/06/1973 01/06/2005 32 Prs Preserved 45.37 ROYAL SCOT
87002 29/06/1973 45.29
87003 11/07/1973 45.26
87004 13/07/1973 01/06/2005 31.92 36.33
87005 14/08/1973 30/04/2005 31.67 Cut J T Lanscapes (at MoD Caerwent) 01/10/2005 32.15
87006 05/11/1973 44.94
87007 26/10/1973 01/07/2006 32.75 34.62
87008 02/11/1973 01/07/2006 32.67 34.60
87009 26/11/1973 44.88
87010 15/12/1973 30/09/2008 34.75 34.82
87011 25/01/1974 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 44.72
87012 25/01/1974 30/11/2006 32.83 32.96
87013 23/02/1974 01/08/2005 31.5 35.71
87014 26/01/1974 01/08/2005 31.58 35.79
87015 19/02/1974 30/04/2005 31.17 Cut J T Lanscapes (at MoD Caerwent) 01/10/2005 31.64
87016 12/03/1974 14/09/2004 30.5 Cut J T Lanscapes (at MoD Caerwent) 01/12/2004 30.75
87017 06/03/1974 44.61
87018 07/05/1974 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 44.44
87019 11/03/1974 30/11/2006 32.67 32.83
87020 16/03/1974 01/12/2003 29.75 35.15
87021 04/04/1974 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 44.53
87022 11/04/1974 30/09/2008 34.42 34.50
87023 11/04/1974 44.51
87024 25/04/1974 31/05/2005 31.08 Cut J T Lanscapes (at MoD Caerwent) 01/11/2005 31.54
87025 26/04/1974 44.47
87026 04/05/1974 01/10/2006 32.42 34.10
87027 04/05/1974 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 44.45
87028 13/05/1974 30/09/2008 34.33 34.41
87029 04/06/1974 01/08/2004 30.17 34.93
87030 08/06/1974 44.35
87031 04/07/1974 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 44.28
87032 25/07/1974 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 44.22
87033 15/08/1974 01/03/2005 30.58 34.73
87034 11/09/1974 44.09
87035 09/10/1974 01/01/2005 30.25 Prs Preserved 44.01
87101 05/03/1975 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Barrow Hill) 01/02/2002 26.93 STEPHENSON